Givens v. Aaron et al

Plaintiff: Leonard A. Givens
Defendant: David Aaron, David R. Mitchell, John Reynolds and John Doe 1-5
Case Number: 3:2014cv00378
Filed: July 9, 2014
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 31, 2016 77 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/31/16. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
February 18, 2016 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion to Strike 59 Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/18/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
December 2, 2015 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion for Court to Isue Subpoena; granting 48 Motion for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Defendants shall have up to and including 1/12/16 to respond to discovery served by Plaintiff in November 2015. Dispositive Motions due by 3/11/2016.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/1/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
August 12, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 08/12/0215. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
June 22, 2015 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff shall have fourteen (14) days from service of this Order in which to either return the filled-out summons forms to the Clerk for service of process on the remaining Defendants or to respond to this Order showing cause for why he has not returned the summons forms to the Clerk for service of process. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/22/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 23, 2015 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 15 Motion for Discovery; granting 16 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 04/23/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
March 10, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs Complaint, re 1 , survives initial review as to all Defendants except Defendant Mitchell.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/10/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Givens v. Aaron et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard A. Givens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David R. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?