Belsome et al v. Rex Venture Group LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Johnny Belsome, Timothy Allen, Jody Hinkley, Donald Marcel, Keith Hinkley, Starr Atchison, Edward Thiel, Brett Hunter and Tara Belsome |
Defendant: |
Rex Venture Group, LLC and Paul R. Burks |
Intervenor: |
Kenneth D. Bell |
Case Number: |
3:2012cv00800 |
Filed: |
December 4, 2012 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Charlotte Office |
County: |
XX, Outside State |
Presiding Judge: |
Graham Mullen |
Nature of Suit: |
Securities/Commodities |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. § 78 m(a) Securities Exchange Act |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 30, 2013 |
Filing
56
ORDER denying 47 Motion to Lift Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/30/2013. (blf)
|
September 25, 2013 |
Filing
51
ORDER granting 47 Motion to Lift Stay. Receiver and Defendant Burks directed to respond substantively to the arguments made by Plaintiffs herein within 14 days. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/25/2013. (blf)
|
July 3, 2013 |
Filing
46
ORDER STAYING CASE re: 13 Motion to stay. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/3/2013. (tmg)
|
January 14, 2013 |
Filing
45
ORDER granting 44 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/14/2013. (blf)
|
December 3, 2012 |
Filing
41
ORDER & REASONS: ORDERED that Intervenor Kenneth Bell's and Defendant Paul Burks' Motions to Stay and Transfer (Rec. Docs. 13 , 19 ) are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by Judge Carl Barbier on 12/3/12.(sek, ) [Transferred from Louisiana Eastern on 12/4/2012.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Belsome et al v. Rex Venture Group LLC et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Intervenor: Kenneth D. Bell |
Represented By: |
Judy Y. Barrasso |
Represented By: |
Irving M. Brenner |
Represented By: |
Sarah L. Rubin |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Rex Venture Group, LLC |
Represented By: |
Kenneth D. Bell |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Paul R. Burks |
Represented By: |
Noell P. Tin |
Represented By: |
Jacob H. Sussman |
Represented By: |
Rachel I. Conner |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Johnny Belsome |
Represented By: |
Marc R. Michaud |
Represented By: |
James W. Kilbourne, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Timothy Allen |
Represented By: |
James W. Kilbourne, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Marc R. Michaud |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Jody Hinkley |
Represented By: |
Marc R. Michaud |
Represented By: |
James W. Kilbourne, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Donald Marcel |
Represented By: |
Marc R. Michaud |
Represented By: |
James W. Kilbourne, Jr. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Keith Hinkley |
Represented By: |
James W. Kilbourne, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Marc R. Michaud |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Starr Atchison |
Represented By: |
James W. Kilbourne, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Marc R. Michaud |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Edward Thiel |
Represented By: |
James W. Kilbourne, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Marc R. Michaud |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Brett Hunter |
Represented By: |
James W. Kilbourne, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Marc R. Michaud |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Tara Belsome |
Represented By: |
James W. Kilbourne, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Marc R. Michaud |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?