Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company v. Portrait Homes-South Carolina LLC et al

Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Pasquinelli Homebuilding LLC, Portrait Homes-Oak Bluff LLC and Portrait Homes-South Carolina LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00561
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
0 Judge: David Keesler
1 Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Discovery due by 5/28/2019. Motions due by 6/25/2019. Mediation deadline set for 6/11/2019. Jury Trial set for 9/3/2019 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/5/18. (clc)
December 3, 2018 Filing 9 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Harris, David)
November 14, 2018 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 12/3/2018. (clc)
November 9, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand by Pasquinelli Homebuilding LLC, Portrait Homes-Oak Bluff LLC, Portrait Homes-South Carolina LLC.(Harris, Scott)
November 1, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. Portrait Homes-Oak Bluff LLC served on 10/18/2018, answer due 11/8/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Mail green card and USPS Tracking Results, #2 Exhibit B - Summons to Portrait Homes-Oak Bluff, LLC)(Brown, David)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 Summons Issued Electronically as to Pasquinelli Homebuilding LLC, Portrait Homes-Oak Bluff LLC, Portrait Homes-South Carolina LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3)(ams)
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Brown, David)
October 16, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (ams)
October 16, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Harris, II on behalf of Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Harris, David)
October 15, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John I. Malone, Jr on behalf of Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Malone, John)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David Leonard Brown on behalf of Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company (Brown, David)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3836103), filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2013-CP-10-7067, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2013-CP-10-7066, #3 Exhibit 3-1 - PN Policy No. GL9 0601617 (2002-2003), #4 Exhibit 3-2 - PN Policy No. GL9 0601617 (2003-2004), #5 Exhibit 3-3 - PN Policy No. GL9 0601617 (2004-2005), #6 Exhibit 3-4 - PN Policy No. GL9 0601617 (2005-2006), #7 Exhibit 3-5 - PN Policy No. GL9 0601617 (2006-2007), #8 Exhibit 3-6 - PN Policy No. GL9 0601617 (2007-2008), #9 Exhibit 3-7 - PN Policy No. GL9 0649575 (2008-2009), #10 Exhibit 3-8 - PN Policy No. GL9 0649575 (2009-2010), #11 Cover Sheet)(Brown, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company v. Portrait Homes-South Carolina LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pasquinelli Homebuilding LLC
Represented By: Scott Crissman Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portrait Homes-Oak Bluff LLC
Represented By: Scott Crissman Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Portrait Homes-South Carolina LLC
Represented By: Scott Crissman Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David G. Harris, II
Represented By: David Leonard Brown
Represented By: John I. Malone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?