Cotton et al v. Wells Fargo & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Gabriela Perez, Allison Hedrick Cotton, Ignacio Perez and Christopher Dee Cotton
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Wells Fargo & Co.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00499
Filed: September 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order of US Bankruptcy Judge Laura Turner Beyer recommending that the District Court Grant the Parties' Joint Conditional Motion to Withdraw the Reference. Bankruptcy Court case number 17-3056. (Attachments: #1 Order Preliminarily Approving Settlement and Providing for Notice) (bkCH)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 Memorandum to District Court from Bankruptcy Clerk re: Filing Fee being paid. (bkCH)
September 13, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
September 12, 2018 Filing 1 Joint MOTION to Withdraw Reference (Conditional) by Allison Hedrick Cotton, Christopher Dee Cotton, Gabriela Perez, Ignacio Perez. Responses due by 9/26/2018 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Henderson, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cotton et al v. Wells Fargo & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriela Perez
Represented By: Frederick Leigh Henderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Hedrick Cotton
Represented By: O. Max Gardner, III
Represented By: Frederick Leigh Henderson, Jr.
Represented By: Karen Lynn Kellett
Represented By: Caitlyn Nicole Wells
Represented By: Abelardo Limon, Jr
Represented By: Theodore O. Bartholow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ignacio Perez
Represented By: Frederick Leigh Henderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Dee Cotton
Represented By: O. Max Gardner, III
Represented By: Frederick Leigh Henderson, Jr.
Represented By: Karen Lynn Kellett
Represented By: Caitlyn Nicole Wells
Represented By: Abelardo Limon, Jr
Represented By: Theodore O. Bartholow, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William Carter Mayberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo & Co.
Represented By: William Carter Mayberry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?