United States of America v. Approximately $16,037 in funds
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $16,037 in funds
Case Number: 3:2018cv00415
Filed: July 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: Complaint for Forfeiture
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Abandon claim to funds by Approximately $16,037 in funds (Williams, Lance)
September 19, 2018 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 10/10/2018. (ams)
September 19, 2018 Filing 7 Verified claim ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Approximately $16,037 in funds.(Williams, Lance)
September 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including September 18, 2018 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/7/18. (mga)
September 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Approximately $16,037 in funds. Responses due by 9/20/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Williams, Lance). Motions referred to David Keesler.
August 31, 2018 Filing 4 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 08/30/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Tiffany)
August 9, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Service (Direct Notice) by United States of America re #2 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Property, #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Tiffany)
July 30, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property (brl)
July 30, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
July 30, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Approximately $16,037 in funds, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Moore, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $16,037 in funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $16,037 in funds
Represented By: Lance Christian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Tiffany Mallory Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?