Marshall v. Novant Health, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yvette Marshall
Defendant: Novant Health, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00633
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Novant Health, Inc..(Alamuddin, Sari)
February 4, 2019 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yvette Marshall. Novant Health, Inc. served on 12/19/2018, answer due 2/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zouras, James)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Sari M. Alamuddin is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Novant Health, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/10/19. (mga)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Matthew A. Russell is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Novant Health, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/10/19. (mga)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Defendant Christopher Boran is herby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant Novant Health, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/10/19. (mga)
January 11, 2019 Notice to Christopher Boran: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 1/18/2019. (mga)
January 10, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Sari M. Alamuddin Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3907229. by Novant Health, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 10, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Matthew A. Russell Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3907223. by Novant Health, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 10, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Christopher Boran Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3907157. by Novant Health, Inc.. (Kelly, Patrick). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ms. Catherine T. Mitchell is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Yvette Marshall. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/8/19. (mga)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Mr. James B. Zouras is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Yvette Marshall. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/8/19. (mga)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Ryan F. Stephan is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Plaintiff Yvette Marshall. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/8/19. (mga)
January 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Catherine T. Mitchell Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3904327. by Yvette Marshall. (Gibbons, Philip). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to James B. Zouras Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3904279. by Yvette Marshall. (Gibbons, Philip). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E. Kelly on behalf of Novant Health, Inc. (Kelly, Patrick)
January 8, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan F. Stephan Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-3903958. by Yvette Marshall. (Gibbons, Philip). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant Novant Health, Inc. answer due 2/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/8/19. (mga)
January 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by Novant Health, Inc.. (Kirk, Kimberly). Motions referred to David Keesler.
January 7, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Novant Health, Inc. (Kirk, Kimberly)
January 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick E. Kelly on behalf of Novant Health, Inc. (Kirk, Kimberly) Modified text on 1/23/2019 (brl).
January 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Jill Kirk on behalf of Novant Health, Inc. (Kirk, Kimberly)
December 10, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued Electronically as to Novant Health, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (brl)
November 27, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Novant Health, Inc. with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-3872214), filed by Yvette Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join Form Of Yvette Marshall)(Gibbons, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marshall v. Novant Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novant Health, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew A. Russell
Represented By: Sari M. Alamuddin
Represented By: Christopher Boran
Represented By: Patrick E. Kelly
Represented By: Kimberly Jill Kirk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Marshall
Represented By: Craig Lorne Leis
Represented By: Philip J. Gibbons, Jr
Represented By: Ryan F. Stephan
Represented By: James B. Zouras
Represented By: Catherine T. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?