Bazen v. Salem et al
Plaintiff: Tamara Elaine Bazen
Defendant: Jonathan T Salem and USA Logistics, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00289
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Jury Verdict dated 8/5/16. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns.(mga)
July 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 42 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 43 Motion in Limine. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/29/16. (mga)
July 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER that 44 Notice of Withdrawal Of Counsel Katherine T. Armstrong is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/20/16. (mga)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 28 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's claims for negligent hiring and negligent supervision and retention are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a Final Pr etrial Conference on July 26, 2016; and that a trial in this matter on Plaintiff's Count I claim for negligence against Defendants Salem and USA Logistics will be held during the civil term beginning August 1, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 7/116. (mga)
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 39 Stipulation To Amend Caption, and the Clerk of Court shall amend the caption as requested by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/10/2016. (eef)
April 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER sua sponte that Plaintiff may file a supplemental brief of ten (10) pages or less, as directed herein, on or before May 10, 2016. If Plaintiff files a supplemental brief, Defendant U.S.A. Logistics may file a response o f ten (10) pages or less, on or before May 20, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a trial in this matter is rescheduled for the undersigned's civil term beginning August 1, 2016. A Final Pretrial Conference will be held on July 26, 2016,( Jury Trial set for 8/1/2016 09:30 AM in 401 West Trade Street, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler.) Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/27/16. (mga) Modified text on 4/27/2016 (mga).
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING with modification 24 Consent MOTION to Continue Docket Call/Trial , Discovery due by 1/15/2016, Motions due by 1/29/2016, Jury Trial re-set for 6/6/2016, 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlo tte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler) FURTHER ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for October 19, 2015, and the Trial scheduled for October 26, 2015, are CANCELLED. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/02/2015. (jlk)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bazen v. Salem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tamara Elaine Bazen
Represented By: Zachary P. Deason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan T Salem
Represented By: Katherine T. Armstrong
Represented By: William C Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Katherine T. Armstrong
Represented By: William C Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?