Securities and Exchange Commission v. Rex Venture Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: Paul R. Burks, Trudy Gilmond, Rex Venture Group, LLC, Kellie King, BBVA Compass and Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC
Petitioner: Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC and Nathaniel Woods
Respondent: NxSystems, Inc.
Intervenor: Dawn Wright-Olivares, Daniel Olivares and Alexandre de Brantes
Case Number: 3:2012cv00519
Filed: August 17, 2012
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 781 ORDER granting #779 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/10/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ctb)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 780 ORDER granting #777 Application for Fees and Expenses for Second Quarter of 2019 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 02/05/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ctb)
February 5, 2020 Filing 779 MOTION for Disbursement of Funds by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/19/2020 (Orso, Matthew) (Main Document 779 replaced on 2/5/2020) (mga). NEF regenerated on 2/5/2020 (mga).
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 778 ORDER granting oral Motion for Extension of Time to the File Receivers Status Report for the Fourth Quarter of 2019. ( Status Report due by 3/1/2020). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/31/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ctb)
January 23, 2020 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #469 Motion for Contempt as to Payment World LLC. Motion Hearing set for 3/5/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ctb)
January 14, 2020 Filing 777 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for Second Quarter of 2019 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 1/28/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Orso, Matthew)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 776 ORDER granting #775 Motion for Extension of Time to File Final Liquidation and Dissolution Plan. The Receiver shall have until July 20, 2020. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/13/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 13, 2020 Filing 775 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Final Liquidation and Dissolution Plan by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 1/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 774 ORDER granting #773 Application for Fees and Expenses for First Quarter of 2019. The Receivership Estate IS HEREBY AUTHORIZED to immediately pay such amounts and reimburse McGuireWoods LLP and FTI Consulting, Inc. for approved expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/09/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ctb)
December 23, 2019 Filing 773 Application for Fees and Expenses for First Quarter of 2019 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 1/6/2020 (Attachments: #1Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Orso, Matthew) Modified duplicate text on 12/30/2019 (ctb).
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 772 ORDER that the Arizona Unclaimed Property Section to pay all funds in its possession, custody or control from uncashed cashierschecks and money orders made payable to Rex Venture Group, LLC or any close variation thereof, to the Receiver, including, but not limited to those associated with Claim Number 500308238 herein. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/23/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ctb)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 771 ORDER granting #770 MOTION for Court Approval to Reimburse MW for Kroll Costs by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/19/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ctb)
December 18, 2019 Filing 770 MOTION for Court Approval to Reimburse MW for Kroll Costs by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew) Modified on 12/20/2019 (ctb).
December 12, 2019 Minute Entry: STATUS CONFERENCE held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. (ctb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 769 STATUS REPORT for the Third Quarter of 2019 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Orso, Matthew)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 768 ORDER granting #767 Motion for Extension of Time to file Status Report for the Third Quarter of 2019. Status Report due by 11/15/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/1/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
October 31, 2019 Filing 767 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Status Report for Third Quarter of 2019 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/14/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
October 16, 2019 Filing 766 USCA Case Number 19-2129 for #762 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Manager: T. Fischer. (reh)
October 10, 2019 Filing 765 TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 10/1/2019 before Judge Graham C. Mullen NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov (Does this satisfy all appellate orders for this reporter? - Yes.) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/6/2020. (Reporter: Laura Andersen, 704-350-7493)
October 10, 2019 Filing 764 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #762 Notice of Appeal. (mek)
October 8, 2019 Filing 763 TRANSCRIPT REQUEST by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC for proceedings held on October 1, 2019 before Judge Mullen, (Davey, Joshua)
October 7, 2019 Filing 762 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #761 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0419-4210382. Use this link #www.ca4.uscourts.gov to retrieve 4th Circuit case opening documents, i.e. Appearance of Counsel, Docketing Statement, Disclosure Statement, and Transcript Order Form. Note: Your Transcript Order Form must be served on the District Court as well as the Circuit Court. (Davey, Joshua) (Main Document 762 replaced on 10/9/2019) (rys).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 761 ORDER denying #469 Motion directing Payza, Payment World, and VictoriaBank to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC ; denying #671 Amended Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/01/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ctb)
October 1, 2019 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Re #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets, #671 Amended MOTION re #469 MOTION The Receiver's Amended Motion for an Order Directing Payza, Payment World, and Victoriabank to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Rec. Plaintiffs attorney: Jacob Richard Franchek, Joshua Daniel Davey, Matthew E. Orso. Defendants attorney: Kiran Mehta. Court reporter: Laura Anersen. (ctb)
September 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 760 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #671 Receivers Amended Motion for an Order Directing Payza, Payment World, and VictoriaBank to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Courts Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Rights and #680 Renewed Motion to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for 10/1/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 09/09/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ctb)
August 21, 2019 Filing 759 NOTICE of Filing Affidavit of Valentin Barba in Further Support of Victoriabank's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA re #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Valentin Barba)(Mehta, Kiran)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 758 ORDER granting #751 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for Quarter 4 of 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/9/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 757 ORDER granting #750 Application for Fees and Expenses for the Third Quarter of 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/9/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 756 ORDER granting #741 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Second Quarter of 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/9/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 755 ORDER granting #735 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for First Quarter of 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/9/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
July 30, 2019 Filing 754 STATUS REPORT for the Second Quarter of 2019 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Orso, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 753 ORDER granting #752 Motion to Approve the Sale of Certain Net Winners Judgments. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/30/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
July 4, 2019 Filing 752 MOTION to Approve the Sale of Certain Net Winners Judgments by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Receiver's Motion)(Orso, Matthew)
July 2, 2019 Filing 751 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for Quarter 4 of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/16/2019 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Orso, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 750 Application for Fees and Expenses for the Third Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/12/2019 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Orso, Matthew) Modified on 7/8/2019 (rth).
June 26, 2019 Filing 749 NOTICE of Filing of Supplemental Declaration in Opposition to VictoriaBank's Renewed Motion to Dismiss by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets, #696 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Roman Zadoinov)(Davey, Joshua)
June 26, 2019 Filing 748 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Richard Franchek on behalf of Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Franchek, Jacob)
June 21, 2019 Filing 747 Mail (Amended Receivership Order #739 ) addressed to Amit Sondhi returned as undeliverable.(Return to Sender) (brj)
June 19, 2019 Filing 746 Mail ( #739 Amended Receivership Order) addressed to Ira Lee Sorkin returned as undeliverable. (Returned to Sender) (brj)
June 14, 2019 Filing 745 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole S. Giffin on behalf of Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Giffin, Nicole)
June 7, 2019 Filing 744 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Anderson Warlich on behalf of Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Warlich, Kelly) Modified to correct text on 6/7/2019 (clc).
June 7, 2019 Filing 743 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Daniel Davey on behalf of Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC (Davey, Joshua) Modified to correct text on 6/7/2019 (clc).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER granting #740 Motion To Add Epiq to List of Retained Personnel by Receiver. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/5/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
June 3, 2019 Filing 741 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Second Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/17/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Orso, Matthew)
May 28, 2019 Filing 740 Consent MOTION To Add Epiq to List of Retained Personnel by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 739 ORDER granting #727 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Matthew E. Orso is hereby appointed to serve without bond as temporary successor receiver in this action. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/20/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
May 21, 2019 NOTICE of Cancellation of Motion Hearing scheduled for 6/11/2019 (eef)
May 20, 2019 Filing 738 Mail (Order #732 ) addressed to Ira Lee Sorkin returned as undeliverable. (brl)
May 20, 2019 Filing 737 Mail (Order #732 ) addressed to Amit Sondhi returned as undeliverable. (brl)
May 15, 2019 Filing 736 STATUS REPORT for the First Quarter of 2019 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Orso, Matthew)
May 13, 2019 Filing 735 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for First Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/28/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #727 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Successor : Motion Hearing set for 6/11/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(clc)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER granting #659 Revised Application for Fees and Expenses by theReceiver and His Advisors for the Fourth Quarter of 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/10/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 733 ORDER that the SEC's objections to the Second and Fourth Quarter 2017 Fee Applications are overruled, and the Receiver's Application for Fees and Expenses for the Fourth Quarter of 2017 is approved. A separate Order will be entered approving the amounts requested in the application. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/9/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 732 ORDER granting #731 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Status Report. The Receiver shall have until May 15, 2019 to file his Status Report for the First Quarter of 2019. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/25/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga) (Main Document 732 replaced on 4/25/2019) (mga). NEF regenerated on 4/25/2019 (mga).
April 24, 2019 Filing 731 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Status Report for Q1 of 2019 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
April 3, 2019 Filing 730 RESPONSE to Motion re #727 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Successor by Securities and Exchange Commission. Replies due by 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Myatt Receiver Proposal, #2 Exhibit 2 - Cox Receiver Proposal, #3 Proposed Order)(Bowers, John)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 729 ORDER Granting #728 Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement with M.H. Pillars, Ltd. and M.H. Pillars, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/28/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
March 27, 2019 Filing 728 MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement with M.H. Pillars, LTD. and M.H. Pillars, Inc. by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 4/10/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brenner, Irving)
March 22, 2019 Filing 727 MOTION to Appoint Receiver Successor by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 4/5/2019 (Bell, Kenneth)
March 21, 2019 NOTICE of Cancellation of Motion Hearing scheduled for 4/1/2019. (eef)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 726 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #671 Amended MOTION re #469 MOTION The Receiver's Amended Motion for an Order Directing Payza, Payment World, and Victoriabank to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Rec : Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/20/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 15, 2019 Filing 725 STATUS REPORT for the Fourth Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Orso, Matthew)
March 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 724 ORDER Granting #723 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receivers Status Report for the Fourth Quarter of 2018. Status Report due by 3/15/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/4/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
February 28, 2019 Filing 723 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Status Report for the Fourth Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/14/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 722 ORDER Granting #721 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Status Report for the Fourth Quarter of 2018. Status Report due by 3/1/2019. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/6/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
February 6, 2019 Filing 721 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report for Fourth Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/20/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
February 1, 2019 Filing 720 REPLY to Response to Motion re #703 MOTION Seeking Reduction in Fees to be Awarded re #659 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for 4th Quarter 2017 Objection by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bowers, John)
February 1, 2019 Filing 719 REPLY to Response to Motion re #700 MOTION Objection to Receiver's 2Q 2017 Fee Application Seeking Reduction in Interim Fee Award re #637 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #633 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Second by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bowers, John)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #718 Motion to Stay. Due to a lapse in appropriations, the SEC shut down as of December 27, 2018. Most personnel have been furloughed, and are prohibited from working, except in very limited circumstances. Accordingly, it is appropriate that activity in this case be stayed until the shutdown ends, and that all deadlines, including the deadline to reply to the Receiver's Response, be extended by the number of days that the SEC is shut down. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/18/. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(STB)
January 16, 2019 Filing 718 Consent MOTION to Stay re #717 Response in Opposition to Motion,,, by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 1/30/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bowers, John)
January 14, 2019 Filing 717 RESPONSE in Opposition re #700 MOTION Objection to Receiver's 2Q 2017 Fee Application Seeking Reduction in Interim Fee Award re #637 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #633 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Second, #703 MOTION Seeking Reduction in Fees to be Awarded re #659 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for 4th Quarter 2017 Objection Receiver's Verified Response to SEC's Objections to The Applications for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the 2nd Quarter and 4th Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 1/22/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Bell, Kenneth)
December 12, 2018 Filing 716 Supplemental Memorandum by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA as to #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. (Mehta, Kiran)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 715 ORDER granting #690 Revised Application for Fees and Expenses for Third Quarter of 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/3/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
December 3, 2018 NOTICE of CANCELLATION OF MOTION HEARING scheduled for 12/5/2018. (jaw)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER approving #647 Application for Fees and Expenses for the Third Quarter of 2017. A separate Order will be entered approving the amounts requested in the application. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/29/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
November 30, 2018 Filing 713 STATUS REPORT for the Third Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bell, Kenneth)
November 27, 2018 Filing 712 Supplemental Memorandum by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC as to #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Brenner, Irving)
November 15, 2018 Filing 711 RESPONSE in Support re #707 Response, #703 MOTION Seeking Reduction in Fees to be Awarded re #659 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for 4th Quarter 2017 Objection by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bowers, John)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 710 ORDER Setting Hearing on #671 Amended MOTION re #469 The Receiver's Amended Motion. Motion Hearing set for 12/5/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/15/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 709 ORDER granting #708 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Receivers Status Report for the Third Quarter of 2018. Status Report due by 11/30/2018.Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/15/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
November 14, 2018 Filing 708 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Status Report for the Third Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/28/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
November 8, 2018 Filing 707 RESPONSE re #703 MOTION Seeking Reduction in Fees to be Awarded re #659 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for 4th Quarter 2017 Objection Receiver's Request To Defer Consideration of Securities And Exchange Commission's Objection To The Receiver's Fee Application For The Fourth Quarter Of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Brenner, Irving)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER granting #704 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Receivers Status Report for the Third Quarter of 2018. Status Report due by 11/15/2018.Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/5/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
October 31, 2018 Filing 705 RESPONSE in Opposition re #702 Response,, Opposition to Receiver's Request to Defer Consideration by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bowers, John)
October 31, 2018 Filing 704 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Status Report for Third Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/14/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
October 26, 2018 Filing 703 MOTION Seeking Reduction in Fees to be Awarded re #659 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for 4th Quarter 2017 Objection by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 11/9/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Billing Instructions, #2 Exhibit Report of Expert Fee Examiner Diana Adams - 4Q 2017, #3 Exhibit Resume of Diana Adams, #4 Exhibit 2012 Receiver Plan)(Bowers, John)
October 24, 2018 Filing 702 RESPONSE re #700 MOTION Objection to Receiver's 2Q 2017 Fee Application Seeking Reduction in Interim Fee Award re #637 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #633 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Second Receiver's Request To Defer Consideration of Securities And Exchange Commission's Objection To The Receiver's Fee Application For The Second Quarter Of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Brenner, Irving)
October 23, 2018 Filing 701 REPLY to Response to Motion re #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. (Mehta, Kiran)
October 10, 2018 Filing 700 MOTION Objection to Receiver's 2Q 2017 Fee Application Seeking Reduction in Interim Fee Award re #637 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, #633 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Second Quarter of 2017 by Securities and Exchange Commission. Responses due by 10/24/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SEC Billing Instructions, #2 Exhibit 2Q 2017 Report of Expert Fee Examiner Diana Adams, #3 Exhibit Resume of Expert Fee Examiner Diana Adams, #4 Exhibit 2012 Receiver Plan)(Bowers, John)
October 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 699 ORDER granting #698 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #680 MOTION to Dismiss. Replies due by 10/23/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/9/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
October 8, 2018 Filing 698 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Responses due by 10/22/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Kiran)
October 5, 2018 Filing 697 RESPONSE in Opposition re #690 MOTION Revised Application for Fees and Expenses for Third Quarter of 2017 Reply Brief in Further Support of SEC Objection to Receiver's 3Q 2017 Fee Applications by Securities and Exchange Commission. Replies due by 10/12/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Bowers, John)
October 1, 2018 Filing 696 RESPONSE in Opposition re #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 10/9/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit News Article, #2 Exhibit News Article, #3 Exhibit News Article)(Brenner, Irving)
September 28, 2018 Filing 695 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF Verified Response to Securities and Exchange Commission's Objection to The Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Third Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re: #691 Response in Opposition to Motion,, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Bell, Kenneth)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 694 ORDER granting #693 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to the recent filings of Payza, Payment World, and Victoriabank in ECF Nos. 680, 681, 682, 683, 684 and 685. Responses due by 10/1/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/18/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
September 17, 2018 Filing 693 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #680 , #681 , #682 , #683 , #684 and #685 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 10/1/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
September 14, 2018 Filing 692 STATUS REPORT for Second Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bell, Kenneth)
September 13, 2018 Filing 691 RESPONSE in Opposition re #647 Consent MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Third Quarter of 2017 , #690 MOTION Revised Application for Fees and Expenses for Third Quarter of 2017 Objection to Receiver's Fee Applications by Securities and Exchange Commission. Replies due by 9/20/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SEC Billing Instructions, #2 Exhibit Expert Report of Diana Adams, Esq., #3 Exhibit Resume of Diana Adams, Esq., #4 Exhibit 2012 Receiver Plan)(Bowers, John)
September 10, 2018 Filing 690 MOTION Revised Application for Fees and Expenses for Third Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/24/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ORDER Granting #688 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Status Report for the Second Quarter of 2018. Status Report due by 9/14/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/31/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
August 30, 2018 Filing 688 MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Status Report for Second Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/13/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 687 ORDER Granting #686 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets. Responses due by 9/25/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/27/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
August 24, 2018 Filing 686 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets re: #681 , #682 , #683 , #684 and #685 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/7/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
August 20, 2018 Filing 685 Miscellaneous Filing by Paymentworld LLC. re: #672 Miscellaneous Filing, Response to Receiver's Statement of Numbered Factual Allegations (Garella, Charles)
August 20, 2018 Filing 684 RESPONSE in Opposition re #671 Amended MOTION re #469 MOTION The Receiver's Amended Motion for an Order Directing Payza, Payment World, and Victoriabank to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Rec by Paymentworld LLC. Replies due by 8/27/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Garella, Charles)
August 20, 2018 Filing 683 RESPONSE re #672 Miscellaneous Filing, by M.H. Pillars, Inc. (Woodman, John)
August 20, 2018 Filing 682 RESPONSE to Motion re #671 Amended MOTION re #469 MOTION The Receiver's Amended Motion for an Order Directing Payza, Payment World, and Victoriabank to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Rec by M.H. Pillars, Inc. Replies due by 8/27/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Woodman, John)
August 20, 2018 Filing 681 MEMORANDUM in Support re #680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets and Memorandum in Opposition to Receiver's Statement on the Appropriate Course of the Proceedings by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. (Mehta, Kiran)
August 20, 2018 Filing 680 MOTION to Dismiss Renewed Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Amended Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Responses due by 9/4/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Mehta, Kiran)
August 20, 2018 Filing 679 Miscellaneous Filing by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. re: #672 Miscellaneous Filing, Responses to Receiver's Statement of Factual Allegations (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mr. Corneliu Popovici)(Mehta, Kiran)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 678 ORDER Granting #677 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Application for Fees and Expenses for the Second Quarter of 2018 due by 9/15/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/17/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
August 15, 2018 Filing 677 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Application for Fees and Expenses for Second Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/29/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 676 ORDER Granting #675 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #671 Amended MOTION re #469 MOTION The Receiver's Amended Motion for an Order Directing Payza, Payment World, and Victoriabank to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Rec. Responses due by 8/20/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/7/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
August 7, 2018 Filing 675 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #671 Amended MOTION re #469 MOTION The Receiver's Amended Motion for an Order Directing Payza, Payment World, and Victoriabank to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Rec by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Responses due by 8/21/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Kiran)
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 674 ORDER granting #673 Motion for Extension of Time to file Status Report Status Report due by 8/30/2018.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/31/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 30, 2018 Filing 673 MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Status Report for Second Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/13/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
July 25, 2018 Filing 672 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Receiver's Statement On The Appropriate Course Of The Proceedings And Statement Of Numbered Factual Allegations In Support Of Amended Motion For An Order Directing Payza, Payment World, And Victoriabank To Turn Over Receivership Assets And/Or Find Them In Contempt Of The Court's Order Freezing And Preserving Receivership Assets (Brenner, Irving)
July 18, 2018 Minute Entry: STATUS CONFERENCE held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Interested Party Attorney: Charles Kiel Garella; Kiran H. Mehta. Defendants Attorney: Kenneth D. Bell; Irving M. Brenner. Court reporter: Laura Andersen. (jaw)
July 12, 2018 Filing 671 Amended MOTION re #469 MOTION The Receiver's Amended Motion for an Order Directing Payza, Payment World, and Victoriabank to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/26/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Brenner, Irving)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER Granting #669 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Receivers Application for Fees and Expenses for Q1 of 2018 due by 7/16/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/19/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
June 15, 2018 Filing 669 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Application for Fees and Expenses for Q1 of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/29/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
June 14, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference RE-SET for 7/18/2018 02:00 PM Re: Doc#469 Receiver's Motion for Contempt against Victoria Bank in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jaw)
June 7, 2018 Filing 668 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephan J. Schlegelmilch on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Schlegelmilch, Stephan)
June 5, 2018 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 7/11/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(jaw)
May 30, 2018 Filing 667 MANDATE of USCA as to #613 Notice of Appeal, #604 Notice of Appeal, #660 Opinion/Judgment - USCA. [17-1770] (ni) (Main Document 667 replaced on 5/31/2018) NEF regenerated (ni)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 666 ORDER Granting #665 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Application for Fees and Expenses for the First Quarter of 2018 due by 6/15/2018.Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/17/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
May 16, 2018 Filing 665 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Application for Fees and Expenses for First Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/30/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
May 15, 2018 Filing 664 STATUS REPORT for the First Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Q1 SFAR, #2 Exhibit B-Q1 Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/16/2018) (tob).
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 663 ORDER Granting #662 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Status Report for the First Quarter of 2018. Status Report due by 5/15/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/2/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
April 30, 2018 Filing 662 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Status Report for First Quarter of 2018 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/14/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
April 10, 2018 Filing 661 4th Circuit NOTICE regarding Stay of Mandate under FRAP 41(d)(1) pending ruling on petition for rehearing/rehearing en banc. [17-1770] (ni)
March 27, 2018 Filing 660 Unpublished Opinion from Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals as to #613 Notice of Appeal. 4th Circuit decision - Reversed and Remanded. (Attachments: #1 USCA Judgment) (ni)
March 22, 2018 Filing 659 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for 4th Quarter 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 4/5/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 658 ORDER Granting #657 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receivers Application for Fees and Expenses for the Fourth Quarter of 2017. Receivers Application for Fees and Expenses for the Fourth Quarter of 2017 due by 3/26/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/20/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
March 19, 2018 Filing 657 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 4/2/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 656 ORDER Granting #655 Motion for Extension of Time to File Application for Fees and Expenses for the Fourth Quarter of 2017 Application due by 3/19/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/6/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw) Modified text on 3/7/2018 (rth).
March 5, 2018 Filing 655 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Application for Fees and Expenses for Fourth Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/19/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 654 ORDER Granting #652 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Receivers Application for Fees and Expenses for the Fourth Quarter 2017. The Receiver shall have until 3/9/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail to file his Application. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/16/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
February 15, 2018 Filing 653 STATUS REPORT for Fourth Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bell, Kenneth)
February 15, 2018 Filing 652 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Fourth Quarter 2017 Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/1/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
January 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 651 ORDER granting #650 Motion for Extension of Time Responses due by 2/15/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/31/18. (tob)
January 30, 2018 Filing 650 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for filing Fourth Quarter 2017 Status Report by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/13/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Orso, Matthew)
January 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 649 ORDER Granting #648 Receiver's Motion for Leave of Court to Terminate Dedicated Hosting Agreement. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/29/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
January 26, 2018 Filing 648 MOTION for Leave of Court To Terminate Dedicated Hosting Agreement by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/9/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
December 20, 2017 Filing 647 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Third Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 1/3/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Bell, Kenneth) Modified text on 12/21/2017 (brl).
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER granting #645 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Third Quarter Application for Fees and Expenses. The Receiver shall have until December 20, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/18/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 15, 2017 Filing 645 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Third Quarter Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/29/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER granting #643 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Application for Fees and Expenses for the Third Quarter of 2017. Receiver shall have until 12/15/17 to file his Application. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/6/17. (tob)
December 5, 2017 Filing 643 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Application for Fees and Expenses for the Third Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/19/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 642 ORDER Granting #641 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Application for Fees and Expenses for the Third Quarter of 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/17/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
November 15, 2017 Filing 641 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Third Quarter 2017 Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/29/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
November 15, 2017 Filing 640 STATUS REPORT for the Third Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bell, Kenneth)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 639 ORDER Granting #638 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Status Report. The Receiver shall have until November 15, 2017 to file his Status Report for the Third Quarter of 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/31/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
October 30, 2017 Filing 638 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Status Report for Third Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/13/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
October 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER Granting #633 Motion Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Second Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/12/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
October 4, 2017 Filing 636 Deleted Document, docketed in error (eef).
September 27, 2017 Filing 635 Mail (Order #630 ) addressed to Jennifer Lynn Farer returned as undeliverable. (ams)
September 19, 2017 Filing 634 Mail (Order, Document #630 ) addressed to Amit Sondhi returned as undeliverable. (ams)
September 15, 2017 Filing 633 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Second Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/29/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth)
September 7, 2017 Filing 632 Mail ( #626 ) addressed to Amit Sondhi returned as undeliverable. (ams)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 631 ORDER Granting Receivers Fifth Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements and For Leave to Settle Certain Claims Against Net Winners #627 Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/5/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 630 ORDER granting #629 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receiver's Application for Fees and Expenses. The Receiver shall have until September 15, 2017 to file his Application for Fees and Expenses for the Second Quarter of 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/1/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
September 1, 2017 Filing 629 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to September 15, 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/15/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 31, 2017 Filing 628 Mail (Order #626 ) addressed to Ira Lee Sorkin returned as undeliverable. (brl)
August 25, 2017 Filing 627 MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreements and for Leave to Settle Certain Claims Against Winners by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/8/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brenner, Irving)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 626 ORDER granting #625 Motion for Extension of Time in Filing Second Quarter Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. The Receiver shall have until 9/2/2017 to file his Application. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/16/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tob)
August 15, 2017 Filing 625 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Second Quarter Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/29/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 10, 2017 Filing 624 STATUS REPORT for Second Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- SFAR, #2 Exhibit B- Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 623 ORDER granting #622 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for filing Second Quarter Status Report. The Receiver shall have until August 14, 2017 to file his Status Report for the Second Quarter of 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/31/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 31, 2017 Filing 622 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for filing Second Quarter Status Report by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/14/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Orso, Matthew)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 621 ORDER denying #607 MOTION to Vacate #606 Order, Staying Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Freeze Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/12/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 27, 2017 Filing 620 Mail (Doc #612 ORDER amending Order entered on May 25, 2017 to grant 494 Motion to Dismiss) addressed to Amit Sondhi returned as undeliverable. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jaw)
June 27, 2017 Filing 619 Mail (Doc #612 ORDER amending Order entered on May 25, 2017 to grant 494 Motion to Dismiss) addressed to Ira Lee Sorkin returned as undeliverable. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jaw)
June 27, 2017 Filing 618 USCA Case Number 17-1770 for #604 Notice of Appeal, #613 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Manager: Amy L. Carlheim. (ni)
June 26, 2017 Filing 617 REPLY to Response to Motion re #607 MOTION to Vacate #606 Order, Staying Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Freeze Order by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. (Mehta, Kiran)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 616 ORDER granting #609 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the First Quarter of 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/21/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 21, 2017 Filing 615 RESPONSE in Opposition re #607 MOTION to Vacate #606 Order, Staying Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Freeze Order Receiver's Response to Victoriabank's Motion to Vacate Order Staying Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Freeze Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 6/28/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Brenner, Irving)
June 20, 2017 Filing 614 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #613 Notice of Appeal (bar)
June 19, 2017 Filing 613 AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #612 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Use this link #www.ca4.uscourts.gov to retrieve 4th Circuit case opening documents, i.e. Appearance of Counsel, Docketing Statement, Disclosure Statement, and Transcript Order Form. Note: Your Transcript Order Form must be served on the District Court as well as the Circuit Court. (Brenner, Irving) Modified text on 6/20/2017 (eef).
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 612 ORDER amending Order entered on May 25, 2017 to grant #494 Motion to Dismiss. The remainder of the Order remains unchanged. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/14/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc) Modified text on 6/19/2017 (rth).
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 611 ORDER granting #610 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #607 MOTION to Vacate #606 Order, Staying Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Freeze Order Responses due by 6/21/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/8/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
June 8, 2017 Filing 610 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time To Respond To Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA's Motion To Vacate Order Staying Dissolution Of February 12, 2016 Freeze Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/22/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
June 5, 2017 Filing 609 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/19/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Bell, Kenneth)
May 30, 2017 Filing 608 MEMORANDUM in Support re #607 MOTION to Vacate #606 Order, Staying Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Freeze Order by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. (Mehta, Kiran)
May 30, 2017 Filing 607 MOTION to Vacate #606 Order, Staying Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Freeze Order by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Responses due by 6/13/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Mehta, Kiran)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 606 ORDER before the Court upon its own motion staying the dissolving of the February 12, 2016 Freeze Order pending the conclusion of the appeal. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/25/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
May 23, 2017 Filing 605 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #604 Notice of Appeal. (eef)
May 23, 2017 Filing 604 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0419-3340129. Use this link #www.ca4.uscourts.gov to retrieve 4th Circuit case opening documents, i.e. Appearance of Counsel, Docketing Statement, Disclosure Statement, and Transcript Order Form. Note: Your Transcript Order Form must be served on the District Court as well as the Circuit Court. (Brenner, Irving)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 603 ORDER granting #602 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Quarter 2017 Application for Fees and Expenses, and the Receiver shall have until June 5, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/16/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
May 15, 2017 Filing 602 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Quarter 2017 Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/30/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
May 8, 2017 Filing 601 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss by Victoriabank held on 5/3/17 before Judge Mullen. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2017. (Reporter: Cheryl Nuccio, 704-350-7494)
May 3, 2017 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets. Motion taken under advisement, order to issue. Attorney for Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC: Irving Brenner, Kenneth Bell, Matthew Orso. Attorney for Non-Party Victoriabank SA: Kiran Mehta, Lindsey Mann, Kathleen Campbell. Court reporter: C.Nuccio. (eef)
May 1, 2017 Filing 600 STATUS REPORT for the First Quarter of 2017 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 599 ORDER granting Receiver's Application for Fees and Expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/24/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 598 ORDER granting #596 Motion to Seal. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/17/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
April 17, 2017 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets : Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2017 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(chh)
April 11, 2017 Filing 597 SEALED REPLY (Sealed - Attorney) to Response to Motion re: #494 Motion to Dismiss by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA; (available to Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Mehta, Kiran)
April 11, 2017 Filing 596 MOTION to Seal Victoriabank's Supplemental Reply Memorandum in Further Support of its Motion by Special Appearance to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Responses due by 4/25/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Kiran)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 595 ORDER granting #594 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets Replies due by 4/11/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/7/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 6, 2017 Filing 594 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Receiver's Supplemental Response in Opposition to Victoriabank's Motion to Dismiss by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Responses due by 4/20/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Kiran)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #592 Motion to Seal. This Court grants the Receiver's Motion to Seal and Seal the Receiver's underlying Supplemental Response in Opposition to Victoriabank's Motion to Dismiss. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/27/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(STB)
March 24, 2017 Filing 593 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Receiver's Supplemental Response in Opposition to Victoriabank's Motion to Dismiss re: #592 MOTION to Seal Receiver's Supplemental Response in Opposition to Victoriabank's Motion to Dismiss (available to Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Brenner, Irving) Modified to give access to Receiver on 3/27/2017 (clc).
March 24, 2017 Filing 592 MOTION to Seal Receiver's Supplemental Response in Opposition to Victoriabank's Motion to Dismiss by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 4/7/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Brenner, Irving)
March 22, 2017 Filing 591 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #587 Notice (Other), #590 Notice (Other), #585 Notice (Other) Notice of Cancellation of Deposition of BNYM (Moss, Joseph)
March 20, 2017 Filing 590 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC Second Amended Notice of Deposition of BNYM (Moss, Joseph)
March 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 589 ORDER granting #588 Motion To Approve Settlement Agreements and For Leave to Settle Certain Claims Against Net Winners. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/16/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 15, 2017 Filing 588 MOTION To Approve Settlement Agreements and For Leave to Settle Certain Claims Against Net Winners by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/29/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
March 14, 2017 Filing 587 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC Amended Notice of Deposition (Moss, Joseph)
March 6, 2017 Filing 586 APPLICATION FOR FEES AND EXPENSES BY THE RECEIVER AND HIS ADVISORS FOR THE FOURTH QUARTER OF 2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth) Modified on 5/23/2017 to change event (thh).
March 3, 2017 Filing 585 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC of Issuance of Subpoena for Deposition (Moss, Joseph)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 584 ORDER granting #583 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Fourth Quarter 2016 Application for Fees and Expenses. The Receiver shall have until March 6, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/15/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
February 14, 2017 Filing 583 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Fourth Quarter 2016 Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/28/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
February 14, 2017 Filing 582 STATUS REPORT for Fourth Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Orso, Matthew) (Main Document 582 replaced on 3/2/2017) (eef).
February 3, 2017 Filing 581 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC Of Issuance of Subpoena to The Bank of New York Mellon (Moss, Joseph)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 580 ORDER granting #576 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Status Report for Fourth Quarter of 2016. The Receiver shall have until February 14, 2017 to file his Status Report for the Fourth Quarter of 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/23/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER granting #578 Motion for Extension of Time of Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Victoriabanks Motion to Dismiss. The Receivers supplemental brief in opposition to Victoriabanks Motion to Dismiss is due on March 24, 2017. Victoriabanks response is due on April 7, 2017. The hearing will be conducted during the week of May 1, 2017 if the Court has availability during that week. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/23/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 20, 2017 Filing 578 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of Briefing Schedule and Hearing on Victoriabank's Motion to Dismiss by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/3/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
January 20, 2017 Filing 577 STIPULATION Preserving Victoriabank's Objection to the Court's Exercise of Personal Jurisdiction by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA (Mehta, Kiran)
January 18, 2017 Filing 576 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Status Report for Fourth Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/1/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 575 ORDER granting #573 Joint MOTION for Hearing re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets and Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 1/24/2017 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail; Victoriabanks response is due on February 7, 2017; and the hearing will take place during the week of February 20, 2017, subject to the Courts availability. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/27/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 574 ORDER granting #572 MOTION for the Court to Exercise its Discretion and Consider Release of a Portion of the Holdback. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/21/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 15, 2016 Filing 573 Joint MOTION for Hearing re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets and Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Responses due by 12/29/2016 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Kiran)
December 12, 2016 Filing 572 MOTION for the Court to Exercise its Discretion and Consider Release of a Portion of the Holdback by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/27/2016 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 571 ORDER granting #570 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Third Quarter of 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/9/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
November 21, 2016 Filing 570 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Third Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/8/2016 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 569 ORDER granting #567 Motion for Extension of Time to File Third Quarter 2016 Application for Fees and Expenses until 11/21/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/16/2016. (tmg)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 568 ORDER granting #565 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement with Gary Bessoni, Peak USA, LLC and Peak Impact, LLC. The Settlement Agreement attached to the motion is approved, and the Receiver is hereby authorized to perform according to the terms of that Settlement Agreement. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/16/2016. (tmg)
November 14, 2016 Filing 567 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Third Quarter 2016 Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/1/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 566 ORDER granting #564 Motion to Affirm Disallowance of Claims and Forfeit of Distributions for Failure to Submit OFAC and Release by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/10/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tob)
November 7, 2016 Filing 565 MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement with Gary Bessoni, Peak USA, LLC and Peak Impact, LLC by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/28/2016 (Brenner, Irving) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/8/2016: #1 Exhibit 1) (jaw).
November 3, 2016 Filing 564 MOTION to Affirm Disallowance of Claims and Forfeit of Distributions for Failure to Submit OFAC and Release by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/21/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
October 31, 2016 Filing 563 STATUS REPORT for the Third Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/1/2016, NEF Regenerated) (tmg).
October 14, 2016 Filing 562 Surreply as to #469 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Court) to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC by M.H. Pillars, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Woodman, John)
October 7, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #561 Motion for Extension of Time. M.H. Pillars, Inc. d/b/a Payza is granted an extension of time to respond to the Receiver's Reply up to and including October 14, 2016. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/7/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(STB)
October 6, 2016 Filing 561 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Surreply by M.H. Pillars, Inc. d/b/a Payza. Responses due by 10/24/2016 (Woodman, John)
September 27, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting M.H. Pillars, Inc. d/b/a Payza #560 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to the Receiver's Reply up to and including October 10, 2016. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/27/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(STB)
September 22, 2016 Filing 560 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by M.H. Pillars, Inc. d/b/a Payza. Responses due by 10/11/2016 (Woodman, John)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 559 ORDER granting #555 Consent MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Second Quarter of 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/22/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 558 ORDER granting #557 Motion Approve Settlement Agreement with Jaymes Meyer and Preferred Merchants Solutions LLC and Authorize Sale of Property. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/19/2016. (tmg)
September 19, 2016 Filing 557 MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement with Jaymes Meyer and Preferred Merchants Solutions and Authorize Sale of Property by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 10/6/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Brenner, Irving)
September 15, 2016 Filing 556 SEALED SURREPLY (Sealed - Attorney) re: #469 MOTION directing Payza, Payment World, and VictoriaBank to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Asset (available to Paymentworld LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC, Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA, M.H. Pillars, Inc. d/b/a Payza) (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of C. Kiel Garella, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of C. Kiel Garella, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of C. Kiel Garella, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of C. Kiel Garella, #5 Affidavit Second Declaration of Roman Balanko, #6 Exhibit A to Second Declaration of Roman Balanko)(Garella, Charles) Modified to add applicable parties on 9/16/2016 (tmg).
September 9, 2016 Filing 555 Consent MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver and His Advisors for the Second Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/26/2016 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 554 ORDER granting #553 Motion for Leave to File Surreply until 9/15/2016 re: #469 Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/1/2016. (tmg)
September 1, 2016 Filing 553 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Paymentworld LLC. Responses due by 9/19/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garella, Charles)
August 30, 2016 Filing 552 SEALED REPLY (Sealed - Attorney) to Response to Motion re: #469 Sealed Motion - Court, by Ken Bell, Receiver; (available to Paul Burks, Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA, M.H. Pillars, Inc. d/b/a Payza, Paymentworld LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC, Securities and Exchange Commission) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Transcript Ex. 3, #3 Transcript Ex. 4, #4 Transcript Ex. 5, #5 Transcript Ex. 6, #6 Transcript Ex. 7, #7 Transcript Ex. 9, #8 Transcript Ex. 11, #9 Transcript Ex. 12, #10 Transcript Ex. 13, #11 Transcript Ex. 15, #12 Transcript Ex. 18, #13 Transcript Ex. 19, #14 Transcript Ex. 20, #15 Transcript Ex. 21, #16 Transcript Ex. 22, #17 Transcript Ex. 23, #18 Transcript Ex. 25, #19 Transcript Ex. 26, #20 Transcript Ex. 27, #21 Transcript Ex. 31, #22 Transcript Ex. 32, #23 Transcript Ex. 33, #24 Transcript Ex. 38, #25 Transcript Ex. 45, #26 Transcript Ex. 50, #27 Transcript Ex. 51, #28 Transcript Ex. 53, #29 Transcript Ex. 56, #30 Transcript Ex. 61, #31 Transcript Ex. 63, #32 Transcript Ex. 68, #33 Transcript Ex. 69, #34 Transcript Ex. 72, #35 Transcript Ex. 95, #36 Transcript Ex. 96, #37 Exhibit B, #38 Exhibit C, #39 Exhibit D, #40 Exhibit E, #41 Exhibit F)(Orso, Matthew) Modified on 9/1/2016 to add Burks as applicable party (tmg).
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 551 ORDER granting #550 Motion to Withdraw #240 SEALED MOTION for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/30/2016. (tmg)
August 29, 2016 Filing 550 MOTION to Withdraw #240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Orso, Matthew) (Main Document 550 replaced on 9/1/2016) (tmg).
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 549 ORDER granting #548 Motion for Extension of Time o File Second Quarter 2016 Application for Fees and Expenses until 9/9/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/25/2016. (tmg)
August 25, 2016 Filing 548 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing 2nd Quarter 2016 Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/12/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 16, 2016 Filing 547 STATUS REPORT for the Second Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 546 ORDER granting #545 Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Quarter 2016 Application for Fees and Expenses until 8/31/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/12/2016. (tmg)
August 11, 2016 Filing 545 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Quarter 2016 Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/29/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 544 ORDER granting #543 Motion for Extension of Time file Receiver's Status Report for the Second Quarter of 2016. Status Report due by 8/16/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/10/2016. (tmg)
August 9, 2016 Filing 543 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Status Report for Second Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/26/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Orso, Matthew)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER denying Paymentworld's #535 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/9/2016. (tmg)
August 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER granting #540 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Supplemental Brief Regarding PaymentWorld. Replies due by 8/30/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/1/2016. (tmg)
July 29, 2016 Filing 540 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to PaymentWorld's Response to Receiver's Contempt Motion - by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Orso, Matthew)
July 28, 2016 Filing 539 RESPONSE in Opposition re #535 MOTION for Protective Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 8/8/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bell, Kenneth)
July 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 538 ORDER granting #537 Motion for Extension of Time to file Receiver's Status Report for the Second Quarter of 2016 Status Report due by 8/9/2016.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/27/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
July 27, 2016 Filing 537 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Status Report for Second Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/15/2016 (Orso, Matthew)
July 12, 2016 Filing 536 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #385 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Valley National Bank Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 385) (Moss, Joseph)
July 11, 2016 Filing 535 MOTION for Protective Order by Paymentworld LLC. Responses due by 7/28/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Receiver's Motion to Intervene, #2 Exhibit B - Letter to Receiver, #3 Exhibit C - Receiver's Subpoena)(Garella, Charles)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 534 ORDER granting #528 Motion/Application for Fees and Expenses for First Quarter of 2016. The Receivership Estate IS HEREBY AUTHORIZED to immediately pay such amounts and reimburse McGuireWoods LLP and FTI Consulting, Inc. for approved expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/30/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 533 ORDER granting #532 Motion for Extension of Time to file a consolidated reply and supplemental brief regarding PaymentWorlds Response Brief until 8/3/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/27/2016. (tmg)
June 23, 2016 Filing 532 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Supplemental Brief Regarding PaymentWorld by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/11/2016 (Orso, Matthew)
June 21, 2016 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets. Motion held in abeyance. Plaintiffs attorney: Kiran Mehta & John Woodman. Defendants attorney: Kenneth Bell, Jennifer Farer, Irving Brenner & Matthew Orso. Court reporter: Jill Turner. (clc)
June 21, 2016 Entry Deleted. Duplicate Motion Hearing
June 21, 2016 Filing 531 TRANSCRIPT of Motion to Dismiss held on 6/21/2016 before Judge Graham C. Mullen. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/19/2016. (Reporter: Jill Turner, 704-350-7495)
June 14, 2016 Filing 530 RESPONSE in Opposition re #469 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Court) to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC by Paymentworld LLC. Replies due by 6/24/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Roman Balanko - Part 1, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Roman Balanko - Part 2, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Roman Balanko - Part 3, #4 Exhibit Declaration of John Thompson)(Garella, Charles)
June 14, 2016 Filing 529 REPLY to Response to Motion re #469 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Court) to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Special Agent Laura Hughes)(Bell, Kenneth)
June 13, 2016 Filing 528 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for First Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/30/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Bell, Kenneth) (Main Document 528 replaced on 6/14/2016) (eef).
June 10, 2016 Filing 527 REPLY to Response to Motion re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Affidavit of Corneliu Popovici)(Mehta, Kiran)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 526 ORDER granting #524 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets. Replies due by 6/10/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/3/2016. (tmg)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 525 ORDER granting #523 Motion for Extension of Time to File Application for Fees and Expenses for the First Quarter of 2016 until 6/13/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/3/2016. (tmg)
June 2, 2016 Filing 524 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Kiran)
June 2, 2016 Filing 523 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
May 31, 2016 Filing 522 RESPONSE in Opposition re #469 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Court) to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC by M.H. Pillars, Inc. d/b/a Payza. Replies due by 6/10/2016 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Woodman, John)
May 27, 2016 Filing 521 RESPONSE in Opposition re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 6/6/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bell, Kenneth)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 520 ORDER granting #518 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #518 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Receiver's Motion Responses due by 6/14/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/26/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
May 26, 2016 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets : Motion Hearing set for 6/21/2016 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(tmg)
May 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 519 ORDER granting #516 Motion for Extension of Time to file Receiver's Application for fees and expenses for the First Quarter of 2016. The Receiver shall have until June 6, 2016 to file his Application for Fees and Expenses for the First Quarter of 2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/25/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc) Modified to correct relationship on 5/26/2016 (clc). Modified on 5/26/2016 (clc).
May 25, 2016 Filing 518 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Receiver's Motion by Paymentworld LLC. Responses due by 6/13/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Garella, Charles)
May 25, 2016 Filing 517 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Kiel Garella on behalf of Paymentworld LLC (Garella, Charles)
May 23, 2016 Filing 516 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Application for Fees and Expenses for First Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/9/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER granting #514 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Court's 4/5/16 Order and Receiver's Motion by Valley National Bank. Responses due by 5/31/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/23/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tob)
May 19, 2016 Filing 514 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Court's 4/5/16 Order and Receiver's Motion by Valley National Bank. Responses due by 6/6/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Cooley, Jim)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 513 ORDER granting #512 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #469 MOTION directing Payza, Payment World, and VictoriaBank to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets. Responses due by 5/31/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/8/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
May 18, 2016 Filing 512 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Receiver's Motion for Turnover and Contempt [Doc. No. 469] by M.H. Pillars, Inc. d/b/a Payza. Responses due by 6/6/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woodman, John)
May 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 511 ORDER granting #510 Motion for Extension of Time to file his Application for Fees and Expenses until 5/23/16. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/13/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
May 12, 2016 Filing 510 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing First Quarter 2016 Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/31/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
May 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER granting #508 Motion for Extension of Time to file Response/Reply re: #469 Motion. Responses due 5/20/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/6/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
May 5, 2016 Filing 508 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Receiver's Motion for Turnover and Contempt [Doc. No. 469] by M.H. Pillars, Inc. d/b/a Payza. Responses due by 5/23/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woodman, John)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting #500 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets. Responses due by 5/27/2016; Payza shall file a Response to the Receiver's Motion no later than Friday, May 6; Receiver shall have until June 14, 2016 to file a reply to PaymentWorld and Payzas responses in opposition to the Receivers motion. Hearing will be Scheduled by the Court thereafter. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/3/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 506 ORDER granting #505 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kathleen Meyers Campbell for Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/29/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
April 29, 2016 Filing 505 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Kathleen Meyers Campbell Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2977452. by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. (Mehta, Kiran)
April 29, 2016 Filing 504 STATUS REPORT for the First Quarter of 2016 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #503 Motion for Extension of Time. PaymentWorld, LLC is granted extension to respond to the Receiver's original and supplemental filings through and until May 31, 2016. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/29/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(stb)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #502 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Valecia M. McDowell, Frank E. Schall and Jeffrey P. Alpert terminated. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/29/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(stb) Modified text to include attorney Jeffrey P. Alpert on 4/29/2016 (eef).
April 29, 2016 Notice to Kathleen Campbell: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 5/9/2016. (tmg)
April 28, 2016 Filing 503 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Receiver's Motion by Paymentworld LLC. Responses due by 5/16/2016 (McDowell, Valecia)
April 28, 2016 Filing 502 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney McDowell, Schall and Alpert by Paymentworld LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Client Consent to Motion to Withdraw)(McDowell, Valecia)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 501 ORDER granting #497 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Lindsey Bowen Mann for Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/28/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
April 28, 2016 Filing 500 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Victoriabank's Motion to Dismiss and Payment World's Response to the Receiver's Motion, MOTION for Hearing on the Receiver's Motion for an Order Directing Payza, Payment World, and Victoriabank to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them In Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets ( Responses due by 5/16/2016) by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Orso, Matthew)
April 28, 2016 Notice to Lindsey Mann: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 5/9/2016. (tmg)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 499 ORDER granting #487 Motion for Limited Modification of Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/27/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
April 26, 2016 Filing 498 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC Notice of Issuance of Subpoena (Moss, Joseph)
April 26, 2016 Filing 497 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Lindsey Bowen Mann Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2973638. by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Kiran)
April 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 496 ORDER granting #492 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to (i) Court's April 5, 2016 Order and (ii) Receiver's Motion (Doc. 385) for Order Directing Valley National Bank to Turn Over Estate Assets and Alternative Motion for Order Directing Valley National Bank to Appear and Show Cause Why it Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violation of Freeze Order Responses due by 5/19/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/19/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 19, 2016 Filing 495 MEMORANDUM in Support re #494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Corneliu Popovici, #2 Exhibit Affidavit of Sergiu Bivol)(Mehta, Kiran)
April 19, 2016 Filing 494 MOTION to Dismiss Receiver's Motion to Turn Over Assets and/or Find it in Contempt, and for Dissolution of February 12, 2016 Order Freezing Assets by Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA. Responses due by 5/6/2016 (Mehta, Kiran)
April 19, 2016 Filing 493 NOTICE of Appearance by Kiran H. Mehta on behalf of Banca Comerciala Victoriabank SA (Mehta, Kiran)
April 15, 2016 Filing 492 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to (i) Court's April 5, 2016 Order and (ii) Receiver's Motion (Doc. 385) for Order Directing Valley National Bank to Turn Over Estate Assets and Alternative Motion for Order Directing Valley National Bank to Appear and Show Cause Why it Should Not be Held in Contempt for Violation of Freeze Order by Valley National Bank. Responses due by 5/2/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ewing, B.)
April 15, 2016 Filing 491 NOTICE of Appearance by B. Chad Ewing on behalf of Valley National Bank (Ewing, B.)
April 15, 2016 Filing 490 NOTICE of Appearance by Jim D. Cooley on behalf of Valley National Bank (Cooley, Jim)
April 12, 2016 Filing 489 Supplemental Memorandum by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC as to #469 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Court) to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bell, Kenneth)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER directing Valley National Bank to file Response re: #385 Motion within 14 days addressing the substantive arguments contained in order. Responses due 4/19/2016. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/5/2016. VNB served by US Mail - William Kamski, 1455 Valley Road, Wayne, NJ 07470(tmg)
March 29, 2016 Filing 487 MOTION for Limited Modification of Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief re #199 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 4/15/2016 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
March 23, 2016 SECOND Notice to Jeffrey Alpert: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 4/4/2016. (tmg)
March 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 486 ORDER granting #480 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement with NewBridge Bank. The Motion and Settlement Agreement (Docs. 480 & 480-1), originally filed under seal pending the Courts ruling, shall be unsealed and shall be accessible to public users on the Court's electronic filing system. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/16/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
March 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 485 ORDER granting #481 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jeffrey Paul Alpert for Paymentworld LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/8/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
March 8, 2016 Notice to Jeffrey Alpert: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 3/18/2016. (tmg)
March 3, 2016 Filing 484 ARREST WARRANT Returned Executed as to Darryle Douglas in re: Civil Contempt. (eef)
March 3, 2016 Filing 483 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank E. Schall on behalf of Paymentworld LLC (Schall, Frank)
March 3, 2016 Filing 482 NOTICE of Appearance by Valecia M. McDowell on behalf of Paymentworld LLC (McDowell, Valecia)
March 3, 2016 Filing 481 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeffrey Paul Alpert Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2925761. by Paymentworld LLC. (McDowell, Valecia)
March 2, 2016 Filing 480 MOTION Approval of Settlement Agreement With NewBridge Bank. Responses due by 3/21/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement Agreement Filed Under Seal)(Moss, Joseph) Modified on 3/16/2016 to unseal pursuant to Order Doc. 486 (tmg).
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER granting #471 Motion for Fees and Expenses by Receiver and his Advisors for Fourth Quarter of 2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/2/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 478 ORDER granting #476 Motion to Seal Settlement Agreement. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/2/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
March 1, 2016 Filing 477 MEMORANDUM in Support re #476 MOTION to Seal by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
March 1, 2016 Filing 476 MOTION to Seal by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/18/2016 (Moss, Joseph)
February 17, 2016 Filing 475 MEMORANDUM in Support re #469 MOTION directing Payza, Payment World, and VictoriaBank to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J) (tmg) Filed Unsealed pursuant to Order doc no 474
February 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 474 ORDER unsealing Memorandum in Support re #469 MOTION directing Payza, Payment World, and VictoriaBank to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/17/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 473 ORDER granting #472 Motion to Unseal Document #469 MOTION to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC, #470 Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/16/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
February 16, 2016 Filing 472 MOTION to Unseal Document by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Orso, Matthew)
February 15, 2016 Filing 471 MOTION for Fees and Expenses by Receiver and his Advisors for Fourth Quarter of 2015 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/3/2016 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth)
February 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 470 ORDER re #469 Motion. The assets are hereby Frozen pending disposition of motion. Copy hand delivered to Matt Orso. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/12/2016. (chh) Modified on 2/16/2016 to unseal pursuant to Order doc no 473 (tmg).
February 12, 2016 Filing 469 MOTION directing Payza, Payment World, and VictoriaBank to turn over Receivership Assets and/or fine them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing and Preserving Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC (chh) Modified on 2/16/2016 to unseal pursuant to Order doc no 473 (tmg).
February 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 468 ORDER granting #421 Motion for Order Directing Sooper Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets. Sooper is hereby directed to turn over to the Receiver proceeds within thirty (30) days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/9/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
February 9, 2016 Filing 467 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #413 MOTION for Order Directing Barksdale Federal Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 413) (Moss, Joseph)
February 9, 2016 Filing 466 DECLARATION re #421 MOTION for Order Directing Sooper Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets filed by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Delivery)(Moss, Joseph)
February 1, 2016 Filing 465 STATUS REPORT for the Fourth Quarter of 2015 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
January 28, 2016 Filing 464 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #417 MOTION for Order Directing S E A Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 417) (Moss, Joseph)
January 28, 2016 Filing 463 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #403 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Chesterfield State Bank Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 403) (Moss, Joseph)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 462 ORDER granting #460 Motion for Settlement agreement with NXSystems. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/16/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 461 ORDER granting #459 Motion for the Court to Exercise Its Discretion and Consider Release of a Portion of the Holdback. The Receiver may immediately release held-back funds as stated in Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/14/2015. (tmg)
December 14, 2015 Filing 460 MOTION for Settlement Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement with NX Systems, Inc. by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Settlement agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
December 11, 2015 Filing 459 Consent MOTION For the Court to Exercise Its Discretion and Consider Release of a Portion of the Holdback by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Receiver's Motion to Release a Portion of the Holdback, #2 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
December 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 457 ORDER granting #453 Application for Fees and Expenses for the Third Quarter of 2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/10/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (jde)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 458 ORDER Darryl Douglas is in civil contempt for violation of Court's order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/10/15. (Attachments: #1 Warrant)(Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
December 10, 2015 Filing 456 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against M & T Bank Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 395) (Moss, Joseph)
December 3, 2015 Minute Entry: SHOW CAUSE HEARING held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Receivers attorneys: Matthew Orso, Irving Brenner, Ken Bell. Court reporter: Laura Andersen. (jde)
November 23, 2015 Filing 455 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 411) (Moss, Joseph)
November 16, 2015 Filing 454 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #415 MOTION for Order Directing Shreveport Federal Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 415) (Moss, Joseph)
November 16, 2015 Filing 453 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for 3rd Quarter of 2015 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/3/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Bell, Kenneth) (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/17/2015, NEF Regenerated) (tmg).
November 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER re: #447 Motion for Order to Show Cause as to Darryle Douglas (Show Cause Hearing set for 12/3/2015 03:30 PM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/3/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
October 30, 2015 Filing 451 STATUS REPORT for the Third Quarter of 2015 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (SFAR), #2 Exhibit B (Receipts and Disbursements))(Bell, Kenneth)
October 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER granting #449 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against M & T Bank. Responses due by 11/24/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/27/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
October 27, 2015 Filing 449 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #395 Motion for Order to Show Cause Against M & T Bank by M&T Bank. (Anders, Amanda) Modified text on 10/28/2015 (tmg).
October 22, 2015 Filing 448 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #419 MOTION for Order Directing Utah Community Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 419) (Moss, Joseph)
October 21, 2015 Filing 447 MOTION for Order to Show Cause Requiring Darryle Douglas to Personally Appear and Show Cause for contempt for failure to comply with Court Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/9/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving) Modified text on 11/3/2015 (tmg).
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 446 ORDER granting #445 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against M & T Bank Responses due by 10/27/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/13/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
October 12, 2015 Filing 445 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against M & T Bank by M&T Bank. Responses due by 10/29/2015 (Anders, Amanda)
October 12, 2015 Filing 444 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Walker Anders on behalf of M&T Bank (Anders, Amanda)
October 9, 2015 Filing 443 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #407 MOTION for Order Directing Credit Union West to Turn Over Receivership Assets Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 407) (Moss, Joseph)
October 5, 2015 Filing 442 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #401 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Bank of Alapaha Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 401) (Moss, Joseph)
October 2, 2015 Filing 441 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #405 MOTION for Order Directing Southwest Louisiana Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 405) (Moss, Joseph)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 440 ORDER granting #439 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against M & T Bank Responses due by 10/13/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/29/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 29, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #433 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Francisco J. Benzoni terminated. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/29/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(stb)
September 28, 2015 Filing 439 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against M & T Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 10/16/2015 (Moss, Joseph)
September 28, 2015 Filing 438 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #387 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Northwest Georgia Bank Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 387) (Moss, Joseph)
September 28, 2015 Filing 437 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #409 MOTION for Order Directing Alaska USA Federal Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 409) (Moss, Joseph)
September 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 436 ORDER granting #430 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against M & T Bank. Responses due by 9/28/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/25/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 15, 2015 Filing 435 REPLY to Response to Motion re #385 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Valley National Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moss, Joseph)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 434 ORDER granting #392 Motion for Order Requiring Return of Receivership Property, Deposition, and Production of Financial Records from Darryle Douglas. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/14/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 14, 2015 Filing 433 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Four Oaks Bank & Trust Company. (Benzoni, Francisco)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER granting #428 MOTION to Stay Receiver's Motion to Enforce Stay of Ancillary Proceedings with Regard to Certain Arkansas Real Property. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/11/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 11, 2015 Filing 431 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #399 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Newton Federal Bank Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc. 399) (Moss, Joseph)
September 11, 2015 Filing 430 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against M & T Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/28/2015 (Moss, Joseph)
September 9, 2015 Filing 429 MEMORANDUM in Support re #428 MOTION to Stay Receiver's Motion to Enforce Stay of Ancillary Proceedings with Regard to Certain Arkansas Real Property by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Brenner, Irving)
September 9, 2015 Filing 428 MOTION to Stay Receiver's Motion to Enforce Stay of Ancillary Proceedings with Regard to Certain Arkansas Real Property by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/28/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 427 ORDER granting #423 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #385 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Valley National Bank. Replies due by 9/15/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/9/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 9, 2015 Filing 426 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #378 MOTION Turnover Receivership Assets or Show Cause Order Against Peoples Bank of Alabama Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 378) (Moss, Joseph)
September 9, 2015 Filing 425 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #383 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against BankFinancial FSB Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc. 383) (Moss, Joseph)
September 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 424 ORDER granting #391 Motion Application for Fees and Expenses for Second Quarter. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/8/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 8, 2015 Filing 423 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #385 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Valley National Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/25/2015 (Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 422 MEMORANDUM in Support re #421 MOTION for Order Directing Sooper Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 421 MOTION for Order Directing Sooper Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Moore)(Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 420 MEMORANDUM in Support re #419 MOTION for Order Directing Utah Community Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 419 MOTION for Order Directing Utah Community Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 418 MEMORANDUM in Support re #417 MOTION for Order Directing S E A Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 417 MOTION for Order Directing S E A Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 416 MEMORANDUM in Support re #415 MOTION for Order Directing Shreveport Federal Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 415 MOTION for Order Directing Shreveport Federal Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 414 MEMORANDUM in Support re #413 MOTION for Order Directing Barksdale Federal Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 413 MOTION for Order Directing Barksdale Federal Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 412 MEMORANDUM in Support re #411 MOTION for Order Directing MAX Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 411 MOTION for Order Directing MAX Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 410 MEMORANDUM in Support re #409 MOTION for Order Directing Alaska USA Federal Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 409 MOTION for Order Directing Alaska USA Federal Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Rex Venture Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Moore)(Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 408 MEMORANDUM in Support re #407 MOTION for Order Directing Credit Union West to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 4, 2015 Filing 407 MOTION for Order Directing Credit Union West to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Moore)(Moss, Joseph)
September 3, 2015 Filing 406 MEMORANDUM in Support re #405 MOTION for Order Directing Southwest Louisiana Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 3, 2015 Filing 405 MOTION for Order Directing Southwest Louisiana Credit Union to Turn Over Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Moore)(Moss, Joseph)
September 2, 2015 Filing 404 MEMORANDUM in Support re #403 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Chesterfield State Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 2, 2015 Filing 403 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Chesterfield State Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/21/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather Montgomery, #2 Declaration of Pamela Moore)(Moss, Joseph)
September 1, 2015 Filing 402 MEMORANDUM in Support re #401 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Bank of Alapaha by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 1, 2015 Filing 401 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Bank of Alapaha by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/18/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather Montgomery, #2 Declaration of Pamela Moore)(Moss, Joseph)
September 1, 2015 Filing 400 MEMORANDUM in Support re #399 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Newton Federal Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
September 1, 2015 Filing 399 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Newton Federal Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/18/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Heather Montgomery, #2 Declaration of Pamela Moore)(Moss, Joseph)
September 1, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #397 Motion for Extension of Time. Northwest Georgia Bank's deadline to respond to the Receiver's Motion for Order is extended through and including September 14, 2015. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 09/01/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(stb)
August 31, 2015 Filing 398 MEMORANDUM in Opposition #385 to Motion for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Valley National Bank of Receiver, Kenneth Bell Concerning Jurisdiction by Valley National Bank. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A) (tmg) Modified text on 9/3/2015 (tmg).
August 31, 2015 Filing 397 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #387 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Northwest Georgia Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/17/2015 (Moss, Joseph)
August 28, 2015 Filing 396 MEMORANDUM in Support re #395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against M & T Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
August 28, 2015 Filing 395 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against M & T Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/14/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Moore, #2 Declaration of Jennfier Keough)(Moss, Joseph)
August 26, 2015 Filing 394 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #381 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Chino Commercial Bank Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 381) (Moss, Joseph)
August 24, 2015 Filing 393 MEMORANDUM in Support re #392 MOTION for Order Requiring Return of Receivership Property, Deposition, and Production of Financial Records from Darryle Douglas by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Brenner, Irving)
August 24, 2015 Filing 392 MOTION for Order Requiring Return of Receivership Property, Deposition, and Production of Financial Records from Darryle Douglas by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/11/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brenner, Irving)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot #311 Motion for clarification. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on August 24, 2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(Coble, Debbie)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot #286 Motion. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on August 24, 2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(Coble, Debbie)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER denying #230 Motion to Lift Stay. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on August 24, 2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(Coble, Debbie)
August 21, 2015 Filing 391 MOTION Application for Fees and Expenses for Second Quarter by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 9/8/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER granting #380 Motion for Extension of Time to File 2nd Qtr 2015 Application for Fees and Expenses. The Receiver shall have until August 21, 2015 to file his Application for Fees and Expenses for the Second Quarter of 2015.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/17/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
August 14, 2015 Filing 389 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Amendment to #385 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Valley National Bank Certificate of Service (Moss, Joseph)
August 14, 2015 Filing 388 MEMORANDUM in Support re #387 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Northwest Georgia Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
August 14, 2015 Filing 387 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Northwest Georgia Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Moore, #2 Declaration of Heather Montgomery)(Moss, Joseph)
August 14, 2015 Filing 386 MEMORANDUM in Support re #385 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Valley National Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
August 14, 2015 Filing 385 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Valley National Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Moore, #2 Declaration of Heather Montgomery)(Moss, Joseph)
August 14, 2015 Filing 384 MEMORANDUM in Support re #383 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against BankFinancial FSB by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
August 14, 2015 Filing 383 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against BankFinancial FSB by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Moore, #2 Declaration of Heather Montgomery)(Moss, Joseph)
August 14, 2015 Filing 382 MEMORANDUM in Support re #381 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Chino Commercial Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Moss, Joseph)
August 14, 2015 Filing 381 MOTION for Order to Show Cause For Turnover of Estate Assets Against Chino Commercial Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Moore, #2 Declaration of Heather Montgomery)(Moss, Joseph)
August 13, 2015 Filing 380 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File 2nd Qtr 2015 Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 12, 2015 Filing 379 MEMORANDUM in Support re #378 MOTION Turnover Receivership Assets or Show Cause Order Against Peoples Bank of Alabama by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
August 12, 2015 Filing 378 MOTION Turnover Receivership Assets or Show Cause Order Against Peoples Bank of Alabama by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 8/31/2015 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pamela Moore, #2 Declaration of Heather Montgomery)(Moss, Joseph)
July 30, 2015 Filing 377 STATUS REPORT for the Second Quarter of 2015 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
July 14, 2015 Filing 376 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #330 MOTION for Order to Show Cause or Turnover Receivership Assets Against Compass Bank Notice of Withdrawal of Receiver's Motion (Doc 330) (Moss, Joseph)
July 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 375 ORDER Scheduling Further Proceedings as stated on #291 Motion for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/9/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
July 6, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #374 Motion for Extension of Time through and including July 14,2015 to file and serve its Reply. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/6/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(stb)
July 2, 2015 Filing 374 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Suport of Motion to Turnover Against Compass Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/20/2015 (Moss, Joseph)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 373 ORDER granting #372 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #330 MOTION for Order to Show Cause or Turnover Receivership Assets Against Compass Bank. Replies due by 7/2/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/29/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
June 25, 2015 Filing 372 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #330 MOTION for Order to Show Cause or Turnover Receivership Assets Against Compass Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 7/13/2015 (Moss, Joseph)
June 24, 2015 Minute Entry: STATUS CONFERENCE held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Receiver: Kenneth Bell. Defendants attorney: Norris Adams. Court reporter: Jill Turner. (tmg)
June 19, 2015 Filing 371 MANDATE of USCA as to #360 Opinion - USCA, #288 Notice of Appeal, (tmg)
June 15, 2015 Filing 370 RESPONSE in Opposition re #330 MOTION for Order to Show Cause or Turnover Receivership Assets Against Compass Bank by BBVA Compass. Replies due by 6/25/2015 (Ferguson, Russ)
June 8, 2015 Filing 369 MEMORANDUM in Support re #368 MOTION for Reconsideration re #365 Order, Set Hearings,,,, Motion for Partial Relief from Court's June 1, 2015 Order by NxSystems, Inc.. (Adams, Norris)
June 8, 2015 Filing 368 MOTION for Reconsideration re #365 Order, Set Hearings,,,, Motion for Partial Relief from Court's June 1, 2015 Order by NxSystems, Inc.. Responses due by 6/25/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael Busher)(Adams, Norris)
June 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER granting #363 Motion for Fees and Expenses for First Quarter of 2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/2/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 366 ORDER granting #364 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements with Plastc Cash International, Brian Newberry, BBN Holdings, LLC and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/1/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 365 ORDER re: #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order (Status Conference set for 6/24/2015 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.) The Court finds it appropriate to freeze and safeguard assets until a final disposition can be made. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/1/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
May 29, 2015 Filing 364 MOTION for Settlement Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements and Enter Proposed Consent Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/15/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 Settlement Agreement, #3 Exhibit Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
May 15, 2015 Filing 363 MOTION For Application for Fees and Expenses for First Quarter of 2015 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 6/1/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H part 1, #9 Exhibit H part 2, #10 Exhibit H part 3, #11 Exhibit H part 4, #12 Exhibit H part 5, #13 Exhibit Index)(Bell, Kenneth)
May 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting #359 Motion for Fees and Expenses for the Fourth Quarter of 2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 05/11/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
April 30, 2015 Filing 361 STATUS REPORT for the First Quarter of 2015 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bell, Kenneth)
April 27, 2015 Filing 360 Unpublished Opinion from Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals as to #288 Notice of Appeal,. 4th Circuit decision - Dismissed. (Attachments: #1 Judgment)(ssh)
April 24, 2015 Filing 359 MOTION for Fees and Expenses for the Fourth Quarter of 2014 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/11/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Bell, Kenneth) (Main Document 359 replaced on 4/27/2015 per chambers) (ssh).
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER granting #357 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jacob P. Zipfel terminated. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/24/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 20, 2015 Filing 357 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. (Zipfel, Jacob)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 356 ORDER granting #355 Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Application for Fees and Expenses for 4th Quarter of 2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/17/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
April 15, 2015 Filing 355 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for Filing Application for Fees and Expenses for 4th Quarter of 2014 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 5/4/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
April 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER granting #343 Motion to Transfer Property to the Receivership Estate by Receiver. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/2/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
April 1, 2015 Filing 353 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #343 MOTION to Transfer Property to the Receivership Estate , #344 Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service #2 - Bella Vita Ltd, #2 Certificate of Service #3 - Bella Vita Ltd)(Orso, Matthew)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 352 ORDER granting #351 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receivers Application for Fees and Expenses for the Fourth Quarter of 2014, The Receiver shall have until April 15, 2015 to file his Application. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 03/27/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
March 26, 2015 Filing 351 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Fourth Quarter Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 4/13/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
March 17, 2015 Filing 350 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #349 Notice of Lis Pendens (Brenner, Irving)
March 17, 2015 Filing 349 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Brenner, Irving)
March 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER pursuant to Rule 502(D) for (I) the deposition of Brian Newberry and (II) the mediation among the receiver, Plastic Cash International, Inc. and Brian Newberry re #324 Order, Set Pretrial Order Deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/16/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
March 13, 2015 Filing 347 Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order Pursuant to Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) by Brian Newberry. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Pearce, Bradley)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 346 ORDER granting #345 Motion for Extension of Time in Filing Fourth Quarter 2014 Application for Fees and Expenses. The Receiver shall have until March 27, 2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/13/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 12, 2015 Filing 345 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time in Filing Fourth Quarter 2014 Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
March 11, 2015 Filing 344 MEMORANDUM in Support re #343 MOTION to Transfer Property to the Receivership Estate by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Brenner, Irving)
March 11, 2015 Filing 343 MOTION to Transfer Property to the Receivership Estate by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/30/2015 (Brenner, Irving)
March 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 342 AGREED ORDER CONCERNING JAYMES MEYER PROPERTY. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/9/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 5, 2015 Filing 341 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Proposed Agreed Order Concerning Jaymes Meyer Property (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Brenner, Irving)
March 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting #336 Motion for Leave of Court to Discontinue Preservation of Certain Receivership Records, Receiver is free to allow Internet Dynamo to release the particular server data specifically referenced in the motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 03/04/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 339 ORDER granting #337 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receivers Application for Fees and Expenses for the Fourth Quarter of 2014, Receiver shall have until March 13, 2015 to file his Application. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 03/02/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
March 2, 2015 Filing 338 MANDATE of USCA as to #320 Opinion - USCA, #223 Notice of Appeal (tmg)
February 27, 2015 Filing 337 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for filing Application for Fees and Expenses for 4th Quarter 2014 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/16/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
February 20, 2015 Filing 336 MOTION for Leave of Court to Discontinue Preservation of Certain Receivership Records by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/9/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1")(Orso, Matthew)
February 20, 2015 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #333 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #333 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #330 MOTION for Order to Show Cause or Turnover Receivership Assets Against Compass Bank Responses due by 3/16/2015. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on February 20, 2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(Coble, Debbie)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER granting #334 Motion for Extension of Time to File Receivers Application for Fees and Expenses for the Fourth Quarter of 2014, Receiver shall have until February 27, 2015 to file his Application for Fees and Expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 02/19/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
February 18, 2015 Filing 334 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time for filing Fourth Quarter 2014 Fee Application by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 3/9/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
February 13, 2015 Filing 333 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #330 MOTION for Order to Show Cause or Turnover Receivership Assets Against Compass Bank by BBVA Compass. Responses due by 3/2/2015 (Wilder, Raboteau)
February 13, 2015 Filing 332 NOTICE of Appearance by Raboteau Terrell Wilder, Jr on behalf of BBVA Compass (Wilder, Raboteau)
February 5, 2015 Filing 331 MEMORANDUM in Support re #330 MOTION for Order to Show Cause or Turnover Receivership Assets Against Compass Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Moss, Joseph)
February 5, 2015 Filing 330 MOTION for Order to Show Cause or Turnover Receivership Assets Against Compass Bank by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/23/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Check Table, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Pamela N. Moore, #3 Affidavit Declaration of Heather L. Montgomery)(Moss, Joseph)
February 4, 2015 Filing 329 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Moss, Jr on behalf of Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Moss, Joseph)
January 30, 2015 Filing 328 STATUS REPORT for the Fourth Quarter of 2014 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, #2 Exhibit B - Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
January 30, 2015 Filing 327 REPLY to Response to Motion re #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Brenner, Irving)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 326 ORDER granting #325 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order Responses due by 1/30/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/22/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
January 21, 2015 Filing 325 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 2/9/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
January 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 324 CONSENT ORDER, ( Mediation deadline set for 3/15/2015.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/12/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 9, 2015 Filing 323 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. re: #317 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Receiver's Consent Motion Regarding Schedule and Potential Mediation (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
January 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 322 ORDER (Sealed - Attorney) granting #321 Sealed Motion (available to: Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/8/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 8, 2015 Filing 321 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) (available to Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) Responses due by 1/26/2015 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Sealed Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
January 7, 2015 Filing 320 Unpublished Opinion from Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals as to #223 Notice of Appeal. 4th Circuit decision - Dismissed. (Attachments: #1 USCA Judgment) (tmg)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 319 AGREED ORDER FOR PREFERRED MERCHANTS' AND JAYMES MEYER'S PRODUCTION OF ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS, DEPOSITION, AND ASSET FREEZE. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/30/2014. (eef)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 318 ORDER granting #315 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order . Replies due by 1/23/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/30/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #314 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #286 MOTION for an Order Directing Plastic Cash International, LLC and Brian Newberry to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing Receivership Assets re: #4 Order. Replies due by 1/12/2015. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/30/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 24, 2014 Filing 316 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. re: #306 Order, #304 Order, Agreed Order for Preferred Merchants' and Jaymes Meyer's Production of Additional Documents, Deposition and Asset Freeze (Brenner, Irving)
December 23, 2014 Filing 315 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 1/9/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
December 23, 2014 Filing 314 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #286 MOTION by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 1/9/2015 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
December 22, 2014 Filing 313 RESPONSE in Opposition re #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order by NxSystems, Inc.. Replies due by 1/2/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration of Michael Busher))(Adams, Norris)
December 17, 2014 Filing 312 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #286 MOTION for Contempt by Brad Pearce, Brian Newberry. Replies due by 12/29/2014 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Unpublished opinion, #2 Exhibit Excerpt from MasterCard Security Manual, #3 Exhibit Correspondence from White Hat Solutions)(Pearce, Bradley)
December 17, 2014 Filing 311 MOTION for clarification #199 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Plastic Cash International, Inc.. Responses due by 1/5/2015 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Martinez, Michael)
December 17, 2014 Filing 310 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plastic Cash International, Inc. re #308 Response in Opposition to Motion, #309 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, (Martinez, Michael)
December 17, 2014 Filing 309 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #286 MOTION by Plastic Cash International, Inc.. Replies due by 12/29/2014 (Attachments: #1 Appendix Exhibit List, #2 Affidavit of Brian Newberry in Opposition to Contempt Motion, #3 Affidavit of Paul Schafer in Opposition to Contempt Motion, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G, #11 Exhibit H, #12 Exhibit I, #13 Exhibit J, #14 Exhibit K, #15 Exhibit L, #16 Exhibit M, #17 Exhibit N, #18 Exhibit O, #19 Exhibit P, part 1, #20 Exhibit P, part 2)(Martinez, Michael)
December 17, 2014 Filing 308 RESPONSE in Opposition re #286 MOTION by Plastic Cash International, Inc.. Replies due by 12/29/2014 (Martinez, Michael)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER denying #303 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #291 Motoin for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to turn over receivership assets and/or find it in contempt of the Court's agreed order by NxSystems, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/16/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
December 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER re #294 Supplemental Memorandum,. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/16/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 16, 2014 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Re #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order. Receivers attorney: Irving Brenner and Kenneth Bell. Defendants attorney: Norris Adams, II. Court reporter: Laura Andersen. (tmg)
December 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #303 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order : Motion Hearing set for 12/16/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/15/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
December 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER directing Jaymes Meyer, personally and on behalf of Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC as its sole member, to appear at the offices ofMcGuireWoods LLP in Charlotte, North Carolina for a sworn deposition on or before December 19, 2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/11/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (klb)
December 9, 2014 Filing 303 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order by NxSystems, Inc.. Responses due by 12/29/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Adams, Norris)
December 9, 2014 Filing 302 NOTICE of Appearance by Norris Arden Adams, II on behalf of NxSystems, Inc. (Adams, Norris)
December 8, 2014 Filing 301 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) by Plastic Cash International, Inc.. Replies due by 12/18/2014 (Martinez, Michael)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 300 ORDER granting #284 Motion Allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/8/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 299 ORDER granting #298 Motion for Settlement Agreement and Order Transfer of Frozen Funds to the Receiver. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/08/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
December 5, 2014 Filing 298 Consent MOTION for Settlement Consent Motion to Approve Settlement Agreement and Order Transfer of Frozen Funds to the Receiver by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/22/2014 (Orso, Matthew)
December 4, 2014 Filing 297 Supplemental Memorandum by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC as to #240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mails between counsel)(Hooper, Thomas)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER of USCA denying Motion for Stay pending appeal as to #288 Notice of Appeal (tmg)
December 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting #293 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #286 MOTION for an Order Directing Plastic Cash International, LLC and Brian Newberry to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing Receivership Assets re: #4 Order. Responses due by 12/17/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/4/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 4, 2014 Filing 294 Supplemental Memorandum by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC as to #240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
December 3, 2014 Filing 293 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #286 MOTION through and including December 17, 2014 by Plastic Cash International, Inc.. Responses due by 12/22/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Martinez, Michael)
December 3, 2014 Filing 292 MEMORANDUM in Support re #291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Heather Difiori, #2 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Michael Busen, #3 Exhibit 3 - Gabriela Phillips Email)(Brenner, Irving)
December 3, 2014 Filing 291 MOTION for an Order Directing NxSystems, Inc. to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find It in Contempt of the Court's Agreed Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/22/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Full Relief, #2 Proposed Order Return of Funds, #3 Proposed Order Freeze Funds)(Brenner, Irving)
November 25, 2014 Filing 290 USCA Case Number 14-2288 for #288 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Manager: Sharon Wiley. (tmg)
November 24, 2014 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Receivers attorney: Irving Brenner, Kenneth Bell, Jennifer Farer. Movants attorney: Vincent Schmeltz, Thomas Hooper. Court reporter: Laura Andersen. (tmg)
November 20, 2014 Filing 289 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #288 Notice of Appeal, (eef)
November 20, 2014 Filing 288 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #283 Order, by Johnny Belsome. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0419-2490059. Use this link #www.ca4.uscourts.gov to retrieve 4th Circuit case opening documents, i.e. Appearance of Counsel, Docketing Statement, Disclosure Statement, and Transcript Order Form. Note: Your Transcript Order Form must be served on the District Court as well as the Circuit Court. (Michaud, Marc)
November 19, 2014 Filing 287 MEMORANDUM in Support re #286 MOTION Memorandum in Support of the Receiver's Motion for an Order Directing Plastic Cash International, LLC and Brian Newberry to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing Receivership Assets by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 May 7, 2012 email from Vantage Payments to RVG, #3 Exhibit 2 May 21, 2012 email exchange from Vantage Payments to RVG, #4 Exhibit 3 May 30, 2012 email from Vantage Payments to RVG, #5 Exhibit 4 May 31, 2012 email exchange between Vantage Payments and RVG, #6 Exhibit 5 May 31, 2012 email from PCI's Newberry to Burks, #7 Exhibit 6 Agreement between PCI and RVG, #8 Exhibit 7 July 5-20, 2012 email exchange between Vantage Payments and RVG, #9 Exhibit 8 August 17, 2012 email from Brian Newberry)(Brenner, Irving)
November 19, 2014 Filing 286 MOTION for an Order Directing Plastic Cash International, LLC and Brian Newberry to Turn Over Receivership Assets and/or Find Them in Contempt of the Court's Order Freezing Receivership Assets re: #4 Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Payment Order, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Freeze Assets, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Contempt Order)(Brenner, Irving) Modified to convert to motion on 11/19/2014 (eef).
November 19, 2014 Filing 285 NOTICE of Appearance by John J. Bowers on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Bowers, John)
November 14, 2014 Filing 284 MOTION Allowance of compensation and reimbursement of expenses by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 12/1/2014 (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H1, #10 Exhibit H2, #11 Exhibit I)(Bell, Kenneth)
November 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER re #260 Objection to Counsels Notice of Attorneys Charging Lien and Request for Order in Aid of Distribution is SUSTAINED and GRANTED, #258 Notice of Attorneys Charging Lien is hereby DENIED and STRICKEN from the Courts docket. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/12/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
November 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER Resetting Hearing, (Hearing reset for 11/24/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/7/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
November 6, 2014 Filing 281 REPLY to Response to Motion re #275 MOTION To Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order re #274 Order on Motion for TRO, by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. (Hooper, Thomas)
November 4, 2014 Filing 280 RESPONSE in Opposition re #275 MOTION To Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order re #274 Order on Motion for TRO, by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 11/17/2014 (Brenner, Irving)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 279 ORDER re #275 MOTION To Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order re #274 Order on Motion for TRO, the Court STAYS its previous Temporary Restraining Order #274 pending resolution of Preferreds Motion to Dissolve, receiver is directed to file a response to the Motion to Dissolve as soon as practicable. The hearing set for November 12 will remain in place unless otherwise ordered. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/03/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 278 ORDER granting #271 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Austin J. Burke for Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/03/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
November 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 277 ORDER granting #272 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brian E. Casey for Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/03/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
November 3, 2014 Notice to Austin J. Burke: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/13/2014. (jlk)
November 3, 2014 NOTICE of Hearing: Hearing set for 11/12/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
November 3, 2014 Notice to Brian E. Casey: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/13/2014. (jlk)
October 31, 2014 Filing 276 MEMORANDUM in Support re #275 MOTION To Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order re #274 Order on Motion for TRO, by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Fannie Mae v. Bell, #2 Houck v. Lifestore Bank, #3 IX ST Portfolio 28, LP v. Shag Dev. Corp., #4 San Mateo Union High Sch. Dist. v. Educational Test Serv., #5 Steele v. Capital One Home Loans, LLC)(Hooper, Thomas)
October 31, 2014 Filing 275 MOTION To Dissolve Temporary Restraining Order re #274 Order on Motion for TRO, by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 11/17/2014 (Hooper, Thomas)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER granting #268 Motion for TRO, Court will conduct a hearing on this matter on Wednesday, November 12, 2014 at 2 p.m. in Courtroom 3 at the Charles R. Jonas Federal Building, 401 W. Trade Street, Charlotte, NC 28202. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/31/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
October 30, 2014 Filing 273 STATUS REPORT for the Third Quarter of 2014 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
October 29, 2014 Filing 272 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Brian E. Casey Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2469013. by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hooper, Thomas)
October 29, 2014 Filing 271 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Austin J. Burke Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2469009. by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hooper, Thomas)
October 29, 2014 Filing 270 Exhibit by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Exhibit to #269 Memorandum in Support of Motion, Exhibit A to Supplemental Affidavit of James Lee Buck, II (Brenner, Irving)
October 28, 2014 Filing 269 MEMORANDUM in Support re #268 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Receiver's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze Memorandum of Law in Support of the Receiver's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supplemental Declaration of James Lee Buck, II)(Brenner, Irving)
October 28, 2014 Filing 268 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Receiver's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/17/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
October 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 267 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TRO re #255 Motion for Extension of Time of the Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/24/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
October 22, 2014 Filing 266 RESPONSE re: #260 Receiver's Objection to Counsel's Notice of Attorney's Charging Lien and Request for Order In Aid of Distribution (Michaud, Marc) Modified text on 10/23/2014 (tmg).
October 21, 2014 Filing 265 Supplemental Memorandum by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC as to #240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Bell, Kenneth)
October 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER granting #263 Receiver's Second Consent Motion for Extension of the Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/20/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
October 17, 2014 Filing 263 Consent MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Receiver's Second Consent Motion for Extension of the Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Responses due by 11/3/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
October 15, 2014 Filing 262 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by A. Cotten Wright on behalf of Plastic Cash International, LLC, Attorney Keith John Merritt and Melanie Dawn Johnson Raubach terminated. (Wright, A.)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #247 Motion to Seal. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/15/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(stb)
October 15, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #242 Motion to Seal. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/15/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(stb)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER granting #259 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements with Insiders and Additional Net Winners. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/14/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
October 10, 2014 Filing 260 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. re: #258 Notice (Other) Receiver's Objection to Counsel's Notice of Attorney's Charging Lien and Request for Order In Aid of Distribution (Brenner, Irving)
October 2, 2014 Filing 259 MOTION for Settlement Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements with Insiders and Additional Net Winners by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 10/20/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Brenner, Irving)
September 29, 2014 Filing 258 STRICKEN **NOTICE by Johnny Belsome of Attorney's Charging Lien (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Michaud, Marc) Modified on 11/13/2014, stricken pursuant to Order Doc. No. 283 (tmg).
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER finding as moot #171 Motion for Extension of Time. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on September 29, 2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(Coble, Debbie)
September 25, 2014 Filing 257 REPLY to Response to Motion re #240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Bell, Kenneth)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 256 CONSENT ORDER EXTENDING TRO. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/18/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 18, 2014 Filing 255 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time of the Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 10/6/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
September 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting #233 Motion for Fees and Expenses for 2nd Quarter 2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/18/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER granting #251 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jennifer Lynn Farer for Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/16/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 16, 2014 Notice to Jennifer Lynn Farer: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/26/2014. (eef)
September 15, 2014 Filing 252 RESPONSE in Opposition re #240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC), #230 MOTION to Lift Stay and for Leave to Commence Lawsuit (REPLY in Support of Preferred's Motion to Lift Stay, Doc. 230) by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. Replies due by 9/25/2014 (Hooper, Thomas)
September 11, 2014 Filing 251 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jennifer L. Farer Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2420671. by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Orso, Matthew)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 250 ORDER granting #248 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) Responses due by 9/15/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 09/04/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
September 3, 2014 Filing 248 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC), #230 MOTION to Lift Stay and for Leave to Commence Lawsuit by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC.Responses due by 9/22/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hooper, Thomas)
September 2, 2014 Filing 247 Consent MOTION to Seal Receiver's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 9/19/2014 (Brenner, Irving)
September 2, 2014 Filing 246 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Memorandum in Support of Receiver's Sealed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze re: #245 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) Receiver's Sealed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze (available to Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) (available to Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Brenner, Irving)
September 2, 2014 Filing 245 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) Receiver's Sealed Motion for Temporary Restraining Order Enforcing the Court's Asset Freeze (available to Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC)Responses due by 9/19/2014 (Brenner, Irving) Modified on 9/4/2014 (eef).
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 244 ORDER granting #227 Motion to Amend Protective Order. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
August 25, 2014 Filing 243 RESPONSE in Opposition re #230 MOTION to Lift Stay and for Leave to Commence Lawsuit by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 9/5/2014 (Brenner, Irving)
August 25, 2014 Filing 242 MOTION to Seal the Receiver's Motion for Contempt Order and All Supporting Documents (Docket Entries 240 and 241) by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 9/11/2014 (Brenner, Irving)
August 25, 2014 Filing 241 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Memorandum in Support of the Receiver's Motion to Find Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC and Jaymes Meyer in Contempt of the Court's Order Appointing Temporary Receiver and Freezing Assets of Defendant Rex Venture Group, LLC re: #240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC) (Brenner, Irving)
August 25, 2014 Filing 240 SEALED MOTION (Sealed - Attorney) for Order Holding Preferred Merchants in Contempt by Receiver for Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC)Responses due by 9/11/2014 (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Farer, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19)(Brenner, Irving)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER granting #237 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jacob P. Zipfel for Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/20/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
August 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 238 ORDER granting #236 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Vincent P. Schmeltz, III for Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 08/20/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
August 20, 2014 Notice to Vincent P. Schmeltz III: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/2/2014. (jlk)
August 20, 2014 Notice to Jacob P. Zipfel: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/2/2014. (eef)
August 19, 2014 Filing 237 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jacob P. Zipfel Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2399269. by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hooper, Thomas)
August 19, 2014 Filing 236 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Vincent P. Schmeltz III Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-2399254. by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hooper, Thomas)
August 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER granting #234 Motion Leave to File Actions Against International Net Winners. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 08/15/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
August 15, 2014 Filing 234 MOTION for Leave to File Actions Against International Net Winners by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 9/2/2014 (Brenner, Irving)
August 14, 2014 Filing 233 MOTION for Fees and Expenses for 2nd Quarter 2014 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G-part 1, #9 Exhibit G-part 2, #10 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth) Modified on 8/15/2014 to change to motion (tmg).
August 8, 2014 Filing 232 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC (Hooper, Thomas)
August 8, 2014 Filing 231 MEMORANDUM in Support re #230 MOTION to Lift Stay and for Leave to Commence Lawsuit by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Belsome v. Rex Venture Group, LLC, #2 In re Resource Technology Corp., #3 SEC v. Private Equity Management Group, LLC)(Hooper, Thomas)
August 8, 2014 Filing 230 MOTION to Lift Stay and for Leave to Commence Lawsuit by Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC.Responses due by 8/25/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Complaint)(Hooper, Thomas)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER granting #210 MOTION to Authorize First Interim Distribution, Establish Record Dates and Set First Interim Distribution Date. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/31/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 29, 2014 Filing 228 MEMORANDUM in Support re #227 Joint MOTION to Intervene and Amend Protective Order by Paul R. Burks, Daniel Olivares, Dawn Wright-Olivares, Alexandre de Brantes. (Cromwell, Brian)
July 29, 2014 Filing 227 Joint MOTION to Intervene and Amend Protective Order by Paul R. Burks, Dawn Wright-Olivares, Daniel Olivares, Alexandre de Brantes.Responses due by 8/15/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Amended Protective Order, #2 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Amend Protective Order)(Cromwell, Brian) Modified on 8/26/2014 (tmg).
July 29, 2014 Filing 226 STATUS REPORT for the Second Quarter of 2014 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
July 17, 2014 Filing 225 USCA Case Number 14-1710 for #223 Notice of Appeal, USCA Case Manager: S. Whiley. (tmg)
July 14, 2014 Filing 224 Transmission of Notice of Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #223 Notice of Appeal, (eef)
July 11, 2014 Filing 223 NOTICE OF APPEAL by Johnny Belsome. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0419-2366277. Use this link #www.ca4.uscourts.gov to retrieve 4th Circuit case opening documents, i.e. Appearance of Counsel, Docketing Statement, Disclosure Statement, and Transcript Order Form. Note: Your Transcript Order Form must be served on the District Court as well as the Circuit Court. (Kilbourne, James)
July 7, 2014 Filing 222 Certified Statement of Chino Commercial Bank, N.A. In Connection With Paragraph 17.C of the Agreed Order Appointing Temporary Receiver and Freezing Assets of Defendant Rex Venture Group, LLC. by Dann H. Bowman. (eef)
July 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER granting #201 Motion for clarification on #199 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/1/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 1, 2014 Filing 220 Surreply as to #210 MOTION by Plastic Cash International, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Ex. A: Claim Determination))(Merritt, Keith)
July 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 219 ORDER granting #218 Motion to File Surreply re #215 Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/1/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 26, 2014 Filing 218 MOTION to File Surreply re #215 Reply to Response to Motion, by Plastic Cash International, LLC.Responses due by 7/14/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Surreply, #2 Proposed Order)(Merritt, Keith)
June 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 217 ORDER granting #216 RECEIVERS REQUEST FOR LEAVE TO INSTITUTE ACTIONS. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/25/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 25, 2014 Filing 216 MOTION for for Leave to Institute Actions by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Orso, Matthew) Modified on 6/26/2014 (tmg).
June 23, 2014 Filing 215 REPLY to Response to Motion re #210 MOTION Receiver's Reply to Plastic Cash International, LLC's Response to Motion to Authorize First Interim Distribution, Establish Record Dates and Set First Interim Distribution Date by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Orso, Matthew) (Main Document 215 replaced on 6/23/2014) (eef).
June 11, 2014 Filing 214 RESPONSE to Motion re #210 MOTION by Plastic Cash International, LLC. Replies due by 6/23/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Raubach, Melanie)
June 11, 2014 Filing 213 NOTICE of Appearance by Melanie Dawn Johnson Raubach on behalf of Plastic Cash International, LLC (Raubach, Melanie)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER granting #209 Motion for Fees and Expenses for the First Quarter of 2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/9/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
May 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting #207 Receiver's Motion to Confirm Appointment of Special Master and Approve Certain Notice Procedures Regarding Proceedings re #199 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/28/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
May 28, 2014 Filing 210 MOTION to Authorize First Interim Distribution, Establish Record Dates and Set First Interim Distribution Date by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Orso, Matthew) Modified to change to event to Motion on 5/29/2014 (tmg).
May 15, 2014 Filing 209 MOTION for Fees and Expenses First Quarter 2014 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth) Modified on 5/19/2014 to change event to motion (tmg).
May 7, 2014 Filing 208 STATUS REPORT for the First Quarter of 2014 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - SFAR, #2 Exhibit B - Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
May 6, 2014 Filing 207 MOTION Receiver's Motion to Confirm Appointment of Special Master and Approve Certain Notice Procedures Regarding Proceedings re #199 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 5/23/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Orso, Matthew)
May 1, 2014 Filing 206 REPLY to Response to Motion re #201 MOTION for clarification #199 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Johnny Belsome. (Kilbourne, James)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #203 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney.. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on April 30, 2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(Coble, Debbie)
April 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER granting #204 Motion for Extension of Time to File First Quarter 2014 Status Report Status Report due by 5/12/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/28/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 24, 2014 Filing 204 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Quarter 2014 Status Report by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 5/12/2014 (Orso, Matthew)
April 24, 2014 Filing 203 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney - Jennifer L. King - by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Orso, Matthew)
April 21, 2014 Filing 202 RESPONSE in Opposition re #201 MOTION for clarification #199 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 5/1/2014 (Orso, Matthew)
April 7, 2014 Filing 201 MOTION for clarification #199 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by Johnny Belsome.Responses due by 4/24/2014 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in support)(Kilbourne, James)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 200 ORDER granting #197 Motion to Approve Compromise Between the Receivership Estate and Internet Dynamo, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER APPROVING DISTRIBUTION PROCEDURESAND CERTAIN OTHER RELATED RELIEF re #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/26/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER granting #196 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief Responses due by 3/21/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/13/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 12, 2014 Filing 197 MOTION To Approve Compromise Between the Receivership Estate and Internet Dynamo, Inc. by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 3/31/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - part 1 of 2, #2 Exhibit A - part 2 of 2, #3 Exhibit B - Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth) (Attachment 2 replaced on 3/28/2014) (tmg).
March 12, 2014 Filing 196 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief by Plastic Cash International, LLC.Responses due by 3/31/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Merritt, Keith)
March 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER granting #194 application for fees and expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/7/2014. (blf)
February 14, 2014 Filing 194 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Bell, Kenneth)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #192 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney John J. Bowers terminated. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/7/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(stb)
February 5, 2014 Filing 193 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Keith John Merritt on behalf of Plastic Cash International, LLC, Attorney James P Cooney, III terminated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter of Consent)(Merritt, Keith)
February 4, 2014 Filing 192 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Bowers, John)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER granting #190 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief Responses due by 2/18/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/4/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 30, 2014 Filing 190 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief by InternetDynamo, Inc..Responses due by 2/18/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Julian)
January 30, 2014 Filing 189 STATUS REPORT for the Fourth Quarter of 2013 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bell, Kenneth)
January 14, 2014 NOTICE of Cancellation of Pretrial Conference scheduled for 1/27/2014 (tmg)
January 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting #186 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief Responses due by 1/31/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/13/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 10, 2014 Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion re #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief Response to Belsome Movants' Reply by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Orso, Matthew)
January 9, 2014 Filing 186 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief by InternetDynamo, Inc..Responses due by 1/27/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Julian)
January 8, 2014 Filing 185 REPLY to Response to Motion re #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief Reply to Receiver's Response in Opposition to claimant's objection by Johnny Belsome. (Kilbourne, James)
January 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER granting #179 Motion to Stay re #171 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines: Further Ordered that the Receiver shall be afforded an opportunity to respond to Key Banks motion in the event that the stay is lifted after the Receiver completes collection efforts on stopped-payment checks. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/8/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 6, 2014 Filing 183 REPLY to Response to Motion re #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief - Reply to Belsome et al.'s Objections - by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Orso, Matthew)
January 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting #181 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief . Responses due by 1/31/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/6/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 3, 2014 Filing 181 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief by Plastic Cash International, LLC.Responses due by 1/21/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cooney, James)
January 3, 2014 Filing 180 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #179 Consent MOTION to Stay re #171 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines (Orso, Matthew)
January 2, 2014 Filing 179 Consent MOTION to Stay re #171 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 1/21/2014 (Orso, Matthew)
December 27, 2013 Filing 178 Letter/RESPONSE in Opposition re #170 Motion for Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief from Chang Fa Hou (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)
December 27, 2013 Filing 177 RESPONSE in Opposition re #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief Objection to the Receivers Motion for Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief by Johnny Belsome. Replies due by 1/6/2014 (Kilbourne, James)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER granting #175 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief Responses due by 1/15/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/27/2013. (blf)
December 20, 2013 Filing 175 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief by InternetDynamo, Inc..Responses due by 1/6/2014 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Julian)
December 20, 2013 Filing 174 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew William James Tarr on behalf of InternetDynamo, Inc. (Tarr, Andrew)
December 20, 2013 Filing 173 NOTICE of Appearance by Julian Hugh Wright, Jr on behalf of InternetDynamo, Inc. (Wright, Julian)
December 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #169 Receiver's Request for Leave to Institute Actions and For Order Setting Initial Conference, ( Initial Conference set for 1/27/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/19/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 17, 2013 Filing 171 Supplemental MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines by KeyBank, N.A..Responses due by 1/3/2014 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Thurman, Frederick)
December 12, 2013 Filing 170 MOTION For Order Approving Distribution Procedures and Certain Other Related Relief by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 12/30/2013 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
December 11, 2013 Filing 169 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Receiver's Request for Leave to Institute Actions and For Order Setting Initial Conference (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
December 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting #166 Application for Fees and Expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/2/2013. (eef)
November 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER granting #163 Motion to Amend/Correct #119 Protective Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/22/2013. (eef)
November 14, 2013 Filing 166 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Application for Fees and Expenses by Receiver for 3rd Quarter 2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I)(Bell, Kenneth)
November 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #164 Receiver's Second Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements and For Leave to Settle Certain Claims Against Net Winners. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/13/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
November 8, 2013 Filing 164 MOTION for Settlement Receiver's Second Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements and For Leave to Settle Certain Claims Against Net Winners by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 11/25/2013 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit List of Proposed Settlements)(Brenner, Irving)
November 7, 2013 Filing 163 MOTION to Amend/Correct #119 Protective Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 11/25/2013 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Receiver's Motion to Amend Protective Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth) Modified to correct text on 11/7/2013 (blf).
October 30, 2013 Filing 162 STATUS REPORT for the Third Quarter of 2013 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Standardized Fund Accounting Report, #2 Exhibit B - Schedule of Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER granting #157 Motion for Filing Claims Relating to Financial Instruments Paid to the Receiver on or After August 1, 2013. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/22/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
October 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #158 Motion to Approve Sale of Certain Real Property and Approving Procedures for Public Auction of Real Property. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/17/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(cbb)
September 30, 2013 Filing 159 MEMORANDUM in Support re #158 MOTION Motion to Approve Sale of Certain Real Property by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B part 1, #3 Exhibit B part 2, #4 Exhibit B part 3, #5 Exhibit B part 4, #6 Exhibit B part 5, #7 Exhibit B part 6, #8 Exhibit B part 7, #9 Exhibit B part 8, #10 Exhibit B part 9)(Bell, Kenneth)
September 30, 2013 Filing 158 MOTION Motion to Approve Sale of Certain Real Property by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 10/18/2013 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A)(Bell, Kenneth)
September 26, 2013 Filing 157 MOTION to Extend Deadline for Filing Claims Relating to Financial Instruments Paid to the Receiver on or After August 1, 2013 re: #144 Order on Motion by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. re: (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth) (Main Document 157 replaced on 9/26/2013) (blf). (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/26/2013) (blf). Modified to change event to motion on 10/21/2013 (tmg).
September 11, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #105 Motion to Seal. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/11/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(stb)
September 5, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting #155 Application for Fees and Expenses. The Receivership Estate IS HEREBY AUTHORIZED to immediately pay such amounts for approved expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/4/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
August 14, 2013 Filing 155 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Application for Fees and Expenses by the Receiver for 2nd Quarter 2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 5, 2013 Filing 154 TRANSCRIPT of MOTION HEARING held on 7-23-13 before Judge GRAHAM MULLEN. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have 5 business days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If no notice is filed, this transcript will be made electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the 90 day deadline. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Policy at www.ncwd.uscourts.gov Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/4/2013. (Reporter: Joy Kelly, 704-350-7495)
July 30, 2013 Filing 153 STATUS REPORT for Second Quarter of 2013 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Standardized Fund Accounting Report, #2 Exhibit B Schedule of Receipts and Disbursements)(Bell, Kenneth)
July 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting #150 Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements and for Leave to Settle Certain Claims Against Net Winners. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/26/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
July 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER denying #84 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/23/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
July 23, 2013 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Re #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Plaintiffs attorney: Brian Michael Privor; John J. Bowers. Defendants attorney: Ira Lee Sorkin; Amit Sondhi; William R. Terpening. Court reporter: Joy Kelly. (stb)
June 28, 2013 Filing 150 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Receiver's Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements and for Leave to Settle Certain Claims Against Net Winners (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 2 List of Settlements)(Brenner, Irving) Modified to motion on 7/3/2013 (eef).
June 21, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER granting #145 Application for Fees and Expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/21/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 18, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. (blf)
June 12, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof : Motion Hearing RE-SET for 7/23/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(stb)
June 6, 2013 Filing 148 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Francisco J. Benzoni on behalf of Four Oaks Bank & Trust Company, Attorney Kirk Alan Parry, Jr terminated. (Benzoni, Francisco)
June 4, 2013 Reset Deadlines as to #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof. Motion Hearing reset for 7/17/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. (bsw)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #147 Motion to Continue Hearing. Hearing on Motion re: #84 Motion to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Threof: Motion Hearing RE-SET for July 17, 2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/4/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(stb)
May 30, 2013 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Intervene (Docket No. 84) by Securities and Exchange Commission.Responses due by 6/17/2013 (Bowers, John)
May 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER denying #80 Motion for an Order Requiring Release of Frozen Third-Party Assets. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/30/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
May 24, 2013 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion re: #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof: Motion Hearing set for June 5, 2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(stb)
May 15, 2013 Filing 145 MOTION by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Application for Fees and Expenses for 1st Quarter 2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth) Modified to change to Motion on 6/21/2013 (tmg).
May 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Approving (I) Claims Process, (II) Setting of Bar Date and (III) Approving Notice Procedures re: #138 Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/8/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
April 30, 2013 Filing 143 STATUS REPORT For First Quarter of 2013 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bell, Kenneth)
April 24, 2013 Filing 142 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. re: #141 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Receiver's Response to Johnny Belsome, et al.'s Objections to Motion for Order Seeking Approval of (1) Claims Process, (2) Setting of Bar Date, and (3) Certain Notice Procedures (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email)(Brenner, Irving)
April 22, 2013 Filing 141 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #138 MOTION Objection to Motion for Order Seeking Approval of (1) Claims Process, (2) Setting of Bar Date, and (3) Certain Notice Procedures by Johnny Belsome, et. al.. Replies due by 5/2/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Michaud letter to Bell concerning potential claimants, #2 Exhibit B-Bell letter to Michaud re potential claimants)(Kilbourne, James)
April 22, 2013 Filing 140 NOTICE of Appearance by James W. Kilbourne, Jr on behalf of Johnny Belsome, et. al. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-List of Interested Parties and Potential Claimiants)(Kilbourne, James)
March 29, 2013 Filing 139 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. re: #138 Miscellaneous Filing Certificate of Service (Bell, Kenneth)
March 29, 2013 Filing 138 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Rex Venture Claims Process Motion (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Bell, Kenneth) Modified event into motion on 4/3/2013 (eef).
March 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting #136 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Shawn R. Fox for Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/29/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 29, 2013 Notice to Shawn R. Fox: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 4/8/2013. (eef)
March 27, 2013 Filing 136 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Shawn R. Fox Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-1960840. by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
March 26, 2013 Filing 135 Miscellaneous Filing by Johnny Belsome, et. al., Jose Chavez, et. al.. Request for Notice (Kilbourne, James)
March 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER re #132 Second Interim Application for Fees and Expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/18/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 14, 2013 Filing 133 Certified Statement of Simplicity Bank fka Kaiser Federal Bank re: #4 Order (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
February 28, 2013 Filing 132 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Second Interim Application for Fees and Expenses (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I)(Bell, Kenneth)
February 26, 2013 Filing 131 Miscellaneous Filing by Securities and Exchange Commission. re: #128 Miscellaneous Filing, Response to Proposed Intervenors "Supplemental Material" (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Privor, Brian)
February 22, 2013 Filing 130 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #80 MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF FROZEN THIRD-PARTY ASSETS by Securities and Exchange Commission. Replies due by 3/4/2013 (Bowers, John)
February 22, 2013 Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #80 MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF FROZEN THIRD-PARTY ASSETS by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 3/4/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Affidavit of Kenneth S. Mitchell-Phillips))(Orso, Matthew)
February 19, 2013 Filing 128 Miscellaneous Filing by Trudy Gilmond, Kellie King. re: #84 Motion to Intervene, Supplemental Material in Support of Gilmond and King's Motion to Intervene and for An Order Dissolving the Appointment of A Temporary Receiver (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - 2012 1099 Forms)(Terpening, William)
February 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER granting #126 Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Fee Application. The Receiver shall have until February 28, 2013 to file his Second Fee Application. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/12/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
February 12, 2013 Filing 126 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Fee Application by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 3/1/2013 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
February 11, 2013 Filing 125 Objection to Receiver's Motion to Compel by Nathaniel Woods. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Envelope)(eef)
February 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying #77 Motion to Appoint Representative of Affiliates. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/7/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
February 1, 2013 Filing 123 Claim by Claimant Elias N. Quintana (tmg)
February 1, 2013 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Michael Privor on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission (Privor, Brian)
January 31, 2013 Filing 121 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Final Liquidation Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Final Liquidation Plan)(Bell, Kenneth)
January 30, 2013 Filing 120 STATUS REPORT for Fourth Quarter of 2012 by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Receiver's Quarterly Status Report, #2 Exhibit B to Receiver's Quarterly Status Report)(Bell, Kenneth)
January 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 119 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/22/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 18, 2013 Filing 118 RESPONSE in Support re #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Trudy Gilmond, Kellie King. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kellie King, #2 Declaration of Trudy Gilmond)(Sorkin, Ira)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting #92 Motion to Compel. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/17/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 17, 2013 Filing 116 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 2/4/2013 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
January 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER denying as moot #73 Motion to Quash. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/16/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 16, 2013 Filing 114 NOTICE by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC re #92 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Recent Movants Notice of Consent to Enter Order Granting Motion to Compel (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
January 11, 2013 Filing 113 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Securities and Exchange Commission. Replies due by 1/22/2013 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit attaching true copy of ZeekRewards website)(Bowers, John)
January 11, 2013 Filing 112 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 1/22/2013 (Brenner, Irving)
January 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #110 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #80 MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF FROZEN THIRD-PARTY ASSETS Responses due by 1/12/2013. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/10/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 9, 2013 Filing 110 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #80 MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF FROZEN THIRD-PARTY ASSETS by Securities and Exchange Commission.Responses due by 1/28/2013 (Bowers, John)
January 7, 2013 Filing 109 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Recent Movants Exhibits A, B and C by Robert Craddock, Fun Club USA, Inc., David Kettner, Mary Kettner, David Sorrells. Replies due by 1/17/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C)(Alexander, Rodney)
January 7, 2013 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #92 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Recent Movants by Robert Craddock, Fun Club USA, Inc., David Kettner, Mary Kettner, David Sorrells. Replies due by 1/17/2013 (Alexander, Rodney)
January 7, 2013 Filing 107 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney E. Alexander on behalf of Robert Craddock (Alexander, Rodney)
January 7, 2013 Filing 105 MOTION to Seal by Paul R. Burks.Responses due by 1/25/2013 (Sussman, Jacob)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting #82 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Ira Lee Sorkin for Trudy Gilmond,and Kellie King. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/2/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #83 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Amit Sondhi for Trudy Gilmond, and Kellie King. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/2/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 3, 2013 Notice to Amit Sondhi: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/14/2013. (eef)
January 3, 2013 Notice to Ira Lee Sorkin: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/14/2013. (eef)
January 2, 2013 Filing 102 RESPONSE to Motion re #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Fun Club USA, Inc., David Kettner, Mary Kettner, David Sorrells. Replies due by 1/14/2013 (Alexander, Rodney)
January 2, 2013 Filing 101 RESPONSE in Support re #77 MOTION to Appoint Attorney ad Litem /Examiner for Affiliates (Responding to Docs 88 and 89) by Fun Club USA, Inc., David Kettner, Mary Kettner, David Sorrells. (Alexander, Rodney)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #95 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #80 MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF FROZEN THIRD-PARTY ASSETS Responses due by 1/11/2013. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 01/02/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(Coble, Debbie)
December 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting #96 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof Responses due by 1/11/2013. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/27/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER granting #94 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #84 MOTION to Intervene; Responses due by 1/11/2013. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/21/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
December 21, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting #97 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #80 MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF FROZEN THIRD-PARTY ASSETS ; Responses due by 1/12/2013. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/21/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
December 21, 2012 Filing 97 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #80 MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF FROZEN THIRD-PARTY ASSETS by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 1/7/2013 (Orso, Matthew)
December 21, 2012 Filing 96 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Intervene and for Order Dissolving Appointment of a Temporary Receiver by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 1/7/2013 (Orso, Matthew)
December 20, 2012 Filing 95 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #80 MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF FROZEN THIRD-PARTY ASSETS by Securities and Exchange Commission.Responses due by 1/7/2013 (Bowers, John)
December 20, 2012 Filing 94 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re: #84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Securities and Exchange Commission.Responses due by 1/7/2013 (Bowers, John)
December 20, 2012 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew E. Orso on behalf of Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Orso, Matthew)
December 19, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents from Recent Movants by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 1/7/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(Bell, Kenneth)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER granting #66 1st Interim Application for fees and expenses by Receiver. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/18/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting #86 Motion for Extension of Time to 1/31/13 for Receiver to file Final Liquidation Plan. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/18/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
December 17, 2012 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION to Appoint Attorney ad Litem /Examiner for Affiliates by Securities and Exchange Commission. Replies due by 1/2/2013 (Bowers, John)
December 17, 2012 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #77 MOTION to Appoint Attorney ad Litem /Examiner for Affiliates by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 1/2/2013 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Kenneth D. Bell and attachments, #2 Exhibit B through E)(Bell, Kenneth)
December 17, 2012 Filing 87 Request for Judicial Notice by Nathaniel Woods. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D)(eef)
December 17, 2012 Filing 86 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Final Liquidation Plan by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 1/7/2013 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
December 14, 2012 Filing 85 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #77 MOTION to Appoint Attorney ad Litem /Examiner for Affiliates by Trudy Gilmond, Kellie King. Replies due by 12/26/2012 (DeAntonio, Matthew)
December 14, 2012 Filing 84 MOTION to Intervene and for an Order Dissolving the Appointment of a Temporary Receiver and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Trudy Gilmond, Kellie King.Responses due by 1/2/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - King Declaration, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Gilmond Declaration)(DeAntonio, Matthew)
December 14, 2012 Filing 83 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Amit Sondhi Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-1869030. by Trudy Gilmond, Kellie King. (DeAntonio, Matthew)
December 14, 2012 Filing 82 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ira Lee Sorkin Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-1869024. by Trudy Gilmond, Kellie King. (Terpening, William)
December 11, 2012 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Support re #80 MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF FROZEN THIRD-PARTY ASSETS AND REQUEST FOR EVIDENTIARY HEARING by Fun Club USA, Inc., David Kettner, Mary Kettner, David Sorrells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L)(Alexander, Rodney)
December 11, 2012 Filing 80 MOTION FOR AN ORDER REQUIRING RELEASE OF FROZEN THIRD-PARTY ASSETS by Fun Club USA, Inc., David Kettner, Mary Kettner, David Sorrells.Responses due by 1/2/2013 (Alexander, Rodney)
December 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #75 Motion to Appoint Receiver. Kenneth D. Bell reappointed as Temporary Receiver.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/3/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
November 30, 2012 Filing 78 MEMORANDUM in Support re #77 MOTION to Appoint Attorney ad Litem /Examiner for Affiliates by Fun Club USA, Inc., David Kettner, Mary Kettner, David Sorrells. (Alexander, Rodney)
November 30, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION to Appoint Attorney ad Litem /Examiner for Affiliates by Fun Club USA, Inc., David Kettner, Mary Kettner, David Sorrells.Responses due by 12/17/2012 (Alexander, Rodney)
November 29, 2012 Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #73 MOTION to Quash Response in Opposition to Motion of Non-Party to Quash Subpoena by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Revised Subpoena to N. Woods, #2 Proposed Order)(Brenner, Irving)
November 28, 2012 Filing 75 Consent MOTION to Appoint Receiver Consent Motion for an Order Reappointing the Receiver by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 12/17/2012 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Reappointing Receiver)(Brenner, Irving)
November 21, 2012 Filing 74 DECLARATION in Support re #73 MOTION to Quash filed by Nathaniel Woods (eef)
November 20, 2012 Filing 73 MOTION to Quash Subpoena by Nathaniel Woods.Responses due by 12/10/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Envelope)(eef) Modified date filed on 11/21/2012 (eef).
November 19, 2012 Filing 72 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Exhibit H to Fee Application (under seal) re: #66 Miscellaneous Filing, by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC; (available to Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC, Securities and Exchange Commission) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H (under seal))(Bell, Kenneth)
November 19, 2012 Filing 71 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Exhibit G to Fee Application (under seal) re: #66 Miscellaneous Filing, by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC; (available to Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC, Securities and Exchange Commission) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit G.1 (under seal), #2 Exhibit G.2 (under seal), #3 Exhibit G.3 (under seal), #4 Exhibit G.4 (under seal))(Bell, Kenneth)
November 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER granting #67 Motion to Seal Document #66 Miscellaneous Filing (Application for fees, exhibit G and H). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/19/2012. (blf)
November 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Extension of Time to 12/17/12 for Receiver to file Liquidation Plan. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/16/12. (bsw)
November 16, 2012 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney E. Alexander on behalf of David Kettner, Mary Kettner, David Sorrells (Alexander, Rodney)
November 14, 2012 Filing 67 MOTION to Seal Document #66 Miscellaneous Filing, by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 12/3/2012 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
November 14, 2012 Filing 66 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. First Interim Fee Application (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H)(Bell, Kenneth)
November 14, 2012 Filing 65 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Liquidation Plan by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 12/3/2012 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
November 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #63 Motion to Treat Preliminary Liquidation Plan as First Quarterly Status Report. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/1/2012. (eef)
October 30, 2012 Filing 63 MOTION Treat Preliminary Liquidation Plan as First Quarterly Status Report re #51 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 11/16/2012 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
October 29, 2012 Filing 62 DECLARATION of Maria Aide Gomez. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Amended Declaration)(eef)
October 25, 2012 Filing 61 Certified Statement of Eagle Bank & Trust Company, Little Rock Arkansas. (eef)
October 22, 2012 Filing 60 Certified Statement of Home Savings & Loan Company of Youngstown, Ohio. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope)(eef)
October 18, 2012 Filing 59 Certified Statement of Grapeland State Bank. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
October 17, 2012 Filing 58 Certified Statement of Southern Bank & Trust. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
October 10, 2012 Filing 57 NOTICE by Citizens Bank & Trust Company: No Account Found re: Freeze of Assets (tmg)
October 9, 2012 Filing 56 Request to be included by Walsh Young and May Causing (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(blf)
October 9, 2012 Filing 55 NOTICE by Pinnacle Bank, Nashville TN: No Account Found re: Freeze of Assets (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (tmg)
October 9, 2012 Filing 54 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Supplemental Filing re: #33 Miscellaneous Filing, #37 Sealed Document, #36 Sealed Document, #35 Sealed Document, #34 Sealed Document, #38 Sealed Document,, by Rex Venture Group LLC; (available to Paul R. Burks, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC, Rex Venture Group, LLC, Securities and Exchange Commission) (Attachments: #1 RVG Assets)(Sussman, Jacob)
October 8, 2012 Filing 53 Exhibit by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Exhibit to #51 Miscellaneous Filing Exhibits 2, 3 and 4 to Preliminary Liquidation Plan (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Bell, Kenneth)
October 8, 2012 Filing 52 Exhibit by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Exhibit to #51 Miscellaneous Filing Exhibit 1 to Preliminary Liquidation Plan (Bell, Kenneth)
October 8, 2012 Filing 51 Miscellaneous Filing by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. Preliminary Liquidation Plan (Bell, Kenneth)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting #48 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jeremy D. Freeman for Rex Venture Group, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/26/2012. (blf)
September 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael J. Quilling for Fun Club USA, Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/26/2012. (blf)
September 26, 2012 Notice to Michael J. Quilling and Jeremy D. Freeman: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 10/9/2012. (blf)
September 25, 2012 Filing 48 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Jeremy D. Freeman Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-1798544. by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC. (Bell, Kenneth)
September 24, 2012 Filing 47 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. King on behalf of Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (King, Jennifer)
September 24, 2012 Filing 46 Document Deleted. Refiled as Doc. No. 47
September 24, 2012 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Irving M. Brenner on behalf of Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC (Brenner, Irving)
September 19, 2012 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Noell P. Tin on behalf of Rex Venture Group, LLC (Tin, Noell)
September 19, 2012 Filing 43 NOTICE of Appearance by C. Melissa Owen on behalf of Paul R. Burks, Rex Venture Group, LLC (Owen, C.)
September 19, 2012 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Elizabeth Bennett on behalf of Paul R. Burks, Rex Venture Group, LLC (Bennett, Sarah)
September 19, 2012 Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Michael J. Quilling Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-1793059. by Fun Club USA, Inc.. (Alexander, Rodney)
September 19, 2012 Filing 40 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fun Club USA, Inc. (Alexander, Rodney)
September 19, 2012 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Rodney E. Alexander on behalf of Fun Club USA, Inc. (Alexander, Rodney)
September 18, 2012 Filing 38 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): re: #37 Sealed Document, #34 Sealed Document, #33 Miscellaneous Filing, #36 Sealed Document, #35 Sealed Document, by Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Paul R. Burks, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC, Rex Venture Group, LLC, Securities and Exchange Commission) (Attachments: #1 REC 701-705, #2 REC 706-720, #3 REC 721-735, #4 REC 736-740, #5 REC 741-745, #6 REC 746-748, #7 REC 749-750, #8 REC 751-755, #9 REC 756-760, #10 REC 761-765, #11 REC 766-770, #12 REC 771-800, #13 REC 801-850, #14 REC 851-900, #15 REC 901-950, #16 REC 951-1000, #17 REC 1001-1126)(Sussman, Jacob)
September 18, 2012 Filing 37 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Documentation re: #33 Miscellaneous Filing, #36 Sealed Document, #35 Sealed Document, #34 Sealed Document, by Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Paul R. Burks, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC, Rex Venture Group, LLC, Securities and Exchange Commission) (Attachments: #1 REC 601-650, #2 REC 651-700)(Sussman, Jacob)
September 18, 2012 Filing 36 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Documentation re: #34 Sealed Document, #33 Miscellaneous Filing by Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Paul R. Burks, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC, Rex Venture Group, LLC, Securities and Exchange Commission) (Attachments: #1 REC 301-350, #2 REC 351-400, #3 REC 401-450, #4 REC 451-500)(Sussman, Jacob)
September 18, 2012 Filing 35 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Documentation re: #34 Sealed Document, #33 Miscellaneous Filing by Rex Venture Group, LLC; (available to Paul R. Burks, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC, Rex Venture Group, LLC, Securities and Exchange Commission) (Attachments: #1 REC 301-350, #2 REC 351-400, #3 REC 401-450, #4 REC 451-500, #5 REC 501-550, #6 REC 551-600)(Sussman, Jacob)
September 18, 2012 Filing 34 Sealed Document (Sealed - Attorney): Documentation re: #33 Miscellaneous Filing (available to Paul R. Burks, Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC, Rex Venture Group, LLC, Securities and Exchange Commission) (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 REC 1-50, #3 REC 51-100, #4 REC 101-150, #5 REC 151-200, #6 REC 201-250, #7 REC 251-300)(Sussman, Jacob)
September 18, 2012 Filing 33 Miscellaneous Filing by Paul R. Burks. (Tin, Noell) (Main Document 33 replaced on 9/19/2012 to correct typographical error - NEF regenerated) (com).
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Aldo M. Leiva for InternetDynamo, Inc.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/18/2012. (eef)
September 18, 2012 Opinion or Order TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting #29 Motion to Seal. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/18/2012. (stb)
September 18, 2012 Notice to Aldo M. Leiva: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 9/28/2012. (eef)
September 17, 2012 Filing 31 NOTICE by Paul R. Burks (Tin, Noell)
September 17, 2012 Filing 30 Miscellaneous Filing by Paul R. Burks. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 9)(Tin, Noell)
September 17, 2012 Filing 29 MOTION to Seal by Paul R. Burks, Rex Venture Group, LLC.Responses due by 10/4/2012 (Sussman, Jacob)
September 17, 2012 Filing 28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Aldo M. Leiva Filing fee $ 276, receipt number 0419-1789348. by InternetDynamo, Inc.. (Jones, Larry)
September 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/14/2012. (eef)
September 10, 2012 Filing 26 Amended Certified Statement by First Premier Bank (eef)
September 7, 2012 Filing 25 Certified Statement of NXSYSTEMS, Inc. (eef)
August 31, 2012 Filing 24 Miscellaneous Filing by Four Oaks Bank & Trust Company. re: #17 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, Certified Statement (Parry, Kirk)
August 31, 2012 Filing 23 Certified Statement of Prefferred Merchants Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
August 31, 2012 Filing 22 RESPONSE from Branch Banking and Trust Company re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(eef)
August 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Amend/Correct #4 Order. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/30/2012. (eef)
August 30, 2012 Minute Entry: MOTION HEARING held before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Re #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Order. Motion granted in part and denied in part. Order to be entered thereon. Plaintiffs attorney: John Bowers. Defendants attorney: Noel Tin and C. Melissa Owens for Paul Burks and Kenneth Bell representing Receiver for Rex Ventures. Court reporter: Laura Andersen. (stb)
August 29, 2012 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Order by Paul R. Burks. Replies due by 9/10/2012 (Tin, Noell)
August 29, 2012 Filing 19 Certified Statement of First Premier Bank (Attachments: #1 Letter)(eef)
August 27, 2012 Filing 18 Miscellaneous Filing by Synovus Bank. Certified Statement in Connection with Paragraph 17.C. of the Agreed Order Appointing Temporary Receiver and Freezing Assets of Defendant Rex Venture Group, LLC (Boone, Brian)
August 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to file and serve certified statement in accord with this Court's Order of August 17, 2012. Extended to and including the 3rd day of September, 2012. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/27/2012. (eef)
August 24, 2012 Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to file and serve certified statement in accord with this Court's Order of August 17, 2012 by Four Oaks Bank & Trust Company.Responses due by 9/10/2012 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Parry, Kirk)
August 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Hearing on #14 MOTION to Amend #4 Order. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2012 11:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/24/12. (com)
August 24, 2012 Filing 14 MOTION to Amend/Correct #4 Order by Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC.Responses due by 9/10/2012 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bell, Kenneth)
August 23, 2012 Filing 13 Statement of Assets held by NewBridge Bank re: #4 Agreed Order (tmg)
August 23, 2012 Filing 12 Statement of Assets held by Charles Schwab re: #4 Agreed Order (tmg)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Magistrate Judge David Keesler is hereby assigned to this case to assist the Court in any matter involving the receivership. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/22/2012. (eef)
August 17, 2012 Filing 8 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Paul R. Burks. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/17/12. (com)
August 17, 2012 Filing 7 CONSENT to Entry of Judgment by Paul R. Burks. (com)
August 17, 2012 Filing 6 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Securities and Exchange Commission against Rex Venture Group, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/17/12. (com)
August 17, 2012 Filing 5 CONSENT to Entry of Judgment by Rex Venture Group LLC. (com) Modified on 8/17/2012 (com).
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Agreed ORDER Appointing Temporary Receiver and Freezing Assets of Defendant Res Venture Group LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/17/12. (com)
August 17, 2012 Filing 3 Notice of Withdrawal of document by Securities and Exchange Commission ***Documents terminated: #1 MOTION to Seal Case- case unsealed. (Chambers notified)(bsw)
August 17, 2012 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet)(bsw)
August 17, 2012 Filing 1 MOTION to Seal Case by Securities and Exchange Commission. (bsw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Rex Venture Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul R. Burks
Represented By: Noell P. Tin
Represented By: C. Melissa Owen
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Bennett
Represented By: Jacob H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trudy Gilmond
Represented By: Amit Sondhi
Represented By: Ira Lee Sorkin
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Represented By: Matthew S. DeAntonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Venture Group, LLC
Represented By: Jeremy Drew Freeman
Represented By: Noell P. Tin
Represented By: C. Melissa Owen
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Bennett
Represented By: Jacob H. Sussman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie King
Represented By: Amit Sondhi
Represented By: Ira Lee Sorkin
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Represented By: Matthew S. DeAntonio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BBVA Compass
Represented By: Russ Ferguson
Represented By: Raboteau T. Wilder, Jr.
Represented By: Jackson Rehm Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Receiver for Rex Ventures Group, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer L. King
Represented By: Nicole S. Giffin
Represented By: Jeremy Drew Freeman
Represented By: Kelly Anderson Warlich
Represented By: Matthew E. Orso
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Farer
Represented By: Jacob Richard Franchek
Represented By: Kenneth D. Bell
Represented By: Shawn Randall Fox
Represented By: Irving M. Brenner
Represented By: Joshua Daniel Davey
Represented By: Joseph W. Moss, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Brian Michael Privor
Represented By: Stephan J. Schlegelmilch
Represented By: John J. Bowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Preferred Merchants Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Vincent P. Schmeltz, III
Represented By: Thomas G. Hooper
Represented By: Austin Jennings Burke
Represented By: Jacob P. Zipfel
Represented By: Brian Eugene Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathaniel Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: NxSystems, Inc.
Represented By: Norris Arden Adams, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Dawn Wright-Olivares
Represented By: Brian S. Cromwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Daniel Olivares
Represented By: S. Frederick Winiker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Alexandre de Brantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?