Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Mason et al
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: James Harvey Mason
Receiver: Joseph W. Grier, III
Case Number: 3:2013cv00196
Filed: March 27, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Polk
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting 178 Receiver's Motion for Approval of Final Report and Accounting and Dismissal. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/15/2016. (tmg)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting 186 Motion to Seal Appendix to Motion to Pay Funds into Court Registry. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/8/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
April 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER granting 177 Ninth and Final Motion for Compensation to Grier Furr & Crisp,PA, Attorneys for the Receiver. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/5/2016. (tmg)
November 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 173 AMENDED ORDER re 172 Order granting 170 Eighth Motion for Compensation to Grier Furr & Crisp, PA, Attorneys for the Receiver. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/20/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting 170 Eighth Motion for Compensation to Grier Furr & Crisp, PA, Attorneys for the Receiver. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/18/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting 167 Motion for Disbursement of Funds. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/7/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
May 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER granting 155 MOTION for Attorney Fees Seventh Motion for Compensation to Grier Furr & Crisp, PA, Attorneys for Receiver w/Notice. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/4/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 161 CONSENT ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION, CIVIL MONETARY PENALTY AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/23/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER granting 152 Motion to Seal Document 151 Memorandum. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/9/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
December 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 135 Motion for Settlement; granting 135 Motion for Shortened Notice, the Amendment is APPROVED. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/30/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER granting 127 Motion for Attorney Fees, reasonable attorneys fees and expenses totaling $107,316.83 for Grier Furr & Crisp, PA shall be paid from the Receivership Estate. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/22/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER granting 115 Motion Receiver's Application to Employ Special Counsel. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/18/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
October 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER establishing deadline to assert secured claims against asses of the receivership estate, any party asserting a security interest must file a pleading with the Court asserting such interest on or before 12/01/2014. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/22/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
October 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting 86 Motion for Distribution Method and Distribution Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/14/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER granting 89 Motion for Authority to Sue Net Winners. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/9/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER as to 86 MOTION for Claims Distribution Method and Distribution Procedure. (Motion Hearing set for 10/14/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.) Person s wishing to object to the proposed distribution procedure must file their objections with the Court at least ten (10) days prior to the hearing. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/2/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
August 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER, (Status Conference set for 8/27/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/1/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
July 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER granting 77 MOTION for Attorney Fees Fifth Motion for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/31/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 68 Motion Approval of Offer to Purchase and Contract as to Real Property and for Authority to Consummate Sale of Real Property - 2222 Hickory Run, Graham,NC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/24/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting 65 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/8/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
March 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER entered on 59 Motion REGARDING SALE OF REAL PROPERTY - 2222 HICKORY RUN, GRAHAM, NORTH CAROLINA. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/11/2014. (blf)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/23/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 50 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/27/2013. (blf)
December 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting 49 Motion Approval of Offer to Purchase and Contract as to Real Property and for Authority to Consummate Sale of Real Property. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/18/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
November 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 46 Motion FOR APPROVAL OF OFFER TO PURCHASE AND CONTRACT AS TO REAL PROPERTY AND FOR AUTHORITYTO CONSUMMATE SALE OF REAL PROPERTY. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/1/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
September 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/19/2013. (blf)
July 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion For Authority To Sell Vehicles Free & Clear of Liens and Encumbrances and to Deposit Net Proceeds Into Receivership Bank Account. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/18/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
July 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 26 Motion for Attorney Fees, Compensation to Grier Furr & Crisp, PA, Attorneys for the Receiver. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/2/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 24 Motion establishing case procedures. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/12/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
May 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/22/13. (ssh)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to employ. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/8/2013. (blf)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Mason et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Barry Robert Blankfield
Represented By: Joseph A Konizeski
Represented By: Jennifer E Smiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Harvey Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Receiver: Joseph W. Grier, III
Represented By: A. Cotten Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?