Hegeman v. Ferland et al

Plaintiff: Dan Hegeman
Defendant: E. James Ferland, Thomas A. Christopher, Jenny L. Apker, Leslie Kass, Stephen G. Hanks, Anne R. Pramaggiore, Daniel W. Hoehn, Cynthia S. Dubin, Brian K. Ferraioli and Larry L. Weyers
Petitioner: Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00349
Filed: July 2, 2018
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: XX, Outside District
0 Judge: Max O Cogburn
1 Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2018 Cases associated: Create association to 3:18-cv-00347-MOC-DCK. (tmg)
July 2, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. (Consolidated with 3:18cv347) This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
July 2, 2018 7 Case transferred in from District of Delaware; Case Number 1:18-cv-00282. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
April 23, 2018 Case associated with lead case: Create association to 1:18-cv-00281-MAK. ALL FUTURE FILINGS SHALL BE MADE IN LEAD CASE NO. 18-CV-281-MAK ONLY. (nmfn) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 6 ORDER approving in part (5 in 1:18-cv-00282-MAK, 23 in 1:18-cv-00305-MAK, 5 in 1:18-cv-00281-MAK) STIPULATION and ORDER Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Appointing Co-Lead and Co-Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs. We designate Plaintiff's Co-Lead counsel as Brian J. Robbins, Esq., Craig W. Smith, Esq. and Steven R. Wedeking, Esq. of Robbins Arroyo LLP and Timothy W. Brown, Esq. of The Brown Law Firm, P.C. We designate Plaintiff's Co- Liaison Delaware counsel as Brian E. Farnan, Esq. and Michael J. Farnan, Esq. of Farnan LLP and Blake A. Bennett, Esq. of Cooch and Taylor, P.A. These cases are CONSOLIDATED for all purposes, including all further filings, into one consolidated action under the lead case No. 18-281. Plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Complaint no later than May 25, 2018 with a response to the Consolidated Complaint due no later than June 18,2018. Signed by Judge Mark A. Kearney on 4/23/2018. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00281-MAK, 1:18-cv-00282-MAK, 1:18-cv-00305-MAK(nmfn) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Case Reassigned to Judge Mark A. Kearney of the Eastern District of Pennsylvania (in lieu of Vacant Judgeship). Please include the initials of the Judge (MAK) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00281-MAK, 1:18-cv-00282-MAK, 1:18-cv-00305-MAK (rjb) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
April 10, 2018 5 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Consolidating Related Derivative Actions and Appointing Co-Lead and Co-Liaison Counsel for Plaintiffs by Dan Hegeman, Mike Deangelis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Farnan, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
April 10, 2018 CORRECTING ENTRY: Pursuant to the request of counsel, the stipulation previously filed on 4/9/2018 has been deleted and a revised version of the document shall be filed at a later time. Associated Cases: 1:18-cv-00282-VAC-SRF, 1:18-cv-00281-VAC-SRF, 1:18-cv-00305-VAC-SRF(lih) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order SO ORDERED- re #4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME. Set/Reset Answer Deadlines: Jenny L. Apker answer due 5/22/2018; Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc. answer due 5/22/2018; Thomas A. Christopher answer due 5/22/2018; Cynthia S. Dubin answer due 5/22/2018; E. James Ferland answer due 5/22/2018; Brian K. Ferraioli answer due 5/22/2018; Stephen G. Hanks answer due 5/22/2018; Daniel W. Hoehn answer due 5/22/2018; Leslie Kass answer due 5/22/2018; Anne R. Pramaggiore answer due 5/22/2018; Larry L. Weyers answer due 5/22/2018. Signed by Judge Sherry R. Fallon on 3/6/2018. (lih) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
March 2, 2018 4 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to Answer Complaint to May 22, 2018 - filed by Dan Hegeman. (Farnan, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
March 1, 2018 **NOTE: If the parties jointly consent to Magistrate Judge Fallons jurisdiction to conduct all proceedings in this case, then the Pretrial Conference and Trial will be presided over by Judge Fallon consistent with 28 U.S.C. 636. Otherwise, in accordance with the District Court's procedures for "Assignment of Cases to Visiting Judges" (issued May 26, 2017 and available on the District Court's website), upon the filing of a case-dispositive motion (e.g., a motion to dismiss, a motion for judgment on the pleadings, a motion for summary judgment, or initiation of the claim construction process in a patent case), VAC cases will be reassigned to a visiting District Judge, and any further dates in the Scheduling Order, including the Pretrial Conference and Trial dates, may be adjusted dependent on the availability of the visiting District Judge.** (lih) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
February 21, 2018 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dan Hegeman. Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc. served on 2/20/2018, answer due 3/13/2018. (Farnan, Michael) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
February 21, 2018 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Sherry R. Fallon. (This matter has been assigned to the Vacant Judgeship and referred to a Magistrate Judge for handling through case-dispositive motions. The Magistrate Judge has full authority permitted by law to manage this matter, including entering schedules through trial, deciding non-dispositive matters and making recommendations as to the resolution of dispositive matters. Litigants and counsel are reminded that they have the option of consenting to the Magistrate Judge to handle the case in full, including trial, or consenting to having a particular motion resolved by the Magistrate Judge.) (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
February 21, 2018 Case Assigned to Vacant Judgeship (2017). Please include the initials of the Judge (VAC) after the case number on all documents filed. (nms) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
February 20, 2018 Summons Issued with Magistrate Consent Notice attached as to Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc. on 2/20/2018. (nmfn) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
February 20, 2018 No Summons Issued. (jcs) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
February 16, 2018 2 Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (jcs) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]
February 16, 2018 1 VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Jenney L. Apker, Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc., Thomas A. Christopher, Cynthia S. Dubin, James E. Ferland, Brian K. Ferraioli, Stephen G. Hanks, Daniel W. Hoehn, Leslie Kass, Anne R. Pramaggiore, Larry L. Weyers - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0311-2325212.) - filed by Dan Hegeman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Verification, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jcs) [Transferred from Delaware on 7/2/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hegeman v. Ferland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Babcock & Wilcox Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. James Ferland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas A. Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jenny L. Apker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen G. Hanks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne R. Pramaggiore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel W. Hoehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia S. Dubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian K. Ferraioli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry L. Weyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Hegeman
Represented By: Michael J. Farnan
Represented By: Brian E. Farnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?