Bell v. USHBB, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Kenneth D. Bell |
Defendant: |
USHBB, Inc., James A. Moore, Oscar H. Brown and Robert Mecham |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00137 |
Filed: |
March 25, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Charlotte Office |
County: |
Mecklenburg |
Presiding Judge: |
Graham Mullen |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 754 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 28, 2018 |
Filing
40
ORDER granting 39 Motion to Dismiss Voluntarily as to Defendants O.H. Brown and Robert Mecham. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/28/2018. (tmg)
|
June 8, 2018 |
Filing
38
ORDER granting 37 MOTION To Approve Settlements with Oscar H. Brown and Robert Mecham. The Receiver is hereby authorized to perform according to the terms of that Settlement Agreements. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/8/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ams)
|
January 9, 2017 |
Filing
34
ORDER before the Court on it's own motion, ( Jury Trial re-set for 5/15/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/9/2017. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
|
October 18, 2016 |
Filing
29
ORDER (Jury Trial reset for 2/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/18/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
|
September 15, 2016 |
Filing
28
ORDER denying 20 Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment by James A. Moore. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/15/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
|
June 13, 2016 |
Filing
23
ORDER granting 22 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert J. Nice for James A. Moore. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/13/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
|
December 2, 2015 |
Filing
17
ORDER granting 15 Motion for Default Judgment against Defendant James A. Moore. Defendants USHBB and Moore are jointly and severally liable to the Receiver for $13,222,800.93 in damages on the Receiver's Fourth Claim for Relief for unfair and deceptive trade practices, which consists of $4,406,600.31 in damages trebled. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/2/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
|
November 23, 2015 |
Filing
16
ORDER granting 14 Motion to Strike Purported Answer by USHBB, Inc. ; granting 14 Motion for Default Judgment Against USHBB, Inc. The court shall hold a hearing on December 2, 1015 regarding the amount of the damages awarded. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/23/15. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?