Piedmont Structural Company v. RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Piedmont Structural Company
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC, Travelers Casulalty and Surety Company of America and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00608
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: David S Cayer
Referring Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Joseph Marino on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Marino, Peter)
January 4, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Atkins, Andrew)
January 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Perry Atkins on behalf of Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America (Atkins, Andrew)
December 19, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Parker Evans Moore on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC (Moore, Parker)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC (Carson, Ben)
December 14, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Carson, Ben)
December 14, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Carson, Ben)
December 14, 2018 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC. (Carson, Ben)
December 14, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Ben David Carson on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC (Carson, Ben)
December 14, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Piedmont Structural Company. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Shelton, Gregory)
December 14, 2018 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Piedmont Structural Company. RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Shelton, Gregory)
November 29, 2018 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Piedmont Structural Company. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America waiver sent on 11/15/2018, answer due 1/14/2019. (Shelton, Gregory)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued Electronically as to Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC, Travelers Casulalty and Surety Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
November 14, 2018 Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (brl)
November 14, 2018 Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(brl)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Piedmont Structural Company (Shelton, Gregory)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3861462), filed by Piedmont Structural Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Payment Bond Demand ATCT, #2 Exhibit B - Notice, #3 Exhibit C - Payment Bond Demand TRACON)(Shelton, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Piedmont Structural Company v. RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Piedmont Structural Company
Represented By: Gregory Lee Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Ben David Carson
Represented By: Parker Evans Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RAI Industrial Fabricators, LLC
Represented By: Ben David Carson
Represented By: Parker Evans Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casulalty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Andrew Perry Atkins
Represented By: Peter Joseph Marino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?