Owens v. Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Eugene Owens
Defendant: Jos. A. Bank Clothier, Inc. and Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00613
Filed: November 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc. served on 12/31/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (brj)
December 26, 2018 Filing 7 Summons Issued Electronically to US Marshal for service as to Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 USM 285)(chh)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (doc. 5), survives initial review under Section 1915(e). The Clerk shall process service.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/21/2018. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
December 11, 2018 Filing 5 Pro Se Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc., filed by Michael Eugene Owens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(ams)
November 21, 2018 Filing 4 Pro Se CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Captioned as Amended Complaint Jury Trial Demanded) by Michael Eugene Owens. (jaw)
November 19, 2018 Filing 3 Pro Se AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc., filed by Michael Eugene Owens.(jaw)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION (Sealed - Participants) to Proceed in forma pauperis by Michael Eugene Owens. (brl)
November 14, 2018 Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc., filed by Michael Eugene Owens. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(brl) Modified defendants name on 11/19/2018 (jaw).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Eugene Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jos. A. Bank Clothier, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jos. A. Bank Clothiers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?