December 16, 2021 |
Filing
679
STIPULATION and ORDER modifying 677 FINAL ORDER and JUDGMENT Approving Settlement. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 12/15/2021. (tms)
|
September 1, 2021 |
Filing
673
ORDER denying S-L's 617 Motion to Decertify and 641 , 644 Motions for Summary Judgment; granting J&M Mode Distribution, LLC's 647 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Mode's 648 Motion for Summary Judgment as described in this order; in light of the Court's ruling on J&M's motion, S-L's 627 Motion to Dismiss is denied as moot. Terminating as moot 655 Memorandum and Recommendations. Trial of this matter will be set for the Court's 11/8/2021 Charlotte civil term. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 8/31/2021. (nvc)
|
July 23, 2021 |
Filing
671
ORDER granting 670 Motion to Dismiss Opt-In Plaintiff Francisco Rojas. Francisco Rojas' (Dkts. 1, 160-1) claims against S-L are dismissed with prejudice. S-Ls counterclaim against Francisco Rojas (Dkt. 538) is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 7/23/2021. (tmg)
|
April 27, 2021 |
Filing
638
ORDER granting 637 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael J. Puma for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC, S-L Routes, LLC and Snyder's-Lance Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/27/2021. (mek)
|
March 4, 2021 |
Filing
626
ORDER granting 609 Motion to Compel S-Ls Production of a Revised Privilege Log or Alternatively to Compel S-L to Produce 20 Documents for In Camera Review. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/4/2021. (mek)
|
February 25, 2021 |
Filing
625
ORDER granting 624 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Erica Turners (Dkts. 1, 180-1) claims against S-L; S-Ls counterclaim against Erica Turner (Dkt. 538); S-Ls third-party claim against RVR Distribution, LLC (Dkt. 265). Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 2/25/2021. (tmg)
|
February 18, 2021 |
Filing
623
ORDER denying 601 Motion to Quash Non-Party Subpoenas to Testify and Produce Documents and for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/18/2021. (mek)
|
February 2, 2021 |
Filing
613
ORDER granting 611 Joint Motion to Dismiss with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 2/1/2021. (nvc)
|
January 28, 2021 |
Filing
606
ORDER granting 605 S-L's Motion to Dismiss and orders that the following be DISMISSED with prejudice: Opt-in Plaintiff Floyd Forester's claims (Dkts. 1 , 183 ); S-L's counterclaim against Forester (Dkt. 538 ); and the Third-Party Complaint against Bella Brook, LLC (Dkt. 225 ). Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 1/28/2021. (tmg)
|
January 7, 2021 |
Filing
600
ORDER granting 599 Motion to Compel Certain Sample Opt-In Plaintiffs' Production of Tax Documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/7/21. (mek)
|
December 16, 2020 |
Filing
595
ORDER granting 594 Motion to Compel Certain Sample Opt-In Plaintiffs to Provide Deposition Availability. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/16/2020. (tmg)
|
December 2, 2020 |
Filing
590
ORDER granting the Unopposed 589 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/2/2020. (brl)
|
November 12, 2020 |
Filing
585
ORDER granting 584 Joint Motion to Dismiss. S-L's counterclaim against Khuloud Aledlah, (Doc. No. 538), is dismissed with prejudice; S-L's third-party claim against E&K Snaxs LLC, (Doc. No. 448) is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 11/12/2020. (tmg)
|
November 10, 2020 |
Filing
583
ORDER granting 582 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kaitlyn E. Hutcherson for Jared Mode. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/10/2020. (mek)
|
November 4, 2020 |
Filing
580
ORDER granting 579 Joint Motion Regarding Re-Entry into the Litigation. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 11/4/2020. (nvc)
|
October 23, 2020 |
Filing
577
ORDER granting 556 Motion to Strike - [552-554] Motions for Summary Judgment. Beth Sturino will be dismissed from this action by agreement of the parties. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 10/23/2020. (nvc)
|
October 18, 2020 |
Filing
576
ORDER granting 575 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Eric M. Makinen for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC, S-L Routes, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/18/2020. (mek)
|
October 13, 2020 |
Filing
574
ORDER granting 573 Joint Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 10/13/2020. (nvc)
|
October 5, 2020 |
Filing
572
ORDER granting 570 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Hugh B. Bright for Jared Mode. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/5/2020. (mek)
|
September 17, 2020 |
Filing
564
ORDER granting 559 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Deficient Sample Opt-In Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 9/17/2020. (brl)
|
August 3, 2020 |
Filing
549
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 547 Unopposed Motion to Compel Sample Opt-In Plaintiffs' as follows: (a) Opt-In Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit A to the Motion shall produce written discovery responses an d documents responsive to S-Ls Interrogatories and Requests for Production within thirty days of this Order; (b) Opt-In Plaintiffs identified in Exhibit B to the Motion shall produce documents responsive to S-Ls Requests for Production with in thirty days of this Order; (c) Opt-In Plaintiffs are warned that failure to comply with this Order and fully respond to these discovery requests may result in their claims being DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE.(d) Following expiration of the thirty-day response period, S-L may submit a motion to dismiss all claims brought by and asserted against any Plaintiff who did not fully comply with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/3/20. (mga)
|
April 9, 2020 |
Filing
532
ORDER granting 514 S-L's Motion to Compel Arbitration. The 255 Plaintiffs with arbitration clauses in their Distributor Agreements shall arbitrate their claims as provided in their agreements. Signed by District Judge Kenneth D. Bell on 4/9/2020. (tmg)
|
March 11, 2020 |
Filing
529
ORDER granting 527 and 528 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Philip J. Pence and Christopher A. Stecher for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution, LLC and S-L Routes, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/11/2020. (brl)
|
December 18, 2019 |
Filing
526
ORDER granting 525 Consented to Motion for Readmission Pro Hac Vice for Benjamin K. Jacobs. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/18/2019. (mek)
|
April 23, 2019 |
Filing
152
ORDER granting 151 Motion Regarding Approval of Proposed Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/23/19. (tob)
|
April 17, 2019 |
Filing
150
ORDER granting 148 Motion Regarding Provision and Use of Putative Collective List by S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC, S-L Routes, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/16/19. (tob)
|
March 29, 2019 |
Filing
146
SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER re 141 Order on Motion to Dismiss/Order on Memorandum and Recommendations. The Court now specifies that Third-Party Defendant M&M Imports, Inc.s Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaint, (Doc. No. 103), is DENIED without prejudice for the reasons already established in the Courts previous order, (Doc. No. 141). Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/29/2019. (brl)
|
March 15, 2019 |
Filing
143
ORDER granting 109 Motion for Conditional Certification of FLSA Collective.. S-L shall provide Plaintiff's counsel the last known names, mailing addresses and email address of all putative collective members. The parties shall promptly agree upon appropriate notice and opt-in forms of submission to the Court for approval. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/14/2019. (brl)
|
March 6, 2019 |
Filing
141
ORDER adopting Magistrate Judge's 97 Memorandum and Recommendations and 122 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting Defendant's 22 Motion to Dismiss Count III of Plaintiff's Complaint. Specifically, Pl aintiff's NCWHA claim is DISMISSED; denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 92 Motion to Dismiss Defendants Counterclaims; denying without prejudice Third-Party Defendant's 84 Motion to Dismiss Third-Party Complaints.. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/6/2019. (brl)
|
November 14, 2018 |
Filing
138
ORDER Granting 135 Joint Motion to Dismiss and Orders that Sartis claims against S-L (Doc Nos. 1, 4); S-Ls counterclaim against Sarti (Doc. No. 25); and S-Ls third-party claims against Siempre Avanti, LLC (Doc. No. 28) are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 11/14/2018. (jaw)
|
October 29, 2018 |
Filing
134
ORDER granting 132 and 133 Joint Motion to Dismiss. McAlister and Bayoumis claims against S-L (Doc. Nos. 1, 21) are dismissed with prejudice; S-Ls counterclaims against McAlister and Bayoumi (Doc. No. 25) are dismissed w ith prejudice; S-Ls third-party claims against McAlister Distributing Inc., a North Carolina Corporation (Doc. No. 54), and against Snack It Now, LLC, a Georgia limited liability company (Doc. No. 56), are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 10/29/2018. (eef)
|
October 9, 2018 |
Filing
131
ORDER granting 127 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Mark J. Gottesfeld for Jared Mode. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/9/18. (tob)
|
June 25, 2018 |
Filing
81
ORDER granting 79 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added J. Chadwick Hatmaker for Jared Mode; granting 80 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Peter David Winebrake for Jared Mode. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/23/18. (tob)
|
May 10, 2018 |
Filing
20
ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Sari M. Alamuddin for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC,and S-L Routes, LLC; granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac V ice added Paul C. Evans for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC and S-L Routes, LLC; granting 19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Benjamin K. Jacobs for S-L Distribution Company, Inc., S-L Distribution Company, LLC, and S-L Routes, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/10/18. (tob)
|