United States v. One 2008 Bentley Continental

Plaintiff: United States
Defendant: One 2008 Bentley Continental
Case Number: 3:2018cv00485
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
0 Judge: Robert J Conrad
1 Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Service (Direct Notice) by United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Service (Direct Notice) by United States (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 4 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States. Last publication date 10/05/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Bain-Creed on behalf of United States (Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
September 4, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property (ams)
September 4, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture in rem against One 2008 Bentley Continental, filed by United States.(Moore, Tiffany)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States v. One 2008 Bentley Continental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 2008 Bentley Continental
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Tiffany Mallory Moore
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?