Woods-Jackman v. Greater Enrichment Program, Inc.

Plaintiff: Philip Keith Woods-Jackman
Defendant: Greater Enrichment Program, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00718
Filed: October 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 01/10/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (brl)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER that Defendants motion for judgment as a matter of law is granted and this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/10/2018. (jaw)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Denying 32 Motion in Limine. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/4/2018. (jaw)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/11/2017. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woods-Jackman v. Greater Enrichment Program, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Keith Woods-Jackman
Represented By: Brett Austin DeWitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greater Enrichment Program, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?