February 9, 2021 |
Filing
144
ORDER denying 142 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 143 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/9/21. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
March 27, 2020 |
Filing
140
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Edward Brown against Jonathan Baker. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/26/20. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
March 5, 2020 |
Filing
137
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Jury's Verdicts dated 3/4/20. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (clc)
|
February 5, 2020 |
Filing
118
AMENDED ORDER that the parties must be present for docket call and jury selection to take place at 9:00 AM on Monday, March 2, 2020 in Courtroom 1-1 of the Charles R. Jonas Federal Building, 401 W. Trade Street, Charlotte, NC. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/5/2020. (brl)
|
November 13, 2019 |
Filing
108
ORDER granting 107 Consent MOTION Excuse Defendants' Attendance from Court-Hosted Settlement Conference; vacating the 106 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum for 11/19/2019; the settlement conference is rescheduled for Tuesday, 12/3/2019 as set forth in this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/13/2019. (mek)
|
September 24, 2019 |
Filing
104
ORDER granting 103 Motion for Court-Hosted Settlement Conference.The Amended Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan, (Doc. No. 102), is VACATED. The Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum, (Doc. No. 101), is VACATED. The parties shall file a Notice within 20 days of this Order informing the Court whether arrangements can be made for the incarcerated Plaintiff to appear at the settlement conference via teleconference. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/23/19. (clc)
|
August 8, 2019 |
Filing
100
ORDER denying without prejudice 76 Motion for Entry of Default; denying without prejudice 90 Motion for Default Judgment; denying as moot 93 Motion for Hearing; denying without prejudice 94 Motion in Limine. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/7/19. (clc)
|
May 3, 2019 |
Filing
92
ORDER denying 86 Motion for Extension of the Scheduling Order Deadlines ; denying 87 Motion to Compel Discovery; denying 88 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/3/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
|
April 2, 2019 |
Filing
84
ORDER granting defendants Albert Lambert and Lisa Martin's 67 Motion to Strike (Doc. No. 66 Plaintiff's Response to Answer is hereby stricken from the record); denying plaintiff's 72 , 75 Motions to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/30/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
|
November 14, 2018 |
Filing
65
ORDER that the Clerk of Court be instructed to correct the Courts docket to reflect the Defendants full and correct names. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/14/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
September 5, 2018 |
Filing
60
ORDER that The U.S. Marshal shall use all reasonable efforts to locate and obtain service on Defendants Baker and Phillips at Defendants home addresses. If the U.S. Marshal is unable to obtain service on Defendants Baker and Phillips, the U.S. Marshal shall inform the Court of the reasonable attempts to obtain service. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/5/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
|
May 7, 2018 |
Filing
46
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall commence the procedure for waiver of service as set forth in Local Rule 4.3 for Defendants Phillips, Baker, Martin, and Lamburt, who are current or former employees of NC DPS. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/7/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jaw)
|
March 14, 2018 |
Filing
43
ORDER denying 42 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/13/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
January 26, 2018 |
Filing
36
ORDER denying 26 Motion for Leave to File; denying 34 Motion for Leave to File; denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 25 Motion relief from denial of access to courts. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/26/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
January 3, 2018 |
Filing
33
ORDER that the U.S. Marshal use reasonable efforts to locate and obtain service on the Defendants. If the U.S. Marshal obtains the home addresses for the Defendants, the addresses may be redacted from the summons forms for security purposes following service on these Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/2/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
|
December 5, 2016 |
Filing
19
ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 8 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 14 Motion appointment of counsel. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/5/16. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|