Securities & Exchange Commission v. Bernath

Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Defendant: Lonny S Bernath
Case Number: 3:2015cv00485
Filed: October 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 12:22 Securities Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Securities & Exchange Commission against Lonny S Bernath. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/8/2017. (eef)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Defendant is directed to disgorge funds in the amount of $5,556,941.26, plus prejudgment interest, and is further assessed a civil penalty in the amount of $7,500.00. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/8/2017. (eef)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Hearing re: 11 MOTION for Entry of Judgment , to Set Disgorgement and a Civil Penalty. (Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2016 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen). This case will be removed from the October trial calendar. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/24/2016. (tmg)
January 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; added Robert Mottern for defendant Lonny Bernath. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/4/2016. (jde)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities & Exchange Commission v. Bernath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities & Exchange Commission
Represented By: Joshua Andreas Mayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonny S Bernath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?