Foodbuy, LLC v. Gregory Packaging, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
Foodbuy, LLC |
Defendant: |
Gregory Packaging, Inc. |
Counter_claimant: |
Gregory Packaging, Inc. |
Counter_defendant: |
Foodbuy, LLC |
Case Number: |
3:2016cv00809 |
Filed: |
November 28, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Charlotte Office |
County: |
Mecklenburg |
Presiding Judge: |
David Keesler |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank D. Whitney |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 4, 2022 |
Filing
122
ORDER that this matter is before the Court on remand from the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit and for the reasons stated herein, the GPI's request for relief under the UDTPA is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/3/2022. (brl)
|
May 20, 2021 |
Filing
113
ORDER AND NOTICE OF HEARING, ( Defendant Opening Brief due by 8/5/2021., Plaintiff's Responsive Brief due by 8/19/2021, Defendant Reply Brief due by 9/2/2021 ), ( Oral/Closing Argument set for 10/5/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.). Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/19/21. (clc)
|
May 12, 2021 |
Filing
111
ORDER/NOTICE OF HEARING Status Conference set for 5/19/2021 02:00 PM in Courtroom #5B, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/12/21. (clc)
|
August 2, 2019 |
Filing
106
ORDER granting 105 Consent Motion for Stay of Proceedings by Bond. The Supersedeas Bond is APPROVED and this matter is hereby STAYED pending the results of the Appeal and Cross-Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/1/19. (mga)
|
September 25, 2018 |
Filing
86
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/25/2018. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (tmg)
|
January 22, 2018 |
Filing
55
ORDER granting 42 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying 44 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; and denying 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that trial shall begin in this ma tter on Monday, February 5, 2018, in Courtroom #1-1 of the Charles R. Jonas Building. The parties shall have 15 hours (7.5 hours per party) to present trial-quality evidence and argument to the Court on their respective claims, counterclaims, and def enses thereto.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties joint pretrial submissions in accordance with this Courts standing orders and the Case Management Order in this case shall be due February 1, 2018. Because this is a bench trial and in light of the Courts understanding of this case following review of the parties dispositive motions, the Court finds that no pretrial conference is necessary. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/22/18. (mga) Modified text on 1/22/2018 (mga). Modified on 1/22/2018 (mga). NEF regenerated on 1/22/2018 (mga).
|
September 5, 2017 |
Filing
31
AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/5/17. (tob)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?