United States of America v. Real Property at 6698 Dam Cove Road, Conover, North Carolina et al
Plaintiff: United States and United States of America
Defendant: Real Property at 8102 Evanston Falls Road, Huntersville, North Carolina and Real Property at 6698 Dam Cove Road, Conover, North Carolina
Claimant: Justin Boston, 8102 Evanston Falls Road, LLC, Lake Hickory Holdings, LLC and Caron Shettle
Case Number: 3:2018cv00576
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Robert J Conrad
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint ; granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Claimants 8102 Evanston Falls Road, LLC ; Caron Shettle; Lake Hickory Holdings, LLC; Justin Boston shall respond to the Complaint on or before 2/22/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/19/18. (tob)
December 19, 2018 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Caron Shettle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Owen, C.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 19, 2018 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Lake Hickory Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Owen, C.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 19, 2018 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Justin Boston. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Owen, C.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 19, 2018 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by 8102 Evanston Falls Road, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order)(Owen, C.). Motions referred to David S. Cayer.
December 12, 2018 Filing 13 USMS Return of Service for Notice of Lis Pendens 6698 Dam Cove Road, Conover, North Carolina served on Catawba County Clerk of Superior Court on 11/07/2018, filed by United States of America. (Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
December 12, 2018 Filing 12 USMS Return of Service for Notice of Lis Pendens 8102 Evanston Falls Road, Huntersville, North Carolina served on Mecklenburg County Clerk of Superior Court on 11/07/2018, filed by United States of America. (Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
December 7, 2018 Filing 11 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 12/01/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
December 6, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot Sol Abrams on behalf of 8102 Evanston Falls Road, LLC (Abrams, Elliot)
December 6, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot Sol Abrams on behalf of Lake Hickory Holdings, LLC (Abrams, Elliot)
December 6, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot Sol Abrams on behalf of Justin Boston (Abrams, Elliot)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Elliot Sol Abrams on behalf of Caron Shettle (Abrams, Elliot)
December 3, 2018 Filing 6 CLAIM of Interest by 8102 Evanston Falls Road, LLC. (Owen, C.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 CLAIM of Interest by Lake Hickory Holdings, LLC. (Owen, C.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 CLAIM of Interest by Caron Shettle. (Owen, C.)
December 3, 2018 Filing 3 CLAIM of Interest by Justin Boston. (Owen, C.)
November 9, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of SERVICE (Direct Notice) by United States of America re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
October 26, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against The real property at 6698 Dam Cove Road, Conover, North Carolina, The real property at 8102 Evanston Falls Road, Huntersville, North Carolina, filed by United States.(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property at 6698 Dam Cove Road, Conover, North Carolina et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property at 8102 Evanston Falls Road, Huntersville, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property at 6698 Dam Cove Road, Conover, North Carolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Justin Boston
Represented By: Elliot Sol Abrams
Represented By: C. Melissa Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: 8102 Evanston Falls Road, LLC
Represented By: Elliot Sol Abrams
Represented By: C. Melissa Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Lake Hickory Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Elliot Sol Abrams
Represented By: C. Melissa Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Caron Shettle
Represented By: Elliot Sol Abrams
Represented By: C. Melissa Owen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?