Watterson et al v. Burgess et al

Plaintiff: Jeffrey Randolph Watterson and Randolph Alexander Watterson
Defendant: Woody Burgess, Jason Green, Frankie Dellinger, Jennifer Hoyle and City of Cherryville
Case Number: 3:2013cv00159
Filed: March 12, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Gaston
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2016 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, ( Jury Trial reset for 1/30/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/26/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
October 25, 2016 175 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 157 Motion for Sanctions. Defendant Jason Green shall serve complete discovery responses on Plaintiff Randolph A. Watterson on or before 11/1/16. Defendant Green shall file a Notice on or before 11/1/16 confirming that discovery responses have been provided as directed herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/25/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
September 7, 2016 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 150 Motion to Compel Discovery. Defendant Green shall provide complete discovery responses to Plaintiff on or before September 12, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/7/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
April 29, 2016 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot in part and denying in part without prejudice 88 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/28/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
February 23, 2016 123 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Court GRANTS IN PART AND DENIES IN PART Plaintiffs' 112 Motion to Appoint Counsel. The Court DENIES 116 Motion to Stay and, based on the new deadlines set forth in Order, DENIES AS MOOT Plaintiffs' ; 120 , 121 Motions for Extension of Time. The Court DENIES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Defendants' dispositive motions 105 , 106 , 107 , 108 , 109 so that they may be refiled in accordance with the new deadlines.The Clerks Office is respectfully directed to send electronic copies of this Order to Susan C. Rodriguez, Matthew E. Orso, and Kenneth D. Bell, all of whom are admitted to the Western District of North Carolina and have registered ECF accounts. The Court hereby extends the discovery deadlines for all parties until Monday, April 25, 2016, dispositive motions until Wednesday, May 25, 2016. This matter will be continued to the mixed trial term beginning September 6, 2016.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/23/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
December 17, 2015 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Motion for Reconsideration re 83 Second Amended Complaint filed by Randolph Alexander Watterson and Jeffrey Randolph Watterson. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/17/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
December 9, 2015 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING in part and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE in part 75 Motion For Order Compelling Discovery From Defendants And Motion For Order Directing Government To Disclose Its Complete Prosecutorial File To Plaintiff. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/8/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
August 11, 2015 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that pro se Plaintiffs shall file an Amended Complaint on or before August 31, 2015; FURTHER ORDERED that pro se Plaintiffs Motion To Correct Typographical Error 63 and Plaintiffs Notice of Defendants Identity 68 shall be DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 08/11/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
July 24, 2015 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 70 Motion participation in mediation. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/24/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
June 23, 2015 69 Opinion or Order of the Court Ordered that the parties shall have up to and including July 31, 2015 to complete mediation and file a report on the results. Further extensions of this deadline are unlikely. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 06/23/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
April 20, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion to Compel production of documents; denying 61 Motion to Compel discovery, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is STAYED until otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 04/17/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
March 13, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 58 Letter. The Court will treat this letter as a motion for reconsideration of his acceptance into the Program. Accordingly, for the reasons set forth in Plaintiffs motion, the motion is GRANTED; deferring ruling on 59 Motion for Production of Documents From Government. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/13/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 26, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs are no longer enrolled in the PSAP. The Court will promptly issue a Case Management Order setting forth the schedule for this case. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/26/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
August 21, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 51 Certification. Defendants' request to bring their respective Rule 12 Motions within 90 days of the entry of a case management order is DENIED; Clerk shall send the pro se Plaintiffs a Notice of Availability of the Settlement Assistance Program. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/21/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
July 28, 2014 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 30 Amended Complaint, Frankie Dellinger answer due 8/4/2014; Jason Green answer due 8/4/2014: FURTHER ORDERED that the parties should immediately conduct an Initial Attorneys Conference and file their Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference no later than Wednesday, August 13, 2014. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/28/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
May 21, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER before the Court on sua sponte regarding service of Plaintiffs Summons and Complaint. IT IS, THEREFORE, ORDERED that The U.S. Marshal shall use all reasonable efforts to locate and obtain service on Defendants. If the U .S. Marshal is unable to locate and obtain service on Defendants, the U.S. Marshal shall inform the Court of the efforts made in attempting to locate them. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/21/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 17, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs SHALL FILE by Friday, May 2, 2014, a new, complete Amended Complaint that includes all claims and allegations against Defendants Woody Burgess, Jason Green, Frankie Dellinger, Jennifer Hoyle, David Hodgkins, Bob Austell, Mike Allred and the City of Cherryville; Further Ordered that Jeffrey Watterson is to file a notice with this Court no later than April 23, 2014, indicating that he joins the instant motion re 19 . Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/17/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
March 14, 2014 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting 3 , 12 Motions for Service of Process, to the extent that the Court is ordering service of process on Defendants Green and Dellinger; denying 14 Motion to Schedule a Pretrial Conference; granting 15 Motion in Limine, to the extent that the Court has allowed Plaintiff to supplement the Complaint; granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion to Amend/Correct.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/13/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 13, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 10 Motion to Compel Production Of Documents From Government. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/13/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/13/2013) (eef).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watterson et al v. Burgess et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Randolph Watterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph Alexander Watterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woody Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frankie Dellinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Hoyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Cherryville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?