Oxendine-Bey v. Mitchell et al
Plaintiff: |
Christopher Oxendine-Bey |
Defendant: |
John Mitchell, Terry Lemon, John Brooks, John Aaron, Jane Mims, Jane Roic and John Beaver |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00651 |
Filed: |
November 21, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Charlotte Office |
County: |
Mecklenburg |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank D. Whitney |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 31, 2016 |
Filing
77
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/31/16. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
August 15, 2016 |
Filing
75
ORDER denying 71 Motion to Stay. Furthermore, the Court will enter a ruling on Defendants pending summary judgment motion forthwith. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/15/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
|
January 14, 2016 |
Filing
49
ORDER denying 48 Motion requesting that defendants turn over relevant documents. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/13/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
November 23, 2015 |
Filing
47
ORDER TERMINATING as voluntarily dismissed by Plaintiff 41 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint; granting 43 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss the Motion to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint; denying 45 Motion for Reconsidera tion ; denying 46 Motion to Amend/Correct. The Clerk is respectfully instructed to mail to Plaintiff a Section 1983 form so that Plaintiff can use the form to prepare and submit amended complaint along with a to amend if he so wishes. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/23/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
|
November 6, 2015 |
Filing
37
ORDER denying 35 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/5/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
October 19, 2015 |
Filing
34
ORDER granting 28 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Strike Plaintiffs Second and Third Amended Complaints is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 28). Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/16/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
June 4, 2015 |
Filing
13
ORDER denying as premature 11 Motion to Compel; denying as premature 12 Motion for Admissions. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/4/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
|
May 7, 2015 |
Filing
8
ORDERED, Plaintiffs allegations survive initial review as to Defendants, Plaintiff is required to provide the necessary information for the U.S. Marshal to effectuate service, once the Court receives the summonses from Plaintiff, the Clerk shall then direct the U.S. Marshal to effectuate service upon the named Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 05/07/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?