April 30, 2021 |
Filing
100
ORDER denying Plaintiff's 98 Motion for Writ of Mandamus, which the Court construes as a motion to enforce settlement. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/30/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(khm)
|
January 15, 2021 |
Filing
94
ORDER/Report of Mediation: Agreement was reached as to all issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/14/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf)
|
January 7, 2021 |
Filing
93
ORDER: Defendants' 92 Motion to Excuse Attendance of Individual Defendants is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as specified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 1/7/2021. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf)
|
December 30, 2020 |
Filing
91
ORDER: A judicial settlement conference is set for 1/14/2021 beginning at 9:30 a.m. BY TELEPHONE before Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf. Any request seeking permission to modify the terms of this Order shall be filed no later than 1/7/2021 or be subject to summary denial. (See Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge W. Carleton Metcalf on 12/29/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail and Captain Hartley served via e-mail.) (maf)
|
December 8, 2020 |
Filing
88
ORDER: Defendants shall notify the Court within 14 days of this Order whether they consent to a judicial settlement conference in this matter. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/7/2020. (Response to this Order due by 12/22/2020.) (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (maf)
|
November 4, 2020 |
Filing
86
ORDER that this matter will proceed to trial as set on or after 3/08/2021 in accordance with the previous 83 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan of this Court. Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/03/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
October 1, 2020 |
Filing
85
ORDER denying without prejudice Pltf's 84 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel; and the parties shall notify the Court within 14 days of this Order whether they consent to a judicial settlement conference in this matter. ( Response due by 10/15/2020 ). Signed by Chief Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/01/2020. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
|
October 25, 2019 |
Filing
67
ORDER granting 54 Defendant Hooks' Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Defendant Hooks is dismissed as a Defendant. The remaining Defendants shall remain in the this action, with dispositive motions due on December 6, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/25/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mga)
|
October 10, 2019 |
Filing
66
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/9/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
|
June 18, 2019 |
Filing
43
ORDER that the U.S. Marshal shall use reasonable efforts to locate and obtain service on Defendants Barrett and Hooks in accordance with Rule 4. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/18/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
May 14, 2019 |
Filing
37
ORDER that the Clerk of Court will send a copy of this Order and Docket No. 21 to the U.S. Marshals Service. The U.S. Marshal shall use reasonable efforts to locate and obtain service on Defendants Hatley and Parks in accordan ce with Rule 4. The Clerk of Court will send a copy of this order to the NCDPS. The NCDPS will file a notice relative to Defendants Hooks and Barrett in accordance with the terms of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/13/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
March 18, 2019 |
Filing
32
ORDER that the Waivers of Service of Summons for Defendants are deemed timely filed as of the date of this Order. It is further ordered that the North Carolina Attorney General shall have up to and including March 25, 2019, to : (1) complete an investigation into whether the Attorney Generals Office will provide a defense for Defendants; and (2) if a defense will be provided for Defendants, to enter a notice of appearance and an answer or other responsive pleading. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 3/18/19. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
September 13, 2018 |
Filing
17
ORDER granting 16 Motion to Substitute Party. Eyho A. Parks, Amba E. Totou, Regina S. Hooks, Charlene G. Barrett, Oluwafuluke Abisogun and Winnie Kairuki added.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 9/12/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
August 2, 2018 |
Filing
13
ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall commence the procedure for waiver of service as set forth in Local Rule 4.3 for Defendants, who are current or former employees of NCDPS. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 8/2/18. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(clc)
|
January 10, 2018 |
Filing
9
ORDER denying 5 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying as moot 6 Motion to Add Defendants; FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days in which to amend the Complaint in accordance with this order. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 1/9/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
|