Hollar v. USA
Plaintiff: Laura Hollar
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2017cv00170
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sean J. O'Bryan for Laura Hollar. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 06/20/2018. (brl)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 16 Consent Motion to Extend the Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan Deadlines. Discovery due by 10/31/2018. Motions due by 11/23/2018. Mediation deadline set for 11/23/2018. Bench Trial set for 3/11/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/7/2018. (jaw)
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting 17 Stipulation For Leave to File Redacted Version of Doc. 16-1. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/30/2018. Plaintiffs counsel shall file a redacted version of the document within 7 days of the entry of this Order, and Doc. No. 16-1 shall be sealed. (jaw) Modified text on 1/30/2018 (jaw).
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting 7 Motion Special Admission Of Out-Of-State Attorney Sean D. Houseal. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/24/17. (mga)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Dennis O'Bryan for Laura Hollar. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/29/2017. (eef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hollar v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Hollar
Represented By: Howard Clay Hodges, Jr.
Represented By: Dennis O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?