Armstrong v. Labortory Corporation of America
Plaintiff: Serita Kay Armstrong
Defendant: Labortory Corporation of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00556
Filed: October 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Max O Cogburn
2 Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting Deft's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond re: #1 Complaint. Labortory Corporation of America answer due 12/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/06/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
December 6, 2018 Case reassigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney no longer assigned to the case. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(thh)
December 5, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Labortory Corporation of America (Bartis, Patricia)
December 5, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Labortory Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bartis, Patricia). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 5, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia T. Bartis on behalf of Labortory Corporation of America (Bartis, Patricia)
November 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Labortory Corporation of America served on 11/1/2018, answer due 11/23/2018. (brl)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Labortory Corporation of America. (Attachments: #1 UMS285)(brl)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/23/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(brl)
October 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The order was served conventionally. (brl)
October 12, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Case Assignment Packet. And #Initial Scheduling Order and Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The document was served conventionally at case filing (brl)
October 12, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Serita Kay Armstrong. (brl)
October 12, 2018 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Labortory Corporation of America, filed by Serita Kay Armstrong. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(brl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong v. Labortory Corporation of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Labortory Corporation of America
Represented By: Patricia T. Bartis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Serita Kay Armstrong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?