Impulse Monitoring, Inc. v. Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Plaintiff: Impulse Monitoring, Inc.
Defendant: Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00297
Filed: June 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Gaston
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying as moot 15 Motion to Stay re 14 Notice (Other), Pending Resolution of Motion To Transfer. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/17/2014. (eef)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Stay. Parties shall file a joint status report on 12/1/14 and every sixty days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/29/14. (clc)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion to Dismiss ; affirming 9 Memorandum and Recommendations; FURTHER ORDERED that this case is stayed according to the terms established by the Magistrate Judge in the M&R.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/28/2014. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Impulse Monitoring, Inc. v. Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humana Health Plan, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Andrew Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Impulse Monitoring, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Keith Englebardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?