Ollila v. Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Eric Ollila
Defendant: Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc., E. James Ferland and Jenny L. Apker
Case Number: 3:2017cv00109
Filed: March 3, 2017
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 20, 2018 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Ralph E. Labaton is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff, Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/20/18. (mga)
February 8, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 53 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants shall Answer the Second Amended Consolidated Complaint within 14 days. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/8/2018. (jaw)
November 13, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 51 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Jason R. Outlaw is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendants Jenny L. Apker, Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc., and E. James Ferland. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/13/17. (mga)
November 7, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew L. Zivitz for Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/6/17. (tob)
October 17, 2017 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Jonathan Gardner is hereby admitted pro hac to represent Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/16/17. (mga)
June 5, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting with modification joint request for additional time to establish new schedule re 32 Status Report. Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint on or before July 10, 2017. Defendants shall file an answer, or otherwise respond, on or before August 15, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/5/17. (mga)
June 1, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. Frederic S. Fox is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Arkansas Retirement System. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 6/1/17. (mga)
May 26, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Donald R. Hall added for Arkansas Teacher Retirement System. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/26/17. (ejb)
May 8, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Consolidating Cases for Discovery &Trial. The court will make a determination regarding the appointment of lead plaintiff after allowing for a period for potential responses. The proposed lead plaintiffs may file respon ses to the pending Motion regarding the appointment of lead plaintiff (#7 & #10) until, and inclusive of, May 16, 2017. All further pleadings to be docketed to: 3:17cv109. Member Case: 3:17cv125 to be administratively closed. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/8/2017. (chh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ollila v. Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ollila
Represented By: L. Bruce McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. James Ferland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny L. Apker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?