McGhie et al v. Trustee Services of The Carolinas Substitute Trustee, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Eric McGhie and Shirley McGhie
Defendant: Trustee Services of The Carolinas Substitute Trustee, LLC, Select Portfollio Service, Inc., First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Loan Trust, Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association, Bank of America, First Franklin Mortgage, First Franklin Loan Services, Devin Chidester, Sarah E. Banks, John T. Benjamin and Brock & Scott, PLLC
Case Number: 3:2016cv00044
Filed: January 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/13/2016. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 19 , 21 , 30 , 33 MOTIONS to Dismiss. ( Objections to M&R due by 7/29/2016). ORDER granting 32 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Amended Complaint with Prejudice. The Amended Complaint (Doc. 27) is STRICKEN; denying 36 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/12/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 28 Motion for TRO. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 4/29/2016. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGhie et al v. Trustee Services of The Carolinas Substitute Trustee, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric McGhie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley McGhie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trustee Services of The Carolinas Substitute Trustee, LLC
Represented By: Franklin Lamont Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Portfollio Service, Inc.
Represented By: John Tabb Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust
Represented By: John Tabb Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Loan Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Represented By: John Tabb Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: John Tabb Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America
Represented By: John Tabb Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Franklin Mortgage
Represented By: John Tabb Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Franklin Loan Services
Represented By: John Tabb Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devin Chidester
Represented By: Franklin Lamont Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah E. Banks
Represented By: Franklin Lamont Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John T. Benjamin
Represented By: John Tabb Benjamin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brock & Scott, PLLC
Represented By: Franklin Lamont Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?