Greene v. Mullis et al
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Greene
Defendant: Kevin R. Mullis and Town of Lilesville, NC
Case Number: 3:2017cv00638
Filed: October 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Anson
Presiding Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 126 PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 125 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/7/23. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 115 Motion to Enforce Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/7/2023. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nvc)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/19/2023. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
November 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting 101 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum and Motion for Court to Order the U.S. Marshall Service to Effect Service. The Clerk is directed to mail Plaintiff six copies of the form for Subpoenas Duces Tecum (Form AO 88B). Plaintiff shall fully complete the Subpoenas and return them to the Clerk. The Clerk shall issue the Subpoenas Duces Tecum. The Clerk shall deliver to the U.S. Marshal a copy of this Order and the Subpoenas issued. The Marshal shall serve the Subpoenas pursuant to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/17/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying 89 Pro Se Motion for Scheduling Order and Motion for the Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/9/2022. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(mek)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 3/21/2019. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER administratively denying as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss; administratively denying as moot 14 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 22 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/7/18. (tob)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER administratively denying as moot without prejudice 3 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/21/17. (tob)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. Mullis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Lee Greene
Represented By: Charles R. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin R. Mullis
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Lilesville, NC
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?