Murray v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Adrian D. Murray
Defendant: NC Department of Public Safety, John Doe, FNU McCoy and John/Jane Does
Case Number: 3:2018cv00641
Filed: November 29, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Western District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Frank D Whitney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Prisoner Admin Remedy Statement by Adrian D. Murray (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jaw)
January 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER for Prisoner Trust Account Statement of Plaintiff. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 01/11/2019. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ni)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement (Sealed - Court) by Adrian D. Murray (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jaw)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT - 1983 Application IFP (Sealed - Participants) by Adrian D. Murray (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(jaw)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint. The filing fee of $400.00 was not received or application to proceed without payment of fees and affidavit was not submitted. Application or Fee due by 12/24/2018. (brl)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Letter regarding informa pauperis form and prison account statement from Adrian Murray (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brl)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 Pro Se COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Adrian D. Murray. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(brl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murray v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John/Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian D. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?