United States of America v. Approximately $2,061.22 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXXX-XXXX-1340 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $2,061.22 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXXX-XXXX-1340, Approximately $447.46 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXXXXXXX5965, One 2009 Harley Davidson Model FLSTC, VIN 1HD1BW5159Y026948, One 2003 Harley Davidson Model FLSTSI ANNIV, VIN 1HD1BYB403Y019956, One 2012 Harley Davidson Model FLSTSE3, VIN 1HD1PY910CB954510, One 2014 Harley Davidson Model FLHRSE, VIN 1HD1PG812EB950425, One 2013 Harley Davidson Model FLHTCUSE, VIN 1HD1PR810DB952796, One 2014 Harley Davidson Model VRSCF, VIN 1HD1HPH10DC802263, One 2014 Harley Davidson Model FLS SLIM VIN 1HD1JRV14EB028899, One 2015 Harley Davidson Model FLHXSE, VIN 1HD1PXN15FB954815, One 2017 Harley Davidson Model FLHXSE CVO STR, VIN 1HD1PXF1XHB954049, One 2013 LEXUS GS350, VIN JTHBE1BL2D5003979, The real property at 127 Douglas Heights, # 14, Union, South Carolina, The real property at 104 Smith Drive, Union, South Carolina, The real property at 1911 Smith Road, Newberry, South Carolina, The real property at 4007 Timber Crossing Drive, Rock Hill, South Carolina, The real property at 127 Douglas Heights, # 13, Union, South Carolina and The real property at 1919 Smith Road, Newberry, South Carolina
Case Number: 3:2017cv00635
Filed: October 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting 16 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/25/2018. (jaw)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Dismiss Certain Property from Complaint for Forfeiture in Rem - One 2017 Harley Davidson Model FLHXSE CVO STR, VIN 1HD1PXF1XHB954049, titled to Albert V. Strong. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/26/2018. (jaw)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting 10 Consent Motion for Third Party Claim re: The real property at 1919 Smith Road, Newberry, South Carolina as to Claimant PennyMac Corp. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/14/2018. (jaw)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $2,061.22 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXXX-XXXX-1340 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $2,061.22 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXXX-XXXX-1340
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $447.46 in funds seized from Bank of America Account XXXXXXXX5965
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2009 Harley Davidson Model FLSTC, VIN 1HD1BW5159Y026948
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2003 Harley Davidson Model FLSTSI ANNIV, VIN 1HD1BYB403Y019956
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2012 Harley Davidson Model FLSTSE3, VIN 1HD1PY910CB954510
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2014 Harley Davidson Model FLHRSE, VIN 1HD1PG812EB950425
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2013 Harley Davidson Model FLHTCUSE, VIN 1HD1PR810DB952796
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2014 Harley Davidson Model VRSCF, VIN 1HD1HPH10DC802263
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2014 Harley Davidson Model FLS SLIM VIN 1HD1JRV14EB028899
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2015 Harley Davidson Model FLHXSE, VIN 1HD1PXN15FB954815
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2017 Harley Davidson Model FLHXSE CVO STR, VIN 1HD1PXF1XHB954049
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2013 LEXUS GS350, VIN JTHBE1BL2D5003979
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property at 127 Douglas Heights, # 14, Union, South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property at 104 Smith Drive, Union, South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property at 1911 Smith Road, Newberry, South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property at 4007 Timber Crossing Drive, Rock Hill, South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property at 127 Douglas Heights, # 13, Union, South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The real property at 1919 Smith Road, Newberry, South Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?