Knox v. Bissell Companies, Inc.

Plaintiff: Deborah Knox
Defendant: Bissell Companies, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2014cv00424
Filed: August 1, 2014
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff has until and inclusive of 11/3/16 to file and serve response and any supporting documents to Defendant's 43 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/12/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
July 7, 2015 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 23 Memorandum and Recommendation is REVERSED, and Defendant's 16 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED without prejudice as to reasserting the substance of such argument after the close of discovery in the form of a Motion for Summary Judgment.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/6/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
June 4, 2015 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 Objection to Memorandum and Recommendations, ORDERED that the Clerk of Court calendar Plaintiffs Objections (#24) for the next available Charlotte civil motions day. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 06/03/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
December 8, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED, Plaintiff shall file her first amended complaint within thirty (30) days of this Order, FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Complaint 7 , is administratively DENIED as moot without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/08/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knox v. Bissell Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Knox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bissell Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Shalanna L. Pirtle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?