Chick et al v. Johnson
Plaintiff: Sarah Lightbody and Nathan Chick
Defendant: James M. Johnson
Case Number: 3:2018cv00572
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan : Estimated Trial Time: 3 days. Discovery due by 5/7/2019. Motions due by 6/4/2019. Mediation deadline set for 5/21/2019. Jury Trial set for 9/3/2019 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1-1, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 11/13/18. (clc)
November 6, 2018 Filing 38 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (O'Brien, Carrie)
October 25, 2018 Notice to Christopher Abel: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 11/1/2018. (tob)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher A Abel for James M. Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/25/18. (tob)
October 25, 2018 Filing 36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher A. Abel Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3845639. by James M. Johnson. (O'Brien, Carrie). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
October 23, 2018 Filing 35 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nathan Chick, Sarah Lightbody (Humphries, Justin)
October 23, 2018 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 5 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 11/13/2018. (tmg)
October 22, 2018 Notice to Christopher Abel: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 10/29/2018. (tmg)
October 22, 2018 Notice to Peter Farr: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to File a motion pro hac vice. Deadline by 10/29/2018. (tmg)
October 22, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (tmg)
October 22, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (tmg)
October 22, 2018 Filing 34 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 0:18-cv-00814. Original electronic file and docket sheet received.
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER AND OPINION granting #10 Motion to Change Venue. It is hereby ORDERED that this matter be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Western District of North Carolina. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/19/2018.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
October 18, 2018 Filing 32 TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 10/18/2018.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
October 15, 2018 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher A. Abel ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0420-8054503) by James M Johnson. Response to Motion due by 10/29/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Application/Affidavit for Pro Hac Vice Admission)No proposed order.(O'Brien, Carrie) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
October 12, 2018 Filing 30 PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by Nathan Chick, Sarah Lightbody.(Humphries, Justin) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
August 7, 2018 Filing 28 CONSENT ORDER granting #26 Motion to Dismiss Defendant's Counterclaim against the Plaintiff without prejudice. Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 8/7/2018.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss by James M Johnson. Response to Motion due by 8/17/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(O'Brien, Carrie) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 25 Amended Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by James M Johnson.(O'Brien, Carrie) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 24 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiff's Complaint by James M Johnson. (O'Brien, Carrie) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 22 Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by James M Johnson.(O'Brien, Carrie) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
July 2, 2018 Filing 21 Plaintiffs' Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by Nathan Chick, Sarah Lightbody.(Humphries, Justin) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 20 AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/2/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/12/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/19/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/12/2018, Discovery due by 1/15/2019, Motion in Limine due by 3/15/2019, Motions due by 1/29/2019, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 3/15/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 4/23/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 4/30/2019, Mediation Due by 12/2/2018, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 6/25/2018. (asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 19 DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 19 Reason: proposed order filed as outline of discovery plan is not filed on the court docket. Attorney has been instructed to submit the proposed scheduling order to the judges email address. (asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
June 25, 2018 Filing 18 First Rule 26(f) Report by Nathan Chick, Sarah Lightbody.(Humphries, Justin) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
June 14, 2018 Filing 15 ANSWER to Counterclaim #6 by Nathan Chick.(Farr, Peter) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
June 12, 2018 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Change Venue Response filed by James M Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-NC Boating Accident Report) refiled by the clerk to correct event type.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Change Venue Response filed by Nathan Chick, Sarah Lightbody.Reply to Response to Motion due by 6/18/2018 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit portion of accident report)(Humphries, Justin) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
June 4, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE of Request for Protection from Court Appearance by Carrie H O'Brien for July 3-July 8 and August 6-August 10, 2018 (O'Brien, Carrie) (Main Document 11 replaced on 6/8/2018) (asni, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 9 MEDIATION ORDER Mediation Due by 11/20/2018, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/29/2018. (asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
May 29, 2018 Filing 8 CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/18/2018, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/2/2018, Rule 26 Report due by 7/2/2018, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 8/13/2018, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 9/12/2018, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 10/12/2018, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 10/12/2018, Discovery due by 11/13/2018, Motion in Limine due by 1/4/2019, Motions due by 11/27/2018, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 1/4/2019, Pretrial Briefs due by 1/29/2019, Jury Selection Deadline 2/5/2019, Signed by Honorable J Michelle Childs on 5/29/2018. (asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Nathan Chick by James M Johnson. refiled by the clerk to correct event type.(asni, ) Modified to correct document number on 6/14/2018 (asni, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION to Change Venue by James M Johnson. Response to Motion due by 6/12/2018. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(O'Brien, Carrie) Modified to correct filing date on 5/29/2018 (asni, ). [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
May 25, 2018 Filing 7 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James M Johnson.(O'Brien, Carrie) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
April 20, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on James M. Johnson on 04/16/2018, filed by Nathan Chick, Sarah Lightbody. (Humphries, Justin) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 3 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Nathan Chick, Sarah Lightbody.(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James M Johnson. (asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]
March 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James M Johnson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-7681641.), filed by Nathan Chick, Sarah Lightbody. Service due by 6/21/2018(asni, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 10/22/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chick et al v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Lightbody
Represented By: Justin Kenneth Humphries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Chick
Represented By: Justin Kenneth Humphries
Represented By: Peter Edward Farr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James M. Johnson
Represented By: Carrie Hailman O'Brien
Represented By: Christopher A Abel
Represented By: Christopher Alan Abel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?