Thomas v. National Association for Stock Car Auto Racing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John W. Thomas
Defendant: National Association for Stock Car Auto Racing, Inc., National Association for Stock Car Auto Racing, Inc. Loss of License Plan, Petersen International Underwriters Incorporated, Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number 1476378-25 and Disability Management Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2016cv00724
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside State
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re 48 Response to Order to Show Cause, 47 Order to Show Cause. The Court hereby grants the parties request to refrain from dismissing this matter at this time. Should settlement not be completed in this case as anticipated by the parties, this case will move forward as set forth in the Case Management Order. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/16/17. (clc)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 23 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ashley B. Abel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/20/2016. (eef)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mark E. Schmidtke for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number 1476378-25, Disability Management Services, Inc., and for Petersen International Underwriters Incorporated; granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Vance E. Drawdy for Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number 1476378-25, for Disability Management Services, Inc., and for Petersen International Underwriters Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/28/16. (tob)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. National Association for Stock Car Auto Racing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John W. Thomas
Represented By: Rachel Christine Matesic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association for Stock Car Auto Racing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Association for Stock Car Auto Racing, Inc. Loss of License Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petersen International Underwriters Incorporated
Represented By: Karla Turner Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's, London Subscribing to Certificate Number 1476378-25
Represented By: Karla Turner Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Disability Management Services, Inc.
Represented By: Karla Turner Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?