Federal Trade Commission v. ACDI Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Defendant: Anthony Swatsworth, ACDI Group, LLC and Solutions to Portfolios, LLC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00340
Filed: June 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Commercial/ICC Rates/etc.
Cause of Action: 15:0053
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that the following documents shall be filed under seal until further Order of this Court: Doc# 66 and all future status reports that contain personal identifiers of non-parties. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/10/2018. (jaw)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Granting 61 Motion to Seal Document 60 Status Report. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/19/2018. (jaw)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support. (Defendant Brief due by 9/6/2018; Government Brief due by 9/13/2018) Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/24/2018. (jaw)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Court will rule on the remedy for the found violations following the hearing set for August 23, 2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/22/2018. (eef)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memorandum in Support. Status Conference is RESET for 8/23/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/9/2018. (jaw)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - Status Conference set for 8/21/2018 10:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Chambers will notify counsel in advance of the hearing of which courtroom will be used. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/8/2018. (jaw)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - Jury Trial Continued. (date to be determined) Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/7/2018. (jaw)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Setting Supplemental Briefing re 24 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Supplemental Briefs due 5/18/2018. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/3/2018. (jaw)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 35 Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/18/2018. (eef)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER, ( Jury Trial Reset for 7/16/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.) Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 4/9/2018. (jaw)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER, ( Jury Trial reset for 5/14/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2-2, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.) Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/26/2018. (jaw)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 15 Motion to Compel. Defendants shall have fourteen (14) day to produce documents. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/8/17. (mga)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FIRST AMENDED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/24/17. (mga)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Federal Trade Commission v. ACDI Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Trade Commission
Represented By: Nikhil Singhvi
Represented By: Michael David White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Swatsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ACDI Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solutions to Portfolios, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?