Citibank, N.A. v. Jackson

Thirdparty_defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and Carolina Water Systems, Inc.
Thirdparty_plaintiff: George W. Jackson
Counter_claimant: George W. Jackson
Counter_defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00712
Filed: October 12, 2016
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 10, 2017 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Home Depots Motion for Stay of Remand Order Pending Appeal in re 45 Motion to Stay. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/10/2017. (jaw)
March 21, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 23 Motion to Remand, and this case is remanded to the Superior Court of Mecklenburg County; denying without prejudice 32 Motion to Dismiss ; denying without prejudice 11 Motion to Compel; denying withou t prejudice 11 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 14 Motion Realign the Parties; denying without prejudice 16 Motion to Dismiss ; denying without prejudice 17 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/21/2017. (eef)
November 8, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Janet R. Varnell for George W. Jackson. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/8/16. (tob)
October 28, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jack G. Zurlini, Jr for Carolina Water Systems, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/28/2016. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Citibank, N.A. v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: David Glen Guidry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Carolina Water Systems, Inc.
Represented By: William R. Terpening
Represented By: Jack Gerald Zurlini, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: George W. Jackson
Represented By: Rashad Blossom
Represented By: Daniel Kent Bryson
Represented By: Janet R. Varnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: George W. Jackson
Represented By: Rashad Blossom
Represented By: Daniel Kent Bryson
Represented By: Janet R. Varnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Citibank, N.A.
Represented By: Matthew Hilton Mall
Represented By: Charles E. Raynal, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?