US Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Shepherd et al
Plaintiff: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: James Alexander Shepherd and James A. Shepherd Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00370
Filed: June 17, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7:6(b) Federal Commodity Exchange Regulation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINAL JUDGMENT AND CONSENT ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of US Commodity Futures Trading Commission against James A. Shepherd Inc., James Alexander Shepherd. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/30/16. (ssh)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER that the parties file a status report, jointly if possible, within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order updating the Court on the status of the case. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 6/14/16. (ssh)
February 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Lift Stay. Plaintiff's Memorandum is due on or before February 25, 2015. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 2/19/2015. (tmg)
September 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER reassigning related case to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/9/2013. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Shepherd et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Elizabeth C. Brennan
Represented By: Patryk Jerzy Chudy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Alexander Shepherd
Represented By: John Keating Wiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Shepherd Inc.
Represented By: John Keating Wiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?