Clark Material Handling Company v. Toyota Material Handling U.S.A., Inc.

Plaintiff: Clark Material Handling Company
Defendant: Toyota Material Handling U.S.A., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00510
Filed: August 14, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2014 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 105 Motion to Apply July 18, 2013 Protective Order to Depositions of Defendant's Officers. Plaintiff will be allowed to ask questions and use documents about strategy in the Southeast region during dep ositions of senior Toyota executives. Any inadvertently produced strategy documents that are not confined to the Southeast region are subject to the July 18, 2013 Protective Order and are not to be referenced during the depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 08/07/2014. (jlk)
September 19, 2014 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 125 Motion to Compel Deposition of Connie Davies ; granting 138 Motion for Leave to File Surreply in Opposition to Toyota's Motion to Compel Deposition of Connie Davies. Ms. Davies shall appear and give testimony as noticed on September 22, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/19/2014. (eef)
November 17, 2014 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendants Motion for Summary Judgment re: 133 be calendared for oral arguments by the Clerk of Court. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 11/17/2014. (eef)
January 13, 2015 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 133 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 1/13/2015. (eef)
January 21, 2015 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 167 and 168 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added John Robert Maley and Todd A. Dixon for Toyota Material Handling U.S.A., Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/21/2015. (eef)
October 5, 2012 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Paul J. Riehle for Toyota Material Handling U.S.A., Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/5/2012. (blf)
January 30, 2015 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 171 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brian Charles Swanson for Clark Material Handling Company; granting 172 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sean W. Gallagher for Clark Material Handling Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 01/30/2015. (jlk)
December 10, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss; affirming 19 Memorandum and Recommendations.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 12/8/2012. (blf)
March 25, 2015 240 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on pending motions re 237 Miscellaneous Filing, 234 Trial Brief, 230 MOTION For Treble Damages, Attorneys' Fees and Interest, ORDERED that all outstanding motions in this matter be calendared for oral argument on the next available Charlotte civil motions day. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 03/25/2015. (jlk)
May 29, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/29/2013. (blf)
January 28, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/28/2014. (blf)
August 23, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Natalma M. McKnew for Clark Material Handling Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/22/2012. (blf)
March 10, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion for Protective Order; granting in part and denying in part 60 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 62 Motion ; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Compel; denying 72 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/10/2014. (blf)
April 23, 2014 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER overruling 89 Objection to Magistrate Judge's Decision (Rule 72(a)) re 86 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion for Hearing, filed by Toyota Material Handling, Inc. ( Discovery due by 9/30/2014, Motions due by 10/31/2014, Mediation deadline set for 10/15/2014.). Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 4/23/2014. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark Material Handling Company v. Toyota Material Handling U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clark Material Handling Company
Represented By: Natalma M. McKnew
Represented By: Evan Margosian Sauda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toyota Material Handling U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Paul Joseph Osowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.