GreerWalker, LLP v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: |
GreerWalker, LLP |
Defendant: |
Jacob Jackson, Kasey Jackson, Deril Lees, Sarah Lees, Derek Sanders, Alyssa Sanders and Deril Lees, Jr. |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00235 |
Filed: |
May 16, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Charlotte Office |
County: |
Mecklenburg |
Presiding Judge: |
Graham Mullen |
Nature of Suit: |
Arbitration |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 14, 2016 |
Filing
17
ORDER granting 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction to Enjoin Arbitration. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/14/2016. (tmg)
|
June 3, 2016 |
Filing
14
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Amy J. Pierce for Jacob Jackson, Kasey Jackson, Deril Lees, Jr, Deril Lees, Sarah Lees, Alyssa Sanders, Derek Sanders. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/3/2016. (tmg)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing
7
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles M. Sims for GreerWalker, LLP. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/23/16. (tob)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: GreerWalker, LLP v. Jackson et al |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: GreerWalker, LLP |
Represented By: |
Charles Michael Sims |
Represented By: |
Ashlee Ayers Webster |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Jacob Jackson |
Represented By: |
Robert Adams Blake, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Joe M. Hampton |
Represented By: |
Amy J. Pierce |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Kasey Jackson |
Represented By: |
Robert Adams Blake, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Joe M. Hampton |
Represented By: |
Amy J. Pierce |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Deril Lees |
Represented By: |
Robert Adams Blake, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Joe M. Hampton |
Represented By: |
Amy J. Pierce |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Sarah Lees |
Represented By: |
Robert Adams Blake, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Joe M. Hampton |
Represented By: |
Amy J. Pierce |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Derek Sanders |
Represented By: |
Robert Adams Blake, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Joe M. Hampton |
Represented By: |
Amy J. Pierce |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Alyssa Sanders |
Represented By: |
Robert Adams Blake, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Joe M. Hampton |
Represented By: |
Amy J. Pierce |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Deril Lees, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Robert Adams Blake, Jr. |
Represented By: |
Joe M. Hampton |
Represented By: |
Amy J. Pierce |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?