Yale et al v. Community One Bank
Plaintiff: Albert Yale, Norman Register, Valerie Register, Marilyn Yale, Mary Lynn Van Horn, Marcia Canaday, Jimmy Canaday, Paula Canaday, Edward III Estes, Edward IV Estes, Claggett and Sons, Inc., P3T, Ltd., Thaddeus Claggett and Emily Claggett
Defendant: Community One Bank
Case Number: 3:2015cv00403
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/20/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef) Modified text on 8/20/2018 (eef).
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Motion to Stay Pre-Trial Deadlines and Trial Date and Amend Order Entered May 24, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/30/18. (tob)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER before the Court on the parties oral request made during the hearing held on May 15, 2018, to reset the trial date. For good cause shown, the Court hereby GRANTS the parties request ( Jury Trial RESET for 9/4/2018 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Robert J. Conrad Jr.). Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 5/24/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER before the Court sua sponte regarding the scheduledoral argument for Defendant Community One Banks Motion for SummaryJudgment re 71 . The scheduled oral argument be stayed until the Magistrate Judge renders a ruling on Plaintiffs Motion. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 4/21/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting 53 Motion for Appropriate Relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/25/18. (tob)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/20/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER in case 3:15-cv-00403-RJC-DSC; granting (2) Motion to Consolidate Cases for DiscoveryTrial. All further pleadings to be electronically filed to: 3:15cv403 only. Member Case: 3:16cv63 to be administratively closed. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/11/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
December 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jonathan F. Andres for Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/21/2015. (tmg)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sebastian Rucci for Jimmy Canaday,Marcia Canaday,Paula Canaday, Emily Claggett, Thaddeus Claggett, Claggett and Sons, Inc., Edward III Estes,Edward IV Estes,P3T, Ltd.,Norman Register, Valerie Register,Mary Lynn Van Horn,Albert Yale and Marilyn Yale. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/2/2015. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yale et al v. Community One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Yale
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Register
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Register
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Yale
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Lynn Van Horn
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia Canaday
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Canaday
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula Canaday
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward III Estes
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward IV Estes
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claggett and Sons, Inc.
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P3T, Ltd.
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaddeus Claggett
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Claggett
Represented By: Edward Hughes Nicholson, Jr.
Represented By: Sebastian Rucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Community One Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?