International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers v. Transit Management of Charlotte, Inc.

Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers
Defendant: Transit Management of Charlotte, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00595
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Transit Management of Charlotte, Inc. (Smith, John)
January 3, 2019 Added Magistrate Judge David Keesler as presider ; District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr no longer assigned as presider and Magistrate Judge David Keesler no longer assigned as referral magistrate judge. (mga)
January 3, 2019 Notice to Erika A. Diehl -Gibbons: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/10/2019. (mga)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons is hereby admitted pro hac to represent Plaintiff International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/2/19. (mga)
January 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3898377. by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers. (Ghosh, Narendra). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 Joint Stipulation of CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by all parties. (Ghosh, Narendra)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan . ALL Parties Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction (Ghosh, Narendra)
December 27, 2018 Set/Reset Deadlines: CIAC Report due by 12/28/2018. (brl)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report. The parties shall have up to and including 12/28/2018 to file their Rule 26(f) report. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/27/2018. (brl)
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers. Responses due by 1/9/2019 plus an additional 3 days if served by mail (Ghosh, Narendra). Motions referred to David Keesler.
December 4, 2018 NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The #Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference, and if applicable, the #Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge, should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 12/26/2018. (ams)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Transit Management of Charlotte, Inc..(Smith, John)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers. Transit Management of Charlotte, Inc. waiver sent on 11/14/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Ghosh, Narendra)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Transit Management of Charlotte, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (ams)
November 8, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Transit Management of Charlotte, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3857957), filed by International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers.(Ghosh, Narendra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers v. Transit Management of Charlotte, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transit Management of Charlotte, Inc.
Represented By: John Brem Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Association of Sheet Metal, Air, Rail and Transportation Workers
Represented By: Narendra Kumar Ghosh
Represented By: Erika A. Diehl-Gibbons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?