Impulse Monitoring, Inc. v. Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Impulse Monitoring, Inc.
Defendant: Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00296
Filed: June 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Gaston
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay, all proceedings in this case are STAYED pending the outcome of Defendants motion to transfer currently pending before the JPML. The parties are directed to notify the Court upon the resolution of that motion. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/19/2014. (jlk)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion to Dismiss ; granting 11 Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/26/2014. (eef)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 8 Motion to Stay. The parties shall report the status of their negotiations through a joint filing within sixty (60) days. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/19/2014. (tmg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impulse Monitoring, Inc. v. Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Andrew Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impulse Monitoring, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Keith Englebardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?