United States of America v. Approximately $29,580.00 In Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $29,580.00 in Currency
Case Number: 3:2018cv00597
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Robert J Conrad
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 SERVICE by Publication filed by United States of America. Last publication date 12/09/18. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of SERVICE (DIRECT NOTICE) by United States of America re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property. (ams)
November 8, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Approximately $29,580.00 In Currency, filed by United States of America.(Bain-Creed, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/8/2018 (ams).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $29,580.00 In Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $29,580.00 in Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?