Walker et al v. SGB Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Elijah Walker and Crystal Walker
Defendant: SGB Corporation, Government National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC, Does 1-100 and Citimortgage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00607
Filed: December 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 7/11/16. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/11/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 37 Motion to Dismiss ; affirming 45 Memorandum and Recommendations.; granting 20 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Clerk is directed to close this case.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/11/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ssh)
May 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 3 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 5/20/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tob)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER sua sponte re 20 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint . ( Responses due by 2/25/2016). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/16/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker et al v. SGB Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGB Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Government National Mortgage Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rushmore Loan Management Services, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citimortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Julia B. Hartley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?