United States of America v. Approx. $2,209 in United States Currency et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approx. $2,209 in United States Currency and Approx. $50,000 in funds
Claimant: Thuy Tien Luong
Case Number: 3:2018cv00635
Filed: November 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Max O Cogburn
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Thuy Tien Luong.(Sherrill, Wilbert)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of SERVICE (Direct Notice) by United States of America re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 CLAIM Ownership-Seized Property by Thuy Tien Luong. (Sherrill, Wilbert)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Department of the Treasury Process Receipt and Return re #2 Warrant Issued for Arrest of Property, filed by United States of America. (Bain-Creed, Benjamin)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 WARRANT Issued for Arrest of Property. (ams)
November 27, 2018 Case assigned to District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(ams)
November 27, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against Approximately $2,209 in United States Currency et al, filed by United States of America.(Bain-Creed, Benjamin) Modified text on 11/29/2018 (ams).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approx. $2,209 in United States Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approx. $2,209 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approx. $50,000 in funds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin Bain-Creed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Thuy Tien Luong
Represented By: Wilbert Terry Sherrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?