Yarbor v. US Airways, Inc.
Plaintiff: Carl Yarbor
Defendant: US Airways, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00253
Filed: June 8, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER before the Court on it's own Motion re: Trial set for Monday, February 13, 2017. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/9/2017. (eef)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER before the Court on its own motion, ( Jury Trial re-set for 2/13/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/29/2016. (eef)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER before the court on it's own motion. The applicable sentence in Section I. Discovery re 6 Scheduling Order; A. Discovery Guidelines be corrected as follows: each party may depose no more than 8 fact witnesses without prior approval of the court.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/20/2015. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yarbor v. US Airways, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Airways, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Yarbor
Represented By: James E. Ferguson, II
Represented By: Tiffany Nicole Mack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?