Ford Motor Company v. Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Defendant: Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC
Movant: Resolute Management, Inc., AIU Insurance Company, American Home Assurance Company, Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania, Granite State Insurance Company, Lexington Insurance Company, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa., Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants and Honeywell International, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00171
Filed: April 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Withdrawal
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Withdraw Reference. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/12/2014. (chh)
May 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Nava Hazan for Honeywell International, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/8/2014. (eef)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added K. Elizabeth Sieg for Ford Motor Company. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 4/25/2014. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ford Motor Company v. Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garlock Sealing Technologies, LLC
Represented By: Garland Stuart Cassada
Represented By: Jonathan C. Krisko
Represented By: Richard Charles Worf, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: E. Duncan Getchell, Jr.
Represented By: Michael H. Brady
Represented By: Karen Elizabeth Sieg
Represented By: Kirk Gibson Warner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Resolute Management, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Favate
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: George Dudley Humphrey, III
Represented By: Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: AIU Insurance Company
Represented By: John S. Favate
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: George Dudley Humphrey, III
Represented By: Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: American Home Assurance Company
Represented By: John S. Favate
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: George Dudley Humphrey, III
Represented By: Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Birmingham Fire Insurance Company of Pennsylvania
Represented By: John S. Favate
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: George Dudley Humphrey, III
Represented By: Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Granite State Insurance Company
Represented By: John S. Favate
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: George Dudley Humphrey, III
Represented By: Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Lexington Insurance Company
Represented By: John S. Favate
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: George Dudley Humphrey, III
Represented By: Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa.
Represented By: John S. Favate
Represented By: Jodi Danielle Hildebran
Represented By: George Dudley Humphrey, III
Represented By: Henry T. M. LeFevre-Snee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Official Committee of Asbestos Personal Injury Claimants
Represented By: Travis Waterbury Moon
Represented By: Trevor W. Swett, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: H. Lee Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Nava Hazan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?