Allen et al v. Express Courier International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: |
Norris Allen, Jerry Dixon, Eric Holmberg, Rodney Miller and Ron Rollins |
Defendant: |
Express Courier International, Inc. and EMP LSO Holding Corporation |
Case Number: |
3:2018cv00028 |
Filed: |
January 18, 2018 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Charlotte Office |
County: |
Mecklenburg |
Presiding Judge: |
David S. Cayer |
Presiding Judge: |
Max O. Cogburn |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 17, 2020 |
Filing
40
ORDER granting 39 Joint Motion to Transfer Venue to Finalize Settlement. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/17/2020. (mek)
|
May 31, 2019 |
Filing
35
ORDER re 34 Status Report. All deadlines in this matter are hereby held inabeyance pending settlement by the parties. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/31/2019. (ams)
|
December 19, 2018 |
Filing
33
ORDER granting 32 Motion to stay litigation to permit the parties to participate in mediation. Action is stayed until 3/1/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/19/18. (tob)
|
September 4, 2018 |
Filing
29
ORDER granting 28 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Josh Sanford for Norris Allen,Jerry Dixon,Eric Holmberg,Rodney Miller, Ron Rollins. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 09/04/2018. (brl)
|
August 1, 2018 |
Filing
26
MDL ORDER denying transfer as to MDL No. 2854 In Re: Express Courier International Inc Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA) and Wage and Hour Litigation. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (tmg)
|
July 25, 2018 |
Filing
25
ORDER denying as moot 23 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended and Substituted Complaint; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss ; denying 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/25/2018. (chh)
|
April 19, 2018 |
Filing
13
ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Joshua Lee West for Norris Allen, Jerry Dixon, Eric Holmberg, Rodney Miller and Ron Rollins; granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Em ily A. Quillen for EMP LSO Holding Corporation and Express Courier International, Inc. ; granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andrew J. Butcher for EMP LSO Holding Corporation and Express Courier International, Inc.; grant ing 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Adam Carl Smedstad for EMP LSO Holding Corporation and Express Courier International, Inc. ; granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Charles Andrewscavage for EMP LSO Holding Corporation and Express Courier International, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/18/18. (tob)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?