McCarter et al v. Stoudenmier
Plaintiff: Michael McCarter and Frances Suzette McCarter
Defendant: James Louis Stoudenmier
Case Number: 3:2016cv00707
Filed: October 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER directing the parties to file a Stipulation of Dismissal in this case on or before December 10, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion In Limine As To General Matters (Document No. 66) and Defendants Amended Motion In Limine To Bar Testimony From Treating Physician Dr. Charles Christopher Kanos, M.D. (Document No. 68) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/9/18. (mga)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying without prejudice 62 Defendant's Motion In Limine To Bar Testimony From Treating Physician Dr. Charles Christopher Kanos, M.D. Defendant may file a renewed motion on or before August 6, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/3/18. (mga)
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER striking documents 53 Excerpts of Deposition Testimony and 54 Excerpts of Deposition Testimony.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs counsel shall, prior to any further filings in this matter, conduct a careful re view of the Local Rules of this Court and the Pretrial Order And Case Management Plan (Document No. 12). Additional filings or conduct that violate the Rules of this Court, the Pretrial Order, the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, or other Orders of this Court may result in sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/13/18. (mga)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER denying as moot 35 Motion to Continue Docket Call/Trial; granting 37 Amended Motion to Continue Trial ; denying without prejudice 23 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 24 Motion in Limine; denying with out prejudice 25 Motion in Limine; denying without prejudice 26 Motion in Limine.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a trial in this matter, if necessary, will be held during the undersigned's next civil term, which begins August 20, 2018. A Final Pretrial Conference will be held on August 13, 2018 Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 4/11/18. (mga)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Counsel for parties shall appear for a Final Pretrial Conference at 2:00pm on April 10, 2018. It is further Ordered that this matter is set for trial during the civil term beginning April 16, 2018 at 9:30am in Courtroom 2-2.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/21/2018. (chh)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Robert P. Foster added for Frances Suzette McCarter and Robert P. Foster. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/20/16. (mga)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCarter et al v. Stoudenmier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McCarter
Represented By: Robert Paul Foster
Represented By: Melissa Leila Louzri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Suzette McCarter
Represented By: Robert Paul Foster
Represented By: Melissa Leila Louzri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Louis Stoudenmier
Represented By: Gregory Charles York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?