Locke v. Solomon et al
Plaintiff: |
Kareem Locke |
Defendant: |
George Solomon, Christopher Rich, Kenneth Diggs, Samantha Horne, Daniel Hatley and Benjamin A. Carver |
Case Number: |
3:2017cv00337 |
Filed: |
June 21, 2017 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Charlotte Office |
County: |
Anson |
Presiding Judge: |
Frank D. Whitney |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 25, 2020 |
Filing
84
CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 02/25/2020. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ctb)
|
January 30, 2020 |
Filing
81
ORDER denying 62 Motion to Amend/Correct and 62 Motion to Join Parties. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 01/30/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ctb)
|
October 31, 2018 |
Filing
48
ORDER granting 38 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Defendant Carver as party to this action. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/31/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
|
August 17, 2018 |
Filing
46
ORDER that the Clerk is respectfully instructed to provide a copy of the Complaint (Doc. No. 1), the Sealed Notice containing Defendant Hornes last known home address (Doc. No. 44), and this Order to the U.S. Marshal who shall use all reasonable efforts to locate and obtain personal service on Defendant Horne at Defendants home address. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/17/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
|
April 26, 2018 |
Filing
34
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall commence the procedure for waiver of service as set forth in Local Rule 4.3 for Defendant Samantha Horne, who is a current or former employee of NC DPS.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/25/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
April 25, 2018 |
Filing
32
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 21 Motion for leave to conduct discovery; denying 22 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 24 Motion for Protective Order; denying 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/24/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
November 14, 2017 |
Filing
7
ORDER Plaintiff's Complaint (Doc. No. 1) survives initial review in accordance with the terms of this order; The Clerk of Court shall terminate George Solomon, Christopher Rich, and Kenneth Diggs as defendants in this act ion; The Clerk shall send Plaintiff summons forms to fill out so that service may be made on the remaining defendants; Plaintiff shall complete and return the summons forms to the Clerk of Court within 15 days of entrance of this Order; Once the Cour t receives the summons forms, the U.S. Marshal shall effectuate service on Defendants in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/13/17. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?